v. MTA Metro-North Railroad
Defendant: MTA Metro-North Railroad
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Cheryl Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv03371
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MTA Metro-North Railroad..(pne)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTA Metro-North Railroad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cheryl Johnson..(Barkan, Steven)
May 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Laurence Barkan to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name was omitted on 'as to' docket entry text;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Laurence Barkan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Cheryl Johnson; MTA Metro-North Railroad. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
May 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Laurence Barkan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens;. (jgo)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cheryl Johnson..(Barkan, Steven) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jgo).
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barkan, Steven)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MTA Metro-North Railroad. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19651525)Document filed by Cheryl Johnson..(Barkan, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. MTA Metro-North Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Cheryl Johnson
Represented By: Steven Laurence Barkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTA Metro-North Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?