Fuld et al v. The Palestine Liberation Organization et al
Plaintiff: ELIEZER YAKIR FULD, TAMAR GILA FULD, MIRIAM FULD, NATAN SHAI FULD and NAOMI FULD
Defendant: THE PALESTINE LIBERATION ORGANIZATION, THE PALESTINIAN AUTHORITY (a/k/a The Palestinian Interim Self-Government Authority, and/or The Palestinian Council, and/or The Palestinian National Authority), The Palestinian Authority and The Palestinian Interim Self-Government Authority and
Case Number: 1:2020cv03374
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference in this matter, previously scheduled for July 15, 2020, at 3:15 p.m. is ADJOURNED to August 26, 2020, at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. The parties are reminded that they must file on ECF no later than Thursday, August 20, 2020, a joint letter, the contents of which is described in the Court's order scheduling the initial pretrial conference (Docket No. 3), as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/26/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/01/2020) (ama)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Court construes the application to waive defenses regarding proper service of process and GRANTS it subject to that understanding. If Defendants intended to preserve such defenses, they shall promptly advise the Court and the Court may revisit the extension. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 12. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/28/2020) (ama)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Gassan A. Baloul dated May 28, 2020. Document filed by The Palestine Liberation Organization, The Palestinian Authority..(Baloul, Gassan)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell Rand Berger on behalf of The Palestine Liberation Organization, The Palestinian Authority..(Berger, Mitchell)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gassan Adnan Baloul on behalf of The Palestine Liberation Organization, The Palestinian Authority..(Baloul, Gassan)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: The Palestine Liberation Organization answer due 8/10/2020; The Palestinian Authority answer due 8/10/2020. (ama)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Document filed by Tamar Gila Fuld, Miriam Fuld(individually), Miriam Fuld(as personal representative and administrator of the Estate of Ari Yoel Fuld, deceased), Naomi Fuld, Natan Shai Fuld, Miriam Fuld(as natural guardian of plaintiff Natan Shai Fuld), Eliezer Yakir Fuld..(Fleischmann, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Document filed by Tamar Gila Fuld, Miriam Fuld(individually), Miriam Fuld(as personal representative and administrator of the Estate of Ari Yoel Fuld, deceased), Naomi Fuld, Natan Shai Fuld, Miriam Fuld(as natural guardian of plaintiff Natan Shai Fuld), Eliezer Yakir Fuld..(Fleischmann, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Palestinian Authority..(jgo)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Palestine Liberation Organization..(jgo)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Palestinian Authority, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Eliezer Yakir Fuld, Miriam Fuld(as personal representative and administrator of the Estate of Ari Yoel Fuld, deceased), Miriam Fuld(individually), Miriam Fuld(as natural guardian of plaintiff Natan Shai Fuld), Naomi Fuld, Natan Shai Fuld, Tamar Gila Fuld..(Fleischmann, Jeffrey)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Palestine Liberation Organization, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Eliezer Yakir Fuld, Miriam Fuld(as personal representative and administrator of the Estate of Ari Yoel Fuld, deceased), Miriam Fuld(individually), Miriam Fuld(as natural guardian of plaintiff Natan Shai Fuld), Naomi Fuld, Natan Shai Fuld, Tamar Gila Fuld..(Fleischmann, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 15, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/15/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/01/2020) (ama)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Fleischmann re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Miriam Fuld twice to CM ECF with the party text "as personal representative and administrator of the Estate of Ari Yoel Fuld, deceased" and "as natural guardian of plaintiff Natan Shai Fuld". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Fleischmann. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: TAMAR GILA FULD, MIRIAM FULD, NAOMI FULD, NATAN SHAI FULD, ELIEZER YAKIR FULD, THE PALESTINE LIBERATION ORGANIZATION, THE PALESTINIAN AUTHORITY (a/k/a The Palestinian Interim Self-Government Authority, and/or The Palestinian Council, and/or The Palestinian National Authority). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted; DO NOT ENTER IN ALL PARTIES NAME IN ALL CAPS. (pc)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Miriam Fuld, Miriam Fuld added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Miriam Fuld, Miriam Fuld. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Fleischmann, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fleischmann, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE PALESTINE LIBERATION ORGANIZATION, THE PALESTINIAN AUTHORITY (a/k/a The Palestinian Interim Self-Government Authority, and/or The Palestinian Council, and/or The Palestinian National Authority). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19652248)Document filed by TAMAR GILA FULD, MIRIAM FULD, NAOMI FULD, NATAN SHAI FULD, ELIEZER YAKIR FULD..(Fleischmann, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuld et al v. The Palestine Liberation Organization et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PALESTINE LIBERATION ORGANIZATION
Represented By: Gassan Adnan Baloul
Represented By: Mitchell Rand Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PALESTINIAN AUTHORITY (a/k/a The Palestinian Interim Self-Government Authority, and/or The Palestinian Council, and/or The Palestinian National Authority)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Palestinian Authority
Represented By: Gassan Adnan Baloul
Represented By: Mitchell Rand Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Palestinian Interim Self-Government Authority and
Represented By: Gassan Adnan Baloul
Represented By: Mitchell Rand Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIEZER YAKIR FULD
Represented By: Jeffrey Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMAR GILA FULD
Represented By: Jeffrey Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRIAM FULD
Represented By: Jeffrey Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATAN SHAI FULD
Represented By: Jeffrey Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAOMI FULD
Represented By: Jeffrey Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?