Benthos Master Fund, Ltd. v. Etra
Petitioner: Benthos Master Fund, Ltd.
Respondent: Aaron Etra
Case Number: 1:2020cv03384
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Steven R. Popofsky dated May 29, 2020 re: Respondent's Default. Document filed by Benthos Master Fund, Ltd...(Popofsky, Steven)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition to Confirm Final Arbitration Award served on Aaron Etra on May 7, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Benthos Master Fund, Ltd...(Bromberg, Joshua)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition to Confirm Final Arbitration Award, Summons and Order served on Aaron Etra on May 5, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Benthos Master Fund, Ltd...(Bromberg, Joshua)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration, . Document filed by Benthos Master Fund, Ltd...(Bromberg, Joshua)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. On April 30, 2020, Petitioner filed a petition to confirm an arbitration award. Dkt. No. 1. Petitioner's memorandum of law in support of its petition is due within two weeks of the date of the date of this order. Petitioners shall serve Respondent within two weeks after filing their memorandum of law and shall file proof of service within one week from the date of service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent's opposition to the petition shall be due two weeks from the date of service. Petitioner's reply, if any, shall be due one week thereafter. Additionally, Petitioner shall serve a copy of this Order on Respondent and inform Respondent of Rule 1.H. of this Court's Individual Practices, which requires all attorneys representing parties before this Court to register promptly as filing users on ECF. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/4/2020) (rjm)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Richard Popofsky on behalf of Benthos Master Fund, Ltd...(Popofsky, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aaron Etra..(pne)
May 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
May 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aaron Etra, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Benthos Master Fund, Ltd...(Bromberg, Joshua)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bromberg, Joshua)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Benthos Master Fund, Ltd...(Bromberg, Joshua)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19656455).Document filed by Benthos Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Award, #2 Exhibit B - Bitcoin Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Escrow Agreement).(Bromberg, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benthos Master Fund, Ltd. v. Etra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aaron Etra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benthos Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Joshua Kallman Bromberg
Represented By: Steven Richard Popofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?