Chalmers et al v. City of New York
Plaintiff: Fatima Q. Rosemond, Darryl Chalmers, Glenn Mendez, AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, James Nova and Darren Connors
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Case Number: 1:2020cv03389
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 ra Race Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #61 Motion to Certify Class; denying #80 Motion to Preclude. For the reasons stated above: The City's motion to preclude G&S's testimony is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion to preclude Dr. Erath's testimony is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' motion for certification of a class is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion for certification of a subclass is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion to appoint class counsel is GRANTED.The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 61 and 80.SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/19/2022) (ks)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #96 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Desiree Langley from the docket. SO ORDERED. Attorney Desiree Langley (Sholes) terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/7/2022) (tg)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Desiree Langley to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion).(Langley (Sholes), Desiree)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kami Zumbach Barker on behalf of City of New York..(Barker, Kami)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying #73 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated above, Defendant's motion to dismiss Count 3 of the amended complaint as to the white FPIs is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 73. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/9/2022) (ks)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Rebecca Quinn dated March 28, 2022 re: Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Dated February 28, 2022. Document filed by City of New York..(Quinn, Rebecca)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Rebecca Quinn dated March 23, 2022 re: Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority dated March 22, 2022. Document filed by City of New York..(Quinn, Rebecca)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Exclusion of the Report and Testimony of Dr. Christopher Erath and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Experts re: #61 MOTION to Certify Class and Subclass, Appoint Class Counsel, and Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Christopher Erath., #80 MOTION to Preclude the Reports and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Experts Pursuant to FRE 702.. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Gibson Quinn on behalf of City of New York..(Quinn, Rebecca)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint re: #73 MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of the Amended Complaint., #61 MOTION to Certify Class and Subclass, Appoint Class Counsel, and Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Christopher Erath.. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Abbananto v. County of Nassau Opinion).(Lieder, Michael)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #80 MOTION to Preclude the Reports and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Experts Pursuant to FRE 702. . Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #61 MOTION to Certify Class and Subclass, Appoint Class Counsel, and Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Christopher Erath. (2) their Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Drs. Goldstein and Scherbaum. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51, #2 Exhibit 52, #3 Exhibit 53, #4 Exhibit 54, #5 Exhibit 55, #6 Exhibit 56).(Lieder, Michael)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #83 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/8/2021) (kv)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #73 MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael Lieder dated 12/06/2021. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECLARATION of Amanda C. Croushore in Opposition re: #61 MOTION to Certify Class and Subclass, Appoint Class Counsel, and Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Christopher Erath.. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Erath Report, #2 Exhibit Exh. B. - Neill Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Exh. C - Hogan Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit Exh. D - 2014 FPI NOE, #5 Exhibit Exh. E - 2014 DOE Inspector NOE, #6 Exhibit Exh. F - Rampino Deposition Excerpts, #7 Exhibit Exh. G - Connors Deposition Excerpts, #8 Exhibit Exh. H - Mendez Deposition Excerpts, #9 Exhibit Exh. I - Chalmers Deposition Excerpts, #10 Exhibit Exh. J Part 1 - FPI CBA p. 1-30, #11 Exhibit Exh. J Part 2 - FPI CBA p. 30-end, #12 Exhibit Exh. K - DOB Inspector CBA, #13 Exhibit Exh. L - Banks Deposition Excerpts, #14 Exhibit Exh. M - DOB Recruitment PPT, #15 Exhibit Exh, N - Rush Deposition Excerpts, #16 Exhibit Exh. O - G&S Rebuttal Report, #17 Exhibit Exh. P - G&S Opening Report, #18 Exhibit Exh. Q - Erath Deposition Excerpts, #19 Exhibit Exh. R - Scherbaum Deposition Excerpts).(Croushore, Amanda)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #61 MOTION to Certify Class and Subclass, Appoint Class Counsel, and Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Christopher Erath. and in Support of [Dkt. 80] Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Experts. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Preclude the Reports and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Experts Pursuant to FRE 702. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/19/2021) (ate)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification addressed to Judge Analisa Torres. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #73 MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/15/2021) (kv)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/22/2021 Replies due by 12/13/2021. (kv)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Class Certification addressed to Judge Analisa Torres. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #73 MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of the Amended Complaint. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Desiree Langley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (MK)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Aisha Rich terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/20/2021) (vfr)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Aisha L. Rich to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Rich, Aisha)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #6 Complaint against City of New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, James Nova, Darryl Chalmers, Glenn Mendez, Darren Connors, Fatima Q. Rosemond. Related document: #6 Complaint..(Lieder, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #64 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Court has reviewed the parties' letters dated October 1 and 8, 2021, regarding Plaintiffs' request for leave to file an amended complaint. ECF Nos. 64, 67. Plaintiffs' request is GRANTED. Accordingly: 1. By October 19, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint. 2. By November 9, 2021, Defendant shall answer or othe1wise respond to the amended complaint. 3. If Defendant moves to dismiss the amended complaint, by November 23, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file their opposition, and by December 7, 2021, Defendant shall submit its reply, if any. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 64. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/12/2021) (rro)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2021. Responses due by 11/23/2021 Replies due by 12/7/2021. (rro)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Letter-Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Class Certification and to File Pre-Summary Judgment Motion Letter. GRANTED. By November 15, 2021, Defendant shall file its opposition papers to the pending motion for class certification. By December 6, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file their reply. The deadline for Defendant to submit its pre-motion letter seeking leave to file a motion for summary judgment shall be held in abeyance. Defendant shall move for leave to file a motion of summary judgment within 30 days of the Court's order on the motion for class certification. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/6/2021) (jca)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Class Certification and to File Pre-Summary Judgment Motion Letter addressed to Judge Analisa Torres. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/15/2021 Replies due by 12/6/2021. (jca)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael D. Lieder dated October 1, 2021. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Redlined First Amended Complaint).(Lieder, Michael)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: granting #25 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated above, Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to the claims of the white FPIs under Title VII and the NYCHRL, and DENIED in all other respects. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 25. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/16/2021) (ama)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #61 MOTION to Certify Class and Subclass, Appoint Class Counsel, and Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Christopher Erath. . Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 Pay Equity in NYC, #3 Exhibit 2 - Workforce Profile Report 2018, #4 Exhibit 3 - Rampino Transcript Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 4 - Nova Transcript Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 5 - Rosemond Transcript Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 6 - Chalmers Transcript Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 7 - Connors Transcript Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 8 - Mendez Transcript Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 9 - Goldstein and Scherbaum Expert Report, #11 Exhibit 10 - RFA 12, #12 Exhibit 11 - Goldstein and Scherbaum Rebuttal Report, #13 Exhibit 12 - Lieder Declaration ISO Class Certification, #14 Exhibit 13 - Hogan Transcript, #15 Exhibit 14 - CHALMERS_FPI_LIT-00037583, #16 Exhibit 15 - CHALMERS_FPI_LIT-00000227, #17 Exhibit 16 - Palmieri-Russo Transcript Excerpts, #18 Exhibit 17 - Kaufman Declaration ISO Class Certification 5.15.21 (unsigned), #19 Exhibit 18 - Rampino Exhibit 42, #20 Exhibit 19 - Rampino Exhibit 48, #21 Exhibit 20 - Rampino Exhibit 51, #22 Exhibit 21 - Rampino Exhibit 46, #23 Exhibit 22 - Rampino Exhibit 28, #24 Exhibit 23 - Erath Report in FPI case, #25 Exhibit 24 - Erath Transcript, #26 Exhibit 25 - Rampino Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26 - Rampino Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 27 - Banks Transcript Excerpts, #29 Exhibit 28 - Rush Transcript Excerpts, #30 Exhibit 29 - Rampino Exhibit 12, #31 Exhibit 30 - Rush Exhibit 3, #32 Exhibit 31 - Rush Exhibit 5, #33 Exhibit 32 - Rush Exhibit 9, #34 Exhibit 33 - Rush Exhibit 4, #35 Exhibit 34 - Neil Transcript Excerpts, #36 Exhibit 35 - Scherbaum Declaration ISO Motion to Exclude Erath's Testimony, #37 Exhibit 36 - Neill Exhibit 2, #38 Exhibit 37 - Neill Exhibit 3, #39 Exhibit 38 - Neill Exhibit 4, #40 Exhibit 39 - BI CBAs and MOUs, #41 Exhibit 40 - FPI CBAs and MOUs, #42 Exhibit 41 - CHALMERS_FPI_LIT-00037787 (Discretionary Increases), #43 Exhibit 42 - CHALMERS_FPI_LIT-00037788, #44 Exhibit 43 - Rampino Exhibit 22, #45 Exhibit 44 - Rampino Exhibit 24, #46 Exhibit 45 - Banks Exhibit 16, #47 Exhibit 46 - Banks Exhibit 11, #48 Exhibit 47 - PLFPI-GEN001507 - Workforce Profile Report 2017, #49 Exhibit 48 - Erath CV, #50 Exhibit 49 - Scherbaum Transcript Excerpts, #51 Exhibit 50 - 2021-08-25 Robert J. Valli Declaration).(Lieder, Michael)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Certify Class and Subclass, Appoint Class Counsel, and Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Christopher Erath. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/19/2021) (jca)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #57 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Arguments in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, to be Included in Opposition to Class Certification Briefing. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/19/2021) (jca)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Aisha Rich dated August 17, 2021. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Rich, Aisha)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Arguments in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, to be Included in Opposition to Class Certification Briefing addressed to Judge Analisa Torres. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #55 Letter, filed by Glenn Mendez, Darren Connors, Fatima Q. Rosemond, AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, James Nova, Darryl Chalmers. ENDORSEMENT: DENIED. Plaintiffs may brief this issue in their pending class certification motion, if desired. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/16/2021) (jca)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Aisha Rich dated August 12, 2021 re: Pre-Motion Letter Regarding Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Rich, Aisha)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. GRANTED. Defendant shall file any pre-motion letter seeking leave to file a motion for summaiy judgment within 30 days of the Court's order deciding the pending motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/26/2021) (kv)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge Analisa Torres. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The case management conference scheduled for May 17, 2021, is ADJOURNED sine die, pending the Court's resolution of any motion for class certification. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/14/2021) (kv)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Redlined Second Proposed Amended CCMP, #2 Exhibit B: The Non-Redlined Proposed Amended CCMP).(Rich, Aisha)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Desiree Langley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Virginia Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Washington DC Certificate of Good Standing).(Langley (Sholes), Desiree)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #49 MOTION for Desiree Langley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/21/2021) (kv)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 7/16/2021. Fact Discovery due by 5/14/2021. (kv)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Desiree Langley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24425145. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 VA Certificate of Good Standing).(Langley (Sholes), Desiree) Modified on 4/20/2021 (wb).
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #47 MOTION for Desiree Langley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24425145. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia; Affidavit is not Notarized.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Ellen Eardley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ca)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael D. Lieder dated April 15, 2021. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: The case management conference scheduled for March 15, 2021, is ADJOURNED to May 17, 2021, at 10:20 a.m. By May 10, 2021, the parties shall file their joint status letter. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827, at the time of the conference. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 5/17/2021 at 10:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/12/2021) (kv)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Ellen Eardley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Illinois Certificate of Good Standing).(Eardley, Ellen)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #43 MOTION for Ellen Eardley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Redline of Case Management Plan).(Rich, Aisha)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #42) - STATUS REPORT. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Redline of Case Management Plan).(Eardley, Ellen) Modified on 3/9/2021 (ldi).
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ellen Eardley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24199575. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Illinois Certificate of Good Standing).(Eardley, Ellen) Modified on 3/4/2021 (aea).
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #40 MOTION for Ellen Eardley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24199575. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Illinois. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #38 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. By April 30, 2021, the parties shall complete fact discovery. By June 14, 2021, the parties shall complete expert discovery. Any interim deadlines shall be adjusted in accordance with this schedule. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/1/2021) (cf) Modified on 3/1/2021 (cf).
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 6/14/2021. Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2021. (cf)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Non-Expert Fact Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Aisha L. Rich dated February 24, 2021. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Civil Case Management Plan, #2 Exhibit Civil Case Management Plan (Redline)).(Rich, Aisha)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Aisha Rich dated November 6, 2020 re: Right-to-Sue Letters. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Rich, Aisha)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #25 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re: #25 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Declaration of Michael D. Lieder. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #25 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Cyrus Mehri to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22104609. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Mehri, Cyrus) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bcu).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #33 MOTION for Cyrus Mehri to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22104609. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Connecticutt;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury, except for any issues unique to any requests for equitable relief, which shall be tried to the Court. All non-expert fact discovery for this phase of the litigation shall be completed no later than 150 days from the date of this Order. Depositions to be completed by 150 days from the date of this Order. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than 75 days from the completion of non-expert fact discovery. The parties will confer about their present best estimate of the length of trial after the Court decides Plaintiffs' motion for class certification. Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/6/2020) (kv)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/6/2020. (ca)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ON PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 34(a)(1), the parties agree that Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") will be produced as follows: 1. Documents created or stored electronically will not be produced in hard copy. All ESI will be produced with the metadata requested below to the extent that it exists. 2. Documents originating in spreadsheet such as Excel or any document that cannot be converted to TIF will be produced in native form. For deliverables containing native files, a native file path/link will be included in the metadata load file. Additionally, a Bates-stamped TIF placeholder will be included in the production and reflected in the image load file. The number of native files per folder will be limited to 1,000 files. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/6/2020) (kv)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Amanda C. Croushore dated October 5, 2020 re: Proposed ESI Order. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed ESI Order).(Croushore, Amanda)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Counsel for All Parties dated September 29, 2020 re: Initial Pre-Trial Conference Submission. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed Protective Order)).(Croushore, Amanda)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION of Amanda C. Croushore in Support re: #25 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (FPI Notice of Examination), #3 Exhibit C (BI Notice of Examination)).(Croushore, Amanda)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #25 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Michael Lieder to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ca)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Aisha Rich to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ca)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. It is ORDERED that: 1. By September 21, 2020, Defendant shall file their motion to dismiss; 2. By October 19, 2020, Plaintiff shall file its opposition papers; and 3. By November 2, 2020, Defendant shall reply. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 19. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/17/2020) (kv)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/21/2020. Responses due by 10/19/2020 Replies due by 11/2/2020. (kv)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Michael Lieder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21080520. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Michael Lieder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21080520. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael Lieder dated August 6, 2020 re: #19 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Amanda C. Croushore dated August 3, 2020. . Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Amanda C. Croushore dated August 3, 2020. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Aisha Rich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20927778. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Rich, Aisha)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Aisha Rich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20927778. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Aisha Lauren Rich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-20817701. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond. (Attachments: #1 Rich Affidavit, #2 NY Certificate of Good Standing, #3 PA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order).(Rich, Aisha) Modified on 7/23/2020 (aea).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #17 MOTION for Aisha Lauren Rich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-20817701. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Pennsylvania; Affidavit is not notarized. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew L. Berman on behalf of AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Berman, Matthew)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Wyn Kane on behalf of AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Kane, Sara)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert John Valli, Jr on behalf of AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Valli, Robert)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken viatelephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/22/2020) (ama)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/22/2020) (cf)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 11:00 a.m., on October 6, 2020, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code: 5598827. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) Initial Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/22/2020) (ama)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/22/2020) (cf)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Amanda C. Croushore dated May 22, 2020. Document filed by City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Christine Croushore on behalf of City of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: City of New York answer due 8/3/2020. (cf)
May 9, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 1:17-cv-9447 and declined by Judge J. Paul Oetken and returned to wheel for assignment. (ad)
May 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
May 9, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lieder, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT against City of New York. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, James Nova, Darryl Chalmers, Glenn Mendez, Darren Connors, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(jgo)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Lieder. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael Lieder to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed or dated by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Lieder to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Lieder. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Darryl Chalmers; Darren Connors; Glenn Mendez; James Nova; Fatima Q. Rosemond; AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507; CITY OF NEW YORK. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge J. Paul Oetken as possibly related to 17-cv-9447. (jgo)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17 Civ. 09447 (JPO). Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, Darryl Chalmers, Darren Connors, Glenn Mendez, James Nova, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lieder, Michael) Modified on 5/4/2020 (jgo).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19662761)Document filed by AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507, James Nova, Darryl Chalmers, Glenn Mendez, Darren Connors, Fatima Q. Rosemond..(Lieder, Michael) Modified on 5/4/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chalmers et al v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatima Q. Rosemond
Represented By: Cyrus Mehri
Represented By: Desiree Langley (Sholes)
Represented By: Ellen Eardley
Represented By: Aisha Rich
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Matthew L. Berman
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Chalmers
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Desiree Langley (Sholes)
Represented By: Aisha Rich
Represented By: Cyrus Mehri
Represented By: Ellen Eardley
Represented By: Matthew L. Berman
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Mendez
Represented By: Ellen Eardley
Represented By: Aisha Rich
Represented By: Cyrus Mehri
Represented By: Desiree Langley (Sholes)
Represented By: Matthew L. Berman
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFSCME District Council 37 Local 2507
Represented By: Aisha Rich
Represented By: Cyrus Mehri
Represented By: Desiree Langley (Sholes)
Represented By: Ellen Eardley
Represented By: Matthew L. Berman
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nova
Represented By: Cyrus Mehri
Represented By: Matthew L. Berman
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Represented By: Aisha Rich
Represented By: Desiree Langley (Sholes)
Represented By: Ellen Eardley
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Connors
Represented By: Ellen Eardley
Represented By: Aisha Rich
Represented By: Sara Wyn Kane
Represented By: Cyrus Mehri
Represented By: Desiree Langley (Sholes)
Represented By: Matthew L. Berman
Represented By: Robert John Valli, Jr
Represented By: Michael Lieder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Amanda Christine Croushore
Represented By: Kami Zumbach Barker
Represented By: Rebecca Gibson Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?