Cepeda et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: willie murray, jeffrey simon, j'von johnson, devon cameron, devin Burns, samson walston, Unique Gray, Evan zachary, elijah moody, julian cepeda and nazeem francis
Defendant: C.O. Joseph Moore, Lt Mark Valvo, C.O. Jarred Jarosz, C.O. Frank Foe Shield #323, Commissioner Cynthia Brann, Captain "John" Harris, Major Brian Mooney, C.O. Frank Foes #13-22, 28-37, C.O. Thuan Ton, C.O. Michael Beliveau, Sheriff Craig D. Apple, Sr., frank Foes 1-3, 6-8, 23-25,38-43, C.O. "John" Dominick, Chief Brian Sullivan, Captain Edward Williams, County of Albany, CITY OF NEW YORK, C.O. Joseph Kelly, C.O. Damien Anzalone, C.O. Frank Foe Shield #99, Nurse Melissa "Missy" Mylroie, C.O. Nicholas Mustico, Sgt Michael Grimes, Lt Frank Foe 9, C.O. Jeffrey Hunt, C.O. Matthew Labombard, C.O. Frank Harris, C.O. Joseph Haley, Superintendant Michael Lyons, C.O. Ryan Lawson, Lt Anthony Torrisi, Lt/Sgt Frank Foes 4-5,10-12, 26-27, Correction Officer Anthony Coppolo and C.O. Vincent Adams
Case Number: 1:2020cv03483
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark David Zuckerman on behalf of Cynthia Brann..(Zuckerman, Mark)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Timothy P. Tripp, Esq. dated 06/05/2020. Melissa "Missy" Mylroie answer due 9/1/2020.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/10/2020). (mde)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer on behalf of Albany County Defendants, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Michael Goldstein dated May 26, 2020. County of Albany answer due 9/1/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/10/2020). (mde)
June 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jesse Isaac Hoberman-Kelly on behalf of Devin Burns, Devon Cameron, Julian Cepeda, Nazeem Francis, Unique Gray, J'von Johnson, Elijah Moody, Willie Murray, Jeffrey Simon, Samson Walston, Evan Zachary..(Hoberman-Kelly, Jesse)
June 5, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Timothy P. Tripp, Esq. dated 06/05/2020. Document filed by Melissa "Missy" Mylroie..(Tripp, Timothy)
June 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robin Bartlett Phelan on behalf of Melissa "Missy" Mylroie..(Phelan, Robin)
June 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Patrick Tripp on behalf of Melissa "Missy" Mylroie..(Tripp, Timothy)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on behalf of Albany County Defendants addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Michael Goldstein dated May 26, 2020. Document filed by County of Albany..(Goldstein, Michael)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Vincent Adams served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Damien Anzalone served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Craig D. Apple, Sr served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Michael Beliveau served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Cynthia Brann served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020; City of New York served on 5/9/2020, answer due 6/1/2020; Anthony Coppolo served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; County of Albany served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; "John" Dominick served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Frank Foe #9 served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Frank Foe Shield #323 served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Frank Foe Shield #99 served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Frank Foes #1-3, 6-8, 23-25, and 38-43 served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Frank Foes #13-22 and 28-37 served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Frank Foes #4, 5, 10, 11, 12, 26, and 27 served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Michael Grimes served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Joseph Haley served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; "John" Harris served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Frank Harris served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Jeffrey Hunt served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Jarred Jarosz served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Joseph Kelly served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Matthew Labombard served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Ryan Lawson served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Michael Lyons served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Brian Mooney served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Joseph Moore served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Nicholas Mustico served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Melissa "Missy" Mylroie served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Brian Sullivan served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020; Thuan Ton served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Anthony Torrisi served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Mark Valvo served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Edward Williams served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. Service was accepted by Michael S. Monteleone. Document filed by Nazeem Francis; Evan Zachary; Julian Cepeda; Unique Gray; J'von Johnson; Elijah Moody; Samson Walston; Devin Burns; Devon Cameron; Jeffrey Simon; Willie Murray..(Hoberman-Kelly, Jesse)
May 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Goldstein on behalf of Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D. Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, Anthony Coppolo, County of Albany, "John" Dominick, Michael Grimes, Joseph Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jeffrey Hunt, Jarred Jarosz, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Brian Mooney, Joseph Moore, Nicholas Mustico, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo..(Goldstein, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Goldstein on behalf of Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D. Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, Anthony Coppolo, County of Albany, "John" Dominick, Michael Grimes, Joseph Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jeffrey Hunt, Jarred Jarosz, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Brian Mooney, Joseph Moore, Nicholas Mustico, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo..(Goldstein, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Mark D. Zuckerman dated May 21, 2020 re: assignment of Magistrate Judge in light of plaintiffs' related case statement. Document filed by City of New York..(Zuckerman, Mark)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Mark D. Zuckerman dated May 18, 2020.. All Defendants. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/19/2020). (mde)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Mark D. Zuckerman dated May 18, 2020. Document filed by City of New York..(Zuckerman, Mark)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark David Zuckerman on behalf of City of New York..(Zuckerman, Mark)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D. Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, Cynthia Brann, City of New York, Anthony Coppolo, County of Albany, "John" Dominick, Frank Foe #9, Frank Foe Shield #323, Frank Foe Shield #99, Frank Foes #1-3, 6-8, 23-25, and 38-43, Frank Foes #13-22 and 28-37, Frank Foes #4, 5, 10, 11, 12, 26, and 27, Nazeem Francis, Unique Gray, Michael Grimes, Joseph Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jeffrey Hunt, Jarred Jarosz, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Elijah Moody, Brian Mooney, Joseph Moore, Willie Murray, Nicholas Mustico, Melissa "Missy" Mylroie, Brian Sullivan, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo, Edward Williams..(pc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldman, Steven)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK; NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION (DOC) COMMISSIONER CYNTHIA BRANN; DOC BUREAU CHIEF BRIAN SULLIVAN; DOC CAPTAIN EDWARD WILLIAMS; NEW YORK CITY CORRECTION OFFICERS FRANK FOES #1-3, 6-8, 23-25, and 38-43; COUNTY OF ALBANY; ALBANY COUNTY SHERIFF CRAIG D. APPLE, SR.; ALBANY COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY SUPERINTENDENT MICHAEL LYONS; MAJOR BRIAN MOONEY, LIEUTENANTS ANTHONY TORRISI, MARK VALVO, and LIEUTENANT FRANK FOE #9; LIEUTENANT/SERGEANT FRANK FOES #4, 5, 10, 11, 12, 26, and 27; CAPTAIN JOHN HARRIS; SERGEANT MICHAEL GRIMES; CORRECTION OFFICERS MATTHEW LABOMBARD, JOSEPH HALEY, MICHAEL BELIVEAU, VINCENT ADAMS, JOSEPH KELLY, DAMIEN ANZALONE, RYAN LAWSON, JARRED JAROSZ, FRANK HARRIS, THUAN TON, JEFFREY HUNT, JOSEPH MOORE, ANTHONY COPPOLO, NICHOLAS MUSTICO, JOHN DOMINICK, FRANK FOE SHIELD #99, FRANK FOE SHIELD #323, and FRANK FOES #13-22 and 28-37; and NURSE MELISSA MISSY MYLROIE, re: #4 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Devin Burns, Devon Cameron, Julian Cepeda, Nazeem Francis, Unique Gray, J'von Johnson, Elijah Moody, Willie Murray, Jeffrey Simon, Samson Walston, Evan Zachary..(Goldman, Steven)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven H. Goldman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: defendants. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven H. Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,,,,,,,,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven H. Goldman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; Nature of Suit code 440 (Civil Rights: Other); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1983; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 550 (Prisoner: Civil Rights); the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Steven H. Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption. If all of the party names do not fit, use leading party name followed by 'et al'; the similar case information is on the incorrect section of the PDF; the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 7, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #4 Complaint,,,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-19711450, paid on 5/5/2020..(jgo)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D. Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, Cynthia Brann, CITY OF NEW YORK, Anthony Coppolo, County of Albany, "John" Dominick, Frank Foe 9, Frank Foe Shield #323, Frank Foe Shield #99, Frank Foes #13-22, 28-37, frank Foes 1-3, 6-8, 23-25,38-43, Frank Foes 4-5,10-12, 26-27, Michael Grimes, Joseph Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jeffrey Hunt, Jarred Jarosz, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Brian Mooney, Joseph Moore, Nicholas Mustico, Melissa "Missy" Mylroie, Brian Sullivan, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo, Edward Williams. Document filed by nazeem francis, Evan zachary, julian cepeda, Unique Gray, j'von johnson, elijah moody, samson walston, devin Burns, devon cameron, jeffrey simon, willie murray..(Goldman, Steven)
May 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven H. Goldman to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 5/11/2020. (jgo)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldman, Steven) Modified on 5/7/2020 (jgo).
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, 100 Church Street, New York, NY 10007 New York City Department of Correction (DOC) Commissioner Cynthia Brann, NYC Department of Correction, 75-20 Astoria Blvd., East Elmhurst, New York 11370 DOC Bureau Chief Brian Sullivan, NYC Department of Correction, 75-20 Astoria Blvd., East Elmhurst, New York 11370 DOC Captain Edward Williams, NYC Department of Correction, 75-20 Astoria Blvd., East Elmhurst, New York 11370 DOC Correction Officers Frank Foes #1-3, 6-8, 23-25, and 38-43, NYC Department of Correction, 75-20 Astoria Blvd., East Elmhurst, New York 11370 County of Albany, Office of the County Attorney, Harold L. Joyce Albany County Office Bldg., 112 State Street, Room 600, Albany, NY 12207 Albany County Sheriff Craig D. Apple, Sr., Albany County Sheriff, 16 Eagle Street, Albany, NY 12207 Albany County Correctional Facility Superintendent Michael Lyons, Albany County Correctional Facility, 840 Albany Shaker Road, Albany, NY 12211 Albany County Correctional Facility Major Brian Mooney, Albany County Correctional Facility, 840 Albany Shaker Road, Albany, NY 12211 Albany County Correctional Facility Lieutenant Anthony Torrisi, Albany County Correctional Facility, 840 Albany Shaker Road, Albany, NY 12211 Albany County Correctional Facility Lieutenant Mark Valvo, Albany County Correctional Facility, 840 Albany Shaker Road, Albany, NY 12211 Albany County Correctional Lieutenant Frank Foe #9, Albany County Correctional Facility, 840 Albany Shaker Road, Albany, NY 12211 Albany County Correctional Facility Lieutenant/Sergeant Frank Foes #4, 5, 10, 11, 12, 26, and 27, Albany County Correctional Facility, 840 Albany Shaker Road, Albany, NY 12211 Albany County Correctional Facility Captain John Harris, Albany County Correctional Facility, 840 Albany Shaker Road, Albany, NY 12211 Albany County Correctional Facility Sergeant Michael Grimes, Albany County Correctional Facility, 840 Albany Shaker Road, Albany, NY 12211 Albany County Correctional Facility Correction Officers: Matthew Labombard, Joseph Haley, Michael Beliveau, Vincent Adams, Joseph Kelly, Damien Anzalone, Ryan Lawson, Jarred Jarosz, Frank Harris, Thuan Ton, Jeffrey Hunt, Joseph Moore, Anthony Coppolo, Nicholas Mustico, John Dominick, Frank Foe Shield #99, Frank Foe Shield #323, and Frank Foes #13-22 and 28-37; Albany County Correctional Facility, 840 Albany Shaker Road, Albany, NY 12211 Nurse Melissa Missy Mylroie, Albany County Correctional Facility, 840 Albany Shaker Road, Albany, NY 12211, re: Complaint. Document filed by devin Burns, Unique Gray, devon cameron, julian cepeda, nazeem francis, j'von johnson, elijah moody, willie murray, jeffrey simon, samson walston, Evan zachary..(Goldman, Steven) Modified on 5/7/2020 (jgo).
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 RELATED CASE AFFIDAVIT of Steven Goldman re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-12306-CM. Document filed by devin Burns, Unique Gray, devon cameron, julian cepeda, nazeem francis, j'von johnson, elijah moody, willie murray, jeffrey simon, samson walston, Evan zachary..(Goldman, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cepeda et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: willie murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: jeffrey simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: j'von johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: devon cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: devin Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: samson walston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unique Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: elijah moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: julian cepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: nazeem francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Joseph Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Mark Valvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Jarred Jarosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Frank Foe Shield #323
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Cynthia Brann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain "John" Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Brian Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Frank Foes #13-22, 28-37
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Thuan Ton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Michael Beliveau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Craig D. Apple, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: frank Foes 1-3, 6-8, 23-25,38-43
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. "John" Dominick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Brian Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Albany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Joseph Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Damien Anzalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Frank Foe Shield #99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Melissa "Missy" Mylroie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Nicholas Mustico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Michael Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Frank Foe 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Jeffrey Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Matthew Labombard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Frank Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Joseph Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendant Michael Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Ryan Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Anthony Torrisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt/Sgt Frank Foes 4-5,10-12, 26-27
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Anthony Coppolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Vincent Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?