Ampen v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Akua Ampen
Defendant: Dr. Nicole Nevadunsky, Dr. Jonathan Trambert, Dr. Renee Rolston, Dr. Hye J. Heo, Dr. Kafui Demasio, Peter Fianti, Dr. Eve Karkowski, Dr. Alexander Kucherov, Dr. Jane Owen, United States of America, Dr. Dennis Kuo, Dr. Maria Rosner and Montifiore Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv03495
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 22:2702
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Kafui Demasio, Alexander Kucherov, Dennis Kuo, Montifiore Medical Center, Nicole Nevadunsky, Jonathan Trambert. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Verification).(Spisek, Milan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Montifiore Medical Center..(Spisek, Milan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Milan Paul Spisek on behalf of Jonathan Trambert..(Spisek, Milan)
June 4, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America..(Cowart, Brandon)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter Response to Court Directive (Doc No.: 5, filed by Nicole Nevadunsky, Dennis Kuo, Montifiore Medical Center, Kafui Demasio, Alexander Kucherov. ENDORSEMENT: Substituted service of process by email on counsel for Defendants Kafui Demasio, Alexander Kucherov, Dennis Kuo, Montifiore Medical Center, and Nicole Nevadunsky shall be deemed sufficient service of process as to these defendants. Plaintiff's request to serve the remaining defendants in this manner is DENIED. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of my May 5, 2020 Order to properly serve the remaining defendants. In accordance with that Order, Defendant Dr. Renee Rolston shall be terminated from this action., (Renee Rolston terminated.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/13/20) (yv)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ronemus, Michael)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Milan P. Spisek dated 5/13/20 re: Response to Court Directive (Doc No.: 5). Document filed by Kafui Demasio, Alexander Kucherov, Dennis Kuo, Montifiore Medical Center, Nicole Nevadunsky..(Spisek, Milan)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Milan Paul Spisek on behalf of Kafui Demasio, Alexander Kucherov, Dennis Kuo, Montifiore Medical Center, Nicole Nevadunsky..(Spisek, Milan)
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kafui Demasio, Peter Fanti, Hye J. Heo, Eve Karkowski, Alexander Kucherov, Dennis Kuo, Montifiore Medical Center, Nicole Nevadunsky, Jane Owen, Renee Rolston, Maria Rosner, Jonathan Trambert, United States of America..(pne)
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DR. PETER FANTI, DR. EVE KARKOWSKI, DR. ALEXANDER KUCHEROV, DR. HYE J.HEO, DR. JANE OWEN, DR. NICOLE NEVADUNSKY, DR. DENNIS KUO, DR. MARIA ROSNER, DR. KAFUI DEMASIO, DR. JONATHAN TRAMBERT, DR. RENEE ROLSTON and MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Akua Ampen..(Ronemus, Michael)
May 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael B. Ronemus to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney; leave the date field blank; the attached rider contains 9 party names, but 13 are listed in the docket entry text; party names on the rider contain typographical errors; the names of Kennis Kuo, Peter C. Fanti, and Eve Karkowsky must be corrected and appear exactly as they do on the pleading caption; the name of any entity listed after that of a named defendant must include 'c/o' or 'via'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST 'As To' PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DR. PETER FAINTI, DR. EVE KARKOWSKI, DR. ALEXANDER KUCHEROV, DR. HYE J. HEO, DR. JANE OWEN, DR. NICOLE NEVADUNSKY, DR. DENNIS KUO, DR MARIA ROSNER, DR KAFUI DEMASIO, DR. JONATHAN TRAMBERT, DR. RENEE ROLSTON AND MONTIFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Akua Ampen..(Ronemus, Michael) Modified on 5/12/2020 (pne).
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, Dr. Peter Fainti, Dr. Eve Karkowski, Dr. Alexander Kucherov, Dr. Hye J. Heo, Dr. Jane Owen, Dr. Nicole Nevadunsky, Dr. Dennis Kuo, Dr. Maria Rosner, Dr. Kafui Demasio, Dr. Jonathan Trambert, Dr. Renee Rolston and Montefiore Medical Center, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Akua Ampen..(Ronemus, Michael) Modified on 5/12/2020 (pne).
May 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael B. Ronemus to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the docket entry text must list all of the party names whom summons is for and must not include 'et al'; party/company name listed after party of record must include 'care of c/o' or 'via';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America Et al., re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Akua Ampen..(Ronemus, Michael) Modified on 5/11/2020 (jgo).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4 Letter filed by Akua Ampen. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted in part. Counsel for the Montefiore Defendants previously represented that he has "not yet been able to confer with [his] clients, who are physicians, due to [the] present pandemic. As such, [he] [was] unable to confirm... that service has indeed occurred," but that "once [he] can confirm that Dr. Nicole Nevadunsky, Dr. Kennis Kuo, Dr. Kafui Demario, Dr. Alex Kucherov, Dr. Eve Karkowsky, and Montefiore Medical Center ha[ve] been served, then [he] would withdraw the [] application" to dismiss. (18-cv-9474 ECF No. 20, at 2.) Counsel for Defendants is directed to respond to Plaintiff's letter, and state whether Defendants are willing to waive service under the circumstances. Because Defense counsel has not yet entered an appearance in this new action, Plaintiff is directed to meet and confer with Defense counsel to confirm their knowledge of the new docket number in this case. Once Defense counsel responds to this Order, I will rule on Plaintiff's remaining application. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/8/2020) (rro)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Robert Vilensky, Esq. dated 05/06/2020 re: Regarding New Complaint and Service on Defendants. Document filed by Akua Ampen..(Ronemus, Michael)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Akua Ampen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Merit).(Ronemus, Michael)
May 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael B. Ronemus. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
May 5, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
May 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kafui Demasio, Peter Fianti, Hye J. Heo, Eve Karkowski, Alexander Kucherov, Dennis Kuo, Montifiore Medical Center, Nicole Nevadunsky, Jane Owen, Renee Rolston, Maria Rosner, Jonathan Trambert, United States of America. (Filing Fee $ $400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18486383)Document filed by Akua Ampen.(gp)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER: (Original Order docketed incase 18-cv-9474 Document#24) Clerk shall file the complaint at Document 16 under a new case number by initiating a new docket, and assign the newly filed action to me. The complaint shall be deemed to have been filed on January 13, 2020. The Clerk shall also file a copy of this order on the new docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall request the issuance of new summonses and effect service of the complaint and summonses on Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions in case number 18-cv-9474 are dismissed as moot, without prejudice to refile on the new docket. Defendants shall have 30 days from the date the new case is opened to file new responses to the complaint. Case number 18-cv-9474 shall remain terminated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Dr. Renee Rolston shall remain terminated from the new action, given Plaintiff's representation that "Plaintiff does not object to dismissal of this case as to [Rolston]." (Doc. 19, at 6.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/4/2020) (gp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ampen v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akua Ampen
Represented By: Michael B. Ronemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Nicole Nevadunsky
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jonathan Trambert
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Renee Rolston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hye J. Heo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kafui Demasio
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Fianti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Eve Karkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Alexander Kucherov
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jane Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Dennis Kuo
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Maria Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montifiore Medical Center
Represented By: Milan Paul Spisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?