Wunderlich Securities, Inc. et al v. Dominick & Dickerman LLC et al
Petitioner: Gary Wunderlich and Wunderlich Securities, Inc.
Respondent: Michael J. Campbell and Dominick & Dickerman LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03507
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: On May 4, 2020, Petitioners in the action styled as Dominick & Dickerman LLC v. Wunderlich Securities, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 3470 (KPF), filed a petition to confirm an arbitral award. (20 Civ. 3470, Dkt. #1). On May 5, 2020, Respondents filed a petition in a related case, Wunderlich Securities, Inc. v. Dominick & Dickerman LLC, No. 20 Civ. 3507 (KPF), seeking to vacate the same arbitral award. (20 Civ. 3507, Dkt. #1). Given the converse nature of the two actions, the Court finds it appropriate, and hereby ORDERS, that the two actions be consolidated under the case number of 20 Civ. 3470 (KPF). Additionally, it is the Court's practice to adjudicate petitions to confirm and/or vacate arbitral awards by summary judgment. Accordingly, the Court sets the following schedule for the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment: On or before June 30, 2020, the parties will file their respective motions to confirm and vacate the underlying arbitral award, and on or before July 14, 2020, the parties will file opposing briefs to their opponents' motions. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to docket this Order in both actions. The Clerk of Court is then directed to close Case No. 20 Civ. 3507 (KPF), and the parties are directed that all future filings are to be made in Case No. 20 Civ. 3470 (KPF). (Motions due by 6/30/2020., Responses due by 7/14/2020) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03470-KPF, 1:20-cv-03507-KPF (rro)
May 12, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-03470-KPF.. (rro)
May 12, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
May 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
May 12, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-03470-KPF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M Woolsey, III on behalf of Gary Wunderlich..(Woolsey, James)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael J. Campbell..(pne)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dominick & Dickerman LLC..(pne)
May 6, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 20CV3470. (pne)
May 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-03470. Document filed by Gary Wunderlich, Wunderlich Securities, Inc...(Korn, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael J. Campbell, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Gary Wunderlich, Wunderlich Securities, Inc...(Korn, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dominick & Dickerman, LLC, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Gary Wunderlich, Wunderlich Securities, Inc...(Korn, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent B. Riley Financial Inc. for Wunderlich Securities, Inc.. Document filed by Wunderlich Securities, Inc...(Korn, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey B. Korn on behalf of Wunderlich Securities, Inc...(Korn, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Korn, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19715928).Document filed by Wunderlich Securities, Inc., Gary Wunderlich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - April 7, 2020 Arbitration Award).(Korn, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wunderlich Securities, Inc. et al v. Dominick & Dickerman LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Wunderlich
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Korn
Represented By: James M Woolsey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wunderlich Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael J. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dominick & Dickerman LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?