Modellbahn Ott Hobbies, Inc. v. Velcro USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Modellbahn Ott Hobbies, Inc.
Defendant: IncoPro Limited, Koala Tools LLC, American Tombow, Inc., Yellow Brand Protection, Velcro USA Inc., Rubiks Brand Limited Ltd. and Mattel Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03526
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332lb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosenbaum, Cory)
May 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Cory Jay Rosenbaum. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Modellbahn Ott Hobbies, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Cory Jay Rosenbaum. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Cory Jay Rosenbaum to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Invalid Nature of Suit and Basis of Jurisdiction combination. Refile selecting either a different Nature of Suit code or Basis of Jurisdiction code; Courthouse Assignment code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Modellbahn Ott Hobbies, Inc...(Rosenbaum, Cory)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosenbaum, Cory) Modified on 5/8/2020 (jgo).
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Tombow, Inc., IncoPro Limited, Koala Tools LLC, Mattel Inc., Rubiks Brand Limited Ltd., Velcro USA Inc., Yellow Brand Protection. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19745243)Document filed by Modellbahn Ott Hobbies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F).(Rosenbaum, Cory)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Cory Jay Rosenbaum. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Cory Jay Rosenbaum to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 5/12/2020. (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modellbahn Ott Hobbies, Inc. v. Velcro USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IncoPro Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koala Tools LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Tombow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellow Brand Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velcro USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubiks Brand Limited Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattel Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modellbahn Ott Hobbies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?