Key et al. v. Cuomo et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Bourgeois, Jacob Behr, Beth Lauren Baum, Linda Sarsour, Philip Mandelbaum, Vivia Johnson, Vanessa Agudelo, Vivian Johnson and Heather Key
Defendant: Douglas Kellner, Andrew Cuomo, Todd D Valentine, Andrew Spano, Robert A. Brehm, Douglas A. Kellner and Peter S. Kosinski
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Robert A. Brehm, Co-Executive Director, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE and Peter S. Kosinski, Co-Chair and Commissoner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE
Lead Plaintiff: Ms. Heather Key
Case Number: 1:2020cv03533
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 vp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Walter Hackett, III to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pleading deficiency must be cured in order for summons is issued; parties must be added. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Governor Andrew Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York; Douglas A. Kellner, Co-Chair and Commissioner, Andrew Spano, Commissioner, Peter S. Kosinski, CoChair and Commissioner, Todd D. Valentine, Co-Executive Director and Robert A. Brehm, Co-Executive Director,individually and in their official capacities at the New York State Board of Elections, and the New York State Board of Elections, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Vanessa Agudelo, Beth Lauren Baum, Jacob Behr, Jacqueline Bourgeois, Vivian Johnson, Heather Key, Philip Mandelbaum, Linda Sarsour..(Hackett, Walter) Modified on 5/13/2020 (jgo).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Accordingly, for the reasons stated above, the application for emergency relief is DENIED, and the case is STAYED pending resolution of the appeal in Yang v. New York State Board of Elections, No. 20-1494 (2d Cir. May 6, 2020). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/11/2020) (cf)
May 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Walter Hackett, III to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pleading deficiency must be cured before summons could be issued. Party names must be added; the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption. If all of the party names do not fit, use leading party name followed by 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 9, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-03325-AT. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
May 9, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
May 9, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hackett, Walter)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-03325. Document filed by Vanessa Agudelo, Beth Lauren Baum, Jacob Behr, Jacqueline Bourgeois, Vivian Johnson, Heather Key, Philip Mandelbaum, Linda Sarsour..(Hackett, Walter)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Governor Andrew Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York; Douglas A. Kellner, Co-Chair and Commissioner, Andrew Spano, Commissioner, Peter S. Kosinski, CoChair and Commissioner, Todd D. Valentine, Co-Executive Director and Robert A. Brehm, Co-Executive Director, individually and in their official capacities at the New York State Board of Elections, and the New York State Board of Elections, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Vanessa Agudelo, Beth Lauren Baum, Jacob Behr, Jacqueline Bourgeois, Vivian Johnson, Heather Key, Philip Mandelbaum, Linda Sarsour..(Hackett, Walter) Modified on 5/11/2020 (jgo).
May 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 7, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 20cv3325. (pc)
May 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Walter Hackett, III to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Each party's name that is written on the summons must be listed on the docket entry for the summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Walter Hackett, III re: Document No. #4 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Philip Mandelbaum, Jacqueline Bourgeois, Heather Key, Vivia Johnson, Jacob Behr, Beth Lauren Baum, Linda Sarsour, Vanessa Agudelo to CM ECF as plaintiffs with the party text "on behalf of all others similarly situated" for each. Add Robert A. Brehm as a defendant with the party text "in their official capacities at the New York State Board of Elections, and the New York State Board of Elections". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pc).
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Walter Hackett, III. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 441 (Civil Rights: Voting); Arbitration code v (Voluntary); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 440 (Civil Rights: Other); the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Walter Hackett, III to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. Do not fill out the citizenship of principal parties if Federal Question Basis of Jurisdiction is selected. Office was not selected. (pc) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pc).
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Walter Hackett, III, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Walter Hackett, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andrew Cuomo, Douglas Kellner, Andrew Spano, Peter S. Kosinski, Co-Chair and Commissoner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, Todd D Valentine, Robert A. Brehm, Co-Executive Director, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, Philip Mandelbaum, Jacqueline Bourgeois, Heather Key, Vivia Johnson, Jacob Behr, Beth Lauren Baum, Linda Sarsour, Vanessa Agudelo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
May 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #3 FIRST MOTION for Walter Henry Hackett, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19726617. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Cuomo et al, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Vanessa Agudelo, Beth Lauren Baum, Jacob Behr, Jacqueline Bourgeois, Vivia Johnson, Heather Key, Philip Mandelbaum, Linda Sarsour..(Hackett, Walter) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pc).
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hackett, Walter) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pc).
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Walter Hackett, III on behalf of Vanessa Agudelo, Beth Lauren Baum, Jacob Behr, Jacqueline Bourgeois, Heather Key, Philip Mandelbaum, Linda Sarsour. New Address: Law Office of Walter Hackett, PO Box 1357, Walnut, CA, USA 91788, 626-737-8552..(Hackett, Walter)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Andrew Cuomo, Douglas Kellner, Andrew Spano, Peter S. Kosinski, Co-Chair and Commissoner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, Todd D Valentine, Robert A. Brehm, Co-Executive Director, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE. Document filed by Philip Mandelbaum, Jacqueline Bourgeois, Heather Key, Vivia Johnson, Jacob Behr, Beth Lauren Baum, Linda Sarsour, Vanessa Agudelo..(Hackett, Walter)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST MOTION for Walter Henry Hackett, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19726617. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Heather Key. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Hackett, Walter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #3 CoGS) (ad).
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walter Hackett, III on behalf of Heather Key. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Hackett, Walter)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19726518)Document filed by Heather Key..(Hackett, Walter) Modified on 5/6/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key et al. v. Cuomo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd D Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Brehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A. Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter S. Kosinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Bourgeois
Represented By: Walter Hackett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Behr
Represented By: Walter Hackett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Lauren Baum
Represented By: Walter Hackett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sarsour
Represented By: Walter Hackett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Mandelbaum
Represented By: Walter Hackett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivia Johnson
Represented By: Walter Hackett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Agudelo
Represented By: Walter Hackett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Johnson
Represented By: Walter Hackett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Key
Represented By: Walter Hackett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Robert A. Brehm, Co-Executive Director, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Peter S. Kosinski, Co-Chair and Commissoner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Ms. Heather Key
Represented By: Walter Hackett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?