Neher v. Coach Leasing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hayley Neher
Defendant: Bernardo Fernandez and Coach Leasing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03560
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No additional parties may be joined after or Amended Pleadings may be filed until 8/5/2020. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 10/30/2020. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by 9/30/2020. If you have identified types of experts in question 9(a), all expert discovery shall be completed no later than 12/15/2020. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 4 days. On 11/24/2020 at 10:30 A.M. a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. Amended Pleadings due by 8/5/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/5/2020. Deposition due by 9/30/2020. Fact Discovery due by 10/30/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/15/2020. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/29/2020) (cf)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: ORDERED that the July 2, 2020, initial pretrial conference is cancelled. If the parties believe that a conference would nevertheless be useful, they should inform the Court immediately so the conference can be reinstated. The case management plan and scheduling order will issue in a separate order. The parties' attention is particularly directed to the provisions for periodic status letters, and the need for a pre-motion letter to avoid cancellation of the final conference and setting of a trial date. The parties should be aware that the Court does not extend the deadlines for fact and expert discovery absent compelling circumstances and that this order does not stay or prolong discovery for the purpose of settlement discussions. It is further ORDERED that if Defendant(s) seek to file a motion to dismiss, they shall file a pre-motion letter pursuant to Individual Rules III.A.1 and III.C.2. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/29/2020) (ama)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul B. Edelman on behalf of Hayley Neher..(Edelman, Paul)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel M. Schwartz and Paul Edelman, jointly dated June 29, 2020 re: Joint Letter and proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Coach Leasing, Inc., Bernardo Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Case Management Plan).(Schwartz, Daniel)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that if Defendants have been in communication with Plaintiff, then the parties shall file the joint status letter and proposed case management plan as soon as possible and no later than June 29, 2020, at noon. If Defendants have not been in communication with Plaintiff, Defendants shall file a status letter regarding the efforts to contact Plaintiff and request an adjournment of the initial conference as soon as possible and no later than June 29, 2020, at noon. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/26/2020) (cf)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/2/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/18/2020) (cf)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Coach USA, Inc. for Coach Leasing, Inc.. Document filed by Coach Leasing, Inc., Bernardo Fernandez..(Schwartz, Daniel)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schwartz, Daniel)
May 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Mark Schwartz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
May 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Daniel Mark Schwartz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 154798/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19742291).Document filed by Bernardo Fernandez, Coach Leasing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Aff. of Serv. on Mr. Fernandez, #3 Exhibit Aff. of Serv. on Coach Leasing, Inc., #4 Exhibit Answer, #5 Exhibit Combined Demands via US Mail, #6 Exhibit Combined Demands via Electronic Mail, #7 Exhibit Good Faith Email, #8 Exhibit Pl.'s Response to Good Faith Email, #9 Exhibit Pl.'s RJI).(Schwartz, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neher v. Coach Leasing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernardo Fernandez
Represented By: Daniel Mark Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coach Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Mark Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayley Neher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?