Murray v. Cuomo et al
Plaintiff: Scherie S. Murray
Defendant: Miguelina Camilo, Simon Shamoun, New York State Board of Elections, Douglas A Kellner, Co-Chair and Commissioner individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, Andrew Cuomo, Gino A. Marmorato, Josel Miguel Araujo, Andrew Spano, Commissioner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, tiffany townsend, Peter S. Kosinski, Co-Chair and Commissoner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, michael michel, John Wm. Zaccone and Board of Elections of the City of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv03571
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 vc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Josel Miguel Araujo, Board of Elections of the City of New York, Miguelina Camilo, Andrew Cuomo, Douglas A Kellner, Co-Chair and Commissioner individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, Peter S. Kosinski, Co-Chair and Commissoner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, Gino A. Marmorato, New York State Board of Elections, Simon Shamoun, Andrew Spano, Commissioner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, John Wm. Zaccone, michael michel, tiffany townsend. Document filed by Scherie S. Murray. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Paul, Richard)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #15 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Scherie S. Murray. USCA Case Number 20-1584. Appellant moves to withdraw the appeal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 05/29/2020..(nd)
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 FIRST CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: #15 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #14 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,. Document filed by Scherie S. Murray..(Paul, Richard)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. Document filed by Scherie S. Murray. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19871163. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Paul, Richard) Modified on 5/18/2020 (tp).
May 18, 2020 Appeal Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #16 Corrected Notice of Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-19871163, paid on 5/18/2020. (tp)
May 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Paul, Richard to RE-FILE Document No. #15 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order/judgment being appealed was not selected. Re-file the appeal using the event type Corrected Notice of Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed. (tp)
May 18, 2020 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #16 Corrected Notice of Appeal filed by Scherie S. Murray were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
May 18, 2020 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #16 Corrected Notice of Appeal. (tp)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION & ORDER DENYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Upon review of the Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and supporting papers, Defendants' materials submitted in opposition, and the parties' arguments during the May 15 hearing, and after due consideration, the Motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. This opinion supplements the Court's ruling on the record at the May 15 conference. As discussed herein, the Court finds that no barrier to consideration of Plaintiff's motion exists, because the Rooker-Feldman doctrine is inapplicable here, and because there is not a fully developed record to enable the Court to rule on the application of res judicata. However, the Court concludes that Plaintiff has not met the burden required to justify a temporary restraining order in this case. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/16/2020) (ab) (Main Document 14 replaced on 5/18/2020) (mro). Modified on 5/18/2020 (mro).
May 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil: Telephone Conference held on 5/15/2020. See transcript for full details. Court reporter Andrew Walker present. (kgo) Modified on 5/15/2020 (kgo).
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Scherie S. Murray..(Paul, Richard)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW . Document filed by Scherie S. Murray..(Paul, Richard)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Richard St. Paul in Support. Document filed by Scherie S. Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Paul, Richard)
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #6 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,. Document filed by Andrew Cuomo, Douglas A Kellner, Co-Chair and Commissioner individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, Peter S. Kosinski, Co-Chair and Commissoner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, New York State Board of Elections, Andrew Spano, Commissioner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew L. Conrad, #2 Exhibit A: State court filings).(Conrad, Matthew)
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Lawrence Conrad on behalf of Andrew Cuomo, Douglas A Kellner, Co-Chair and Commissioner individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, Peter S. Kosinski, Co-Chair and Commissoner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, New York State Board of Elections, Andrew Spano, Commissioner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE..(Conrad, Matthew)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #6 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,. Document filed by Josel Miguel Araujo, Board of Elections of the City of New York, Miguelina Camilo, Gino A. Marmorato, Simon Shamoun, John Wm. Zaccone, michael michel, tiffany townsend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-compliance notice, #2 Exhibit Letter advising of invalidity, #3 Exhibit Email with instructions).(Kitzinger, Stephen)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Edward Kitzinger on behalf of Josel Miguel Araujo, Board of Elections of the City of New York, Miguelina Camilo, Gino A. Marmorato, Simon Shamoun, John Wm. Zaccone, michael michel, tiffany townsend..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon the application by plaintiff for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction and the supporting affidavits of Scherie S. Murray and Richard St. Paul, Esq., sworn on the 7th day of May, 2020, and upon the Complaint filed in this Action, it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants show cause before this Court at a telephone conference on May 15, 2020 at 2:00PM, why a temporary restraining order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b) should not issue. The conference can be accessed by dialing 888-278-0296 and entering access code 5195844. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that opposing papers, if any, shall be filed electronically with Court and served on Plaintiff's counsel by email on or before May 12, 2020 at 4:00PM. Plaintiff shall file any Reply papers on or before May 13, 2020 at 4:00PM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in addition to the merits of Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief, the Parties should address in their briefing, and be prepared to discuss at the conference, the proceeding described in Paragraph 50-51 of the Complaint, any available appeal, and whether that proceeding merits this Court's abstention from acting on the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff should serve a copy of this Order, the Complaint, and all papers in support of Plaintiff's application upon the Defendants via email on both the individual and organizational Defendants on or before 5:00PM today, May 8, 2020. Such action will be deemed good and sufficient service thereof. Plaintiff shall subsequently file an affidavit of service on ECF. Show Cause Response due by 5/12/2020. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/8/2020) (mro)
May 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Replies due by 5/13/2020.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Telephone Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil.) (mro)
May 8, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Peter S. Kosinski, Co-Chair and Commissoner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, Douglas A Kellner, Co-Chair and Commissioner individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, Andrew Spano, Commissioner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE, Josel Miguel Araujo, Miguelina Camilo, John Wm. Zaccone, tiffany townsend, michael michel, Simon Shamoun, Gino A. Marmorato added. Party added pursuant to #4 Complaint.Document filed by Scherie S. Murray. Related document: #4 Complaint..(Paul, Richard)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Paul, Richard)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Board of Elections of the City of New York, Andrew Cuomo, New York State Board of Elections. Document filed by Scherie S. Murray..(Paul, Richard)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document filed by Scherie S. Murray. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo of Law, #2 Affidavit) Related Document Number: [20cv3571]..(Paul, Richard) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document filed by Scherie S. Murray. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation per Rule 65) Related Document Number: [20-3571]..(Paul, Richard) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Board of Elections of the City of New York, Andrew Cuomo, New York State Board of Elections. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19746457)Document filed by Scherie S. Murray..(Paul, Richard) Modified on 5/7/2020 (pc).
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard St Paul. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens;. (pc)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard St Paul. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Scherie S. Murray, Board of Elections of the City of New York, Andrew Cuomo, New York State Board of Elections. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
May 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #3 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (ad)
May 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Richard St Paul re: Document No. #4 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
May 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard St Paul. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andrew Cuomo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Cuomo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguelina Camilo
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Shamoun
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Board of Elections
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A Kellner, Co-Chair and Commissioner individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cuomo
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gino A. Marmorato
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josel Miguel Araujo
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Spano, Commissioner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tiffany townsend
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter S. Kosinski, Co-Chair and Commissoner, individually and in his official capacities at the NYS BOE
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: michael michel
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wm. Zaccone
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Elections of the City of New York
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scherie S. Murray
Represented By: Richard St Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?