U.S. Bank National Association v. Keybank, National Assication
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, As Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, N.A., As Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial and U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, Keybank, National Association, As Successor By Merger To Keycorp Real Estate Capital Markets, Inc. and Keybank, National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv03577
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 95 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated 4/6/21. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
April 2, 2021 Filing 94 DECLARATION of Partha P. Chattoraj in Opposition re: #82 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint., #85 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Bronx Supreme Court Order dated Feb. 13, 2019), #2 Exhibit B (Bronx Supreme Court Order dated June 21, 2019)).(Chattoraj, Partha)
April 2, 2021 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #85 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
April 2, 2021 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #82 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #78 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. By May 15, 2021, the parties shall complete expert discovery. By June 14, 2021, the parties shall file their final pretrial submissions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/2/2021) (kv)
April 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 5/15/2021. (kv)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #88 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/29/2021) (jca)
March 26, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Guyon H. Knight on behalf of Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Knight, Guyon)
March 26, 2021 Filing 88 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj dated March 26, 2021. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: The case management conference scheduled for March 24, 2021, is ADJOURNED sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/23/2021) (kv)
March 19, 2021 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #85 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Keybank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pooling and Servicing Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Loan Modification Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Appellate Court Order).(Spano, Frank)
March 19, 2021 Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Keybank, National Association. Responses due by 4/2/2021.(Spano, Frank)
March 19, 2021 Filing 84 DECLARATION of H. Peter Haveles, Jr. in Support re: #82 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, part 1, #3 Exhibit B, part 2, #4 Exhibit B, part 3, #5 Exhibit C, part 1, #6 Exhibit C, part 2, #7 Exhibit D, part 1, #8 Exhibit D, part 2, #9 Exhibit D, part 3, #10 Exhibit D, part 4, #11 Exhibit E, part 1, #12 Exhibit E, part 2, #13 Exhibit F).(Haveles, H.)
March 19, 2021 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #82 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
March 19, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #79 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. GRANTED. Defendants' reply briefs shall not exceed 40 pages. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 79. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/18/2021) (kv)
March 17, 2021 Filing 80 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated March 17, 2021 re: ECF No. 79. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
March 17, 2021 Filing 79 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Over Length Brief addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Frank T. Spano dated March 17, 2021. Document filed by Keybank, National Association..(Spano, Frank)
March 15, 2021 Filing 78 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Status Report Letter, to Adjourn Pretrial Conference, to Complete Expert Discovery, and for Final Pretrial Submissions, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj dated March 15, 2021. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
March 11, 2021 Filing 77 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Keybank, National Association..(Spano, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Filing 76 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #9 Amended Complaint against Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, Keybank, National Association.Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Related document: #9 Amended Complaint..(Craig, John)
March 8, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE of Withdrawal re: #73 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, #71 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendants' letter at ECF No. 69 in connection with the parties' briefing on Plaintiff's motion to amend the first amended complaint. Defendants requests are GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Accordingly, The scheduling order on the motion to amend the first amended complaint at ECF No. 63 is VACATED; By March 10, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its second amended complaint. In permitting Plaintiff to file a second amended complaint, the Court reserves any determination on the futility of the second amended complaint; By March 19, 2021, Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss the second amended complaint, incorporating any arguments from their pending motions to dismiss; By April 2, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its opposition papers; and By April 16, 2021, Defendants shall file their reply papers, if any. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 35, 38, 64, and 65. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/10/2021, Motions due by 3/19/2021, Responses due by 4/2/2021, Replies due by 4/16/2021.), Motions terminated: #65 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, . filed by U.S. Bank National Association, #64 MOTION to Seal . filed by U.S. Bank National Association, #35 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint. filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or, in Alternative, to Stay Proceeding. filed by Keybank, National Association. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/5/2021) (jca)
March 5, 2021 Filing 73 DECLARATION of H. Peter Haveles, Jr. in Opposition re: #65 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, ., #60 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj dated February 5, 2021.. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, part 1, #4 Exhibit 2, part 2, #5 Exhibit 3).(Haveles, H.)
March 5, 2021 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #60 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj dated February 5, 2021. . Document filed by Keybank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cushman & Wakefield Appraisal (Part 1 of 3), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 3), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 3), #4 Exhibit 2 - Leitner Group Appraisal (Part 1 of 4), #5 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 4), #6 Exhibit 2 (Part 3 of 4), #7 Exhibit 2 (Part 4 of 4)).(Spano, Frank)
March 5, 2021 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #65 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, ., #60 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj dated February 5, 2021. . Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
March 5, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Thomas Spano on behalf of Keybank, National Association..(Spano, Frank)
March 2, 2021 Filing 69 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated 3/2/21 re: scheduling order of motion. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
February 26, 2021 Filing 68 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #65 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, ., #64 MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #64 .(Craig, John)
February 26, 2021 Filing 67 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of John S. Craig in Support re: #65 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, ., #64 MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #64 .(Craig, John)
February 26, 2021 Filing 66 DECLARATION of John S. Craig in Support re: #65 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, .. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C to be filed under seal, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F to be filed under seal, #7 Exhibit G to be filed under seal, #8 Exhibit H to be filed under seal, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J to be filed under seal, #11 Exhibit K to be filed under seal, #12 Exhibit L to be filed under seal, #13 Exhibit M to be filed under seal, #14 Exhibit N to be filed under seal, #15 Exhibit O to be filed under seal, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S).(Craig, John)
February 26, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, . Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Craig, John)
February 26, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION to Seal . Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Craig, John)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 3/5/2021, Doc. # 74 ORDER granting #60 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Comt has reviewed the paities' letters at ECF Nos. 60-62 in connection with Plaintiff s request for leave to file a second amended complaint. Accordingly, By February 26, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, including the proposed second amended complaint; By March 5, 2021, Defendants shall file their opposition papers; and By March 10, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its reply papers, if any. The Court STAYS its ruling on the motions to dismiss at ECF Nos. 35 and 38, pending resolution of Plaintiff' s motion to amend the complaint. So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/18/2021) (js) Modified on 3/5/2021 (jca).
February 18, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 2/26/2021. Responses due by 3/5/2021 Replies due by 3/10/2021. (js)
February 16, 2021 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated February 16, 2021 re: response to the letter dated February 5, 2021 from Partha P. Chattoraj. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Aaron C. Jackson dated February 16, 2021 re: Response to Torchlight's pre-motion letter dated February 5, 2021. Document filed by Keybank, National Association..(Jackson, Aaron)
February 10, 2021 Filing 60 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj dated February 5, 2021. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #58 Letter filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The parties shall file any smnmary judgment pre- motion letters within four weeks of the Court's order on the pending motions to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/2/2021) (kv)
January 29, 2021 Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated January 29, 2021 re: Modification of Scheduling Order. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #56 Letter filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. By April 15, 2021, the parties shall complete expert discovery. SO ORDERED. (Expert Discovery due by 4/15/2021.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/22/2021) (kv)
January 19, 2021 Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated January 19, 2021 re: modification of scheduling order. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re: #51 Letter, filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC. Accordingly, Berkadia is granted leave to serve Mr. Miller by delivering a copy of the subpoena to his last known address by FedEx. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/18/2020) (kv) Modified on 1/13/2021 (kv).
December 8, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Jill Pincus on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association..(Pincus, Lauren)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. GRANTED. By January 18, 2021, the parties shall complete fact discovery. By March 4, 2021, the parties shall complete expert discovery. The Court AMENDS paragraphs 7, 8, 9, and 11 to reflect the dates provided by the parties in this letter. The case management conference scheduled for January 6, 2021, is ADJOURNED to March 24, 2021, at 10:40 a.m. By March 17, 2021, the parties shall file their joint status letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/24/2020) (kv)
November 24, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings:( Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.), Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Expert Discovery due by 3/4/2021., Fact Discovery due by 1/18/2021.) (kv)
November 19, 2020 Filing 52 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Modify Affected Dates in Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (ECF Doc. No. 32) addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj dated November 19, 2020. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
November 19, 2020 Filing 51 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated November 19, 2020 re: Leave to serve a subpoena by alternative service. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Copies of Communication from Berkadia's process server).(Haveles, H.)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/16/2020) (jwh)
October 15, 2020 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated October 15, 2020 re: stipulated protective order. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Stipulated Protective Order).(Haveles, H.)
September 16, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or, in Alternative, to Stay Proceeding. . Document filed by Keybank, National Association..(Jackson, Aaron)
September 16, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #35 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #43 Letter, filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. Defendant may file a reply memorandum not exceeding 20 pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/8/2020) (kv)
September 8, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Samuel Craig on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association..(Craig, John)
September 4, 2020 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj dated September 4, 2020 re: Response to September 4, 2020 Letter Filed by Defendant Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC (ECF Doc. No. 43). Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
September 4, 2020 Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated 9/4/2020 re: Page limit of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Berkadia's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Partha P. Chattoraj in Opposition re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or, in Alternative, to Stay Proceeding., #35 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Bronx Supreme Court Order dated Feb. 13, 2019), #2 Exhibit B (Bronx Supreme Court Order dated June 21, 2019)).(Chattoraj, Partha)
September 2, 2020 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or, in Alternative, to Stay Proceeding. . Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
September 2, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #35 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
August 5, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or, in Alternative, to Stay Proceeding. . Document filed by Keybank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Order, #2 Exhibit B - Appellate Order, #3 Exhibit C - June 20, 2019 Decision and Order, #4 Exhibit D - July 12, 2019 Decision and Order, #5 Exhibit E - Second Circuit Summary Order, #6 Exhibit F - PSA, #7 Exhibit G - Executive Order 202.8, #8 Exhibit H - Administrative Order 68/20).(Jackson, Aaron)
August 5, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or, in Alternative, to Stay Proceeding. Document filed by Keybank, National Association. Responses due by 9/2/2020.(Jackson, Aaron)
August 5, 2020 Filing 37 DECLARATION of H. Peter Haveles, Jr. in Support re: #35 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B- Part 1, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2).(Haveles, H.)
August 5, 2020 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #35 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
August 5, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Amy E. Hatch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jw)
July 8, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Amy E. Hatch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20603365. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keybank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy E. Hatch in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Hatch, Amy)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is five (5) trial days. Deposition due by 12/18/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/18/2020. Expert Discovery due by 2/1/2021. Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/8/2020) (kv)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters at ECF Nos. 20, 21, 27, and 28 it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By August 5, 2020, Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss; 2. By September 2, 2020, Plaintiff shall file its oppositions; and 3. By September 16, 2020, Defendants shall file their replies, if any. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 8/5/2020. Responses due by 9/2/2020 Replies due by 9/16/2020. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/8/2020) (kv)
July 8, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Amy E. Hatch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20603365. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/8/2020. (jw)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Aaron C. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jw)
July 7, 2020 Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj dated July 7, 2020 re: Diversity Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
July 7, 2020 Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj dated July 7, 2020 re: Response to KeyBank Pre-Motion Letter (ECF Doc. No. 21). Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
July 7, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj dated July 7, 2020 re: Response to Berkadia Pre-Motion Letter (ECF Doc. No. 20). Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
July 7, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Aaron C. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-20585005. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Keybank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron C. Jackson in Support om Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Jackson, Aaron)
July 7, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason A. Nagi on behalf of Keybank, National Association..(Nagi, Jason)
July 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for Aaron C. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-20585005. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 2, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Aisling Incledon on behalf of Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Incledon, Caroline)
July 1, 2020 Filing 23 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
July 1, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Partha P. Chattoraj, on behalf of all parties dated July 1, 2020 re: Joint Status Letter Pursuant to May 22, 2020 Initial Pretrial Conference Order (ECF Doc. No. 11). Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jason A. Nagi dated June 29, 2020 re: Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Keybank, National Association..(Nagi, Jason)
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated 6/29/2020 re: pre-motion letter. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter filed by Keybank, National Association. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. By June 29, 2020, Defendant KeyBaank National Association shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Keybank, National Association answer due 6/29/2020. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/22/2020) (kv)
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jason A. Nagi dated June 19, 2020 re: agreed extension of time to respond to complaint. Document filed by Keybank, National Association..(Nagi, Jason)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated 6/3/2020. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC. GRANTED. By June 29, 2020, Defendant Berkadia shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC answer due 6/29/2020. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/4/2020) (rjm)
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from H. Peter Haveles, Jr. dated 6/3/2020. Document filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Peter Haveles, Jr on behalf of Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(Haveles, H.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Keybank, National Association served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Hatch, Polsinelli PC, counsel to Defendant KeyBank, National Association. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/22/2020) (cf)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/22/2020) (cf)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/8/2020 at 12:00 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Analisa Torres. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/22/2020) (cf)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Business Document Specialist, Office of New York Secretary of State. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Chattoraj, Partha)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, Keybank, National Association.Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Chattoraj, Partha)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC..(pc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Keybank, National Association..(pc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence P. Gottesman on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association..(Gottesman, Lawrence)
May 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Partha Pratim Chattoraj. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Keybank, National Association, As Successor By Merger To Keycorp Real Estate Capital Markets, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, As Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, N.A., As Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
May 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, As Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, N.A., As Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial..(Chattoraj, Partha)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Keybank, National Association, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, As Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, N.A., As Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial..(Chattoraj, Partha)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, As Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, N.A., As Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, As Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, N.A., As Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial..(Chattoraj, Partha)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Chattoraj, Partha)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, Keybank, National Association, As Successor By Merger To Keycorp Real Estate Capital Markets, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19748117)Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, As Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, N.A., As Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial..(Chattoraj, Partha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Keybank, National Assication
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: H. Peter Haveles, Jr
Represented By: Caroline Aisling Incledon
Represented By: Guyon H. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keybank, National Association, As Successor By Merger To Keycorp Real Estate Capital Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keybank, National Association
Represented By: Aaron Cooper Jackson
Represented By: Amy Hatch
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Represented By: Amy E. Hatch
Represented By: Jason A Nagi
Represented By: Frank Thomas Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, As Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, N.A., As Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial
Represented By: Partha Pratim Chattoraj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Partha Pratim Chattoraj
Represented By: Lawrence P. Gottesman
Represented By: John Samuel Craig
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?