42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC v. New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Plaintiff: 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC
Defendant: New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Case Number: 1:2020cv03675
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F,R.C,P, 41(a)(1)(A)(B): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and their representative counsels that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without waiver of rights. It is further stipulated and agreed that each party shall bear its own costs and fees. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/23/2020) (jwh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Rosenberg, Paul)
July 21, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/21/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 16, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/16/2020, ( The Oral Argument previously scheduled for July 16, 2020 is now set for 7/23/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.)The dial in information remains as previously posted. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/13/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 10, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Oral Argument set for 7/16/2020 is moved to 04:30 PM on the same day, before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The dial in information remains the same as previously posted..(Kotowski, Linda)
July 8, 2020 NOTICE: The argument on July 16, 2020 will be telephonic.Dial in information: USA toll free : 888-363-4735International caller paid: 215-446-3657Access code: 1086415.(Kotowski, Linda)
July 2, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 CROSS MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Midgen, Andrew)
June 25, 2020 Filing 23 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #18 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC..(Rosenberg, Paul)
June 25, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Pedro Dias in Support re: #4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award.. Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC..(Rosenberg, Paul)
June 25, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award. and in Opposition to Respondent's Cross Motion to Compel Arbitration. Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC..(Rosenberg, Paul)
June 25, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY re: #14 Response to Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration and Cross Motion to Compel Arbitration. Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC..(Rosenberg, Paul)
June 12, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Midgen, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 18 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Midgen, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 CROSS MOTION to Compel Arbitration . and in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Midgen, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Richard Maroko in Support re: #15 CROSS MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Midgen, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 15 CROSS MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Midgen, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Midgen, Andrew)
June 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 6/3/2020. A telephone conference was held on June 3, 2020. Respondent's opposition and cross-motion is now due by June 11, with petitioner's subsequent submission due June 25, and respondent's cross-reply by July 2. Oral argument remains on July 16, 2020at 2 PM. (kgo)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew David Midgen on behalf of New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Midgen, Andrew)
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry Neal Saltzman on behalf of New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(Saltzman, Barry)
May 27, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings:( Oral Argument set for 7/16/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.), Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Cross Motions due by 6/8/2020., Responses due by 6/22/2020, Replies due by 6/29/2020.) (kgo)
May 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/27/2020. The Court approved the following briefing schedule: respondent's opposition and cross-motion by no later than June 8; petitioner's reply and cross-opposition by no later than June 22; respondent's cross-reply by no later than June 29. Oral argument, telephonic if conditions require, will be held on July 16 at 2 PM. (kgo)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons, Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, Notice of Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition and Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, Declaration of Pedro Dias served on New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO on 05/18/2020. Service was accepted by Barry N. Saltzman, counsel for Respondent. Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC..(Grossman, Andrew)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON MOTION granting #9 Motion for Andrew M. Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/15/2020) (rjm)
May 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Andrew Michael Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
May 15, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #9 MOTION for Andrew Michael Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-19832238, paid on May 14th, 2020. (laq)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Andrew Michael Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Grossman, Andrew)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO..(jgo)
May 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC..(Rosenberg, Paul)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Pedro Dias in Support re: #4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award.. Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Industry-Wide Agreement, #2 Exhibit Notice to the Union).(Rosenberg, Paul)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award. . Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Industry-Wide Agreement, #2 Exhibit Award, #3 Exhibit Award Clarification).(Rosenberg, Paul)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award. Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC..(Rosenberg, Paul)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent 42nd and 10th Hotel Mezz Alpha, LLC (DE), Other Affiliate Al-Bahar Family Office, Other Affiliate Al-Macain Holdings Group (KSC), Other Affiliate Kuwait Real Estate Company (KSCP), Other Affiliate United Investments (Portugal) - Empreendimentos Turisticos, S.A. for 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC. Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC..(Rosenberg, Paul)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosenberg, Paul)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19799911).Document filed by 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Industry-Wide Agreement, #2 Exhibit Award, #3 Exhibit Award Clarification).(Rosenberg, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC v. New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 42nd and 10th Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Paul Rosenberg
Represented By: Andrew M. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Hotel and Motel Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Barry Neal Saltzman
Represented By: Andrew David Midgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?