Mazzei v. The Money Store et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Mazzei
Defendant: HomeQ Servicing Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., TMS Mortgage, Inc. and The Money Store
Case Number: 1:2020cv03702
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against HomeQ Servicing Inc., TMS Mortgage, Inc., The Money Store, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Document filed by Joseph Mazzei. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Grobman, Paul)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Money Store, TMS Mortgage, Inc., HomEq Servicing Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joseph Mazzei..(Grobman, Paul)
May 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Paul Stewart Grobman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing must be linked to the correctly filed pleading; party names on the 'As To' docket entry text do not exactly match as they appear on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 15, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 15, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paul Stewart Grobman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Joseph Mazzei; Money Store, Inc.; HomeQ Servicing Corp; TMS Mortgage, Inc.; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
May 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul Stewart Grobman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 4 (Reinstated/Reopened Case); Citizenship Plaintiff code 1 (Citizen of This State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 1 (Original Proceeding); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to Westchester;. (jgo)
May 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Paul Stewart Grobman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption. If all of the party names do not fit, use leading party name followed by 'et al'; the incorrect Origin Code was selected; the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Paul Stewart Grobman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Joseph Mazzei. Document filed by Joseph Mazzei. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Grobman, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2020 (jgo).
May 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Paul Stewart Grobman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the incorrect case number is on the PDF. Place new case number on the PDF to differentiate between the two. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 5/19/2020. (jgo)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING AND As To ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TMS Mortgage, Money Store, HomEq Servicing Corp., Wells Fargo Bank N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Mazzei..(Grobman, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2020 (jgo).
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Grobman, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2020 (jgo).
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Joseph Mazzei. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19816887)Document filed by Joseph Mazzei. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Grobman, Paul) Modified on 5/14/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazzei v. The Money Store et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeQ Servicing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMS Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Money Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mazzei
Represented By: Paul Stewart Grobman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?