Irving H. Picard v. JABA Associates LP et al
Plaintiff: Irving H. Picard
Defendant: Bruce Goodman, The Estate of James Goodman, Audrey Goodman, Goodman Charitable Foundation, Audrey M. Goodman, JABA Associates LP and Andrew Goodman
In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03836
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/14/2020. Responses due by 9/8/2020 Replies due by 9/15/2020. (ks)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/22/2020) (ks)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Proposed Cross-Motion and Proposed Amended Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Helen Davis Chaitman dated June 19, 2020. Document filed by Andrew Goodman, Audrey Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, Goodman Charitable Foundation, JABA Associates LP, The Estate of James Goodman..(Chaitman, Helen)
May 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/14/2020. (ks)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Letter Motion for Conference. No pre-motion conference is necessary. The parties' agreed schedule is approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/28/2020) (ks)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Helen Davis Chaitman dated May 27, 2020 re: Response to Trustee's Consent to the Withdrawal of the Reference and Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Andrew Goodman, Audrey Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, Goodman Charitable Foundation, JABA Associates LP, The Estate of James Goodman..(Chaitman, Helen)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Pre-Motion Conference on Motion for Summary Judgment and Consent to Withdrawal of the Reference addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nicholas J. Cremona dated May 27, 2020. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Cremona, Nicholas)
May 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
May 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-5128A, 08-1789 (SMB).Document filed by Audrey Goodman, Bruce Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, JABA Associates LP, Goodman Charitable Foundation, Andrew Goodman, The Estate of James Goodman. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Helen Davis Chaitman, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Order).(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irving H. Picard v. JABA Associates LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Goodman
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of James Goodman
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Goodman
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Charitable Foundation
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey M. Goodman
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JABA Associates LP
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Goodman
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving H. Picard
Represented By: Nicholas J. Cremona
Represented By: Seanna R. Brown
Represented By: David J. Sheehan
Represented By: Keith R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?