Culbertson et al v. Deloitte Consulting LLP
Plaintiff: Timothy Sylvester, Paul Culbertson and William Gibson
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting LLP
Case Number: 1:2020cv03962
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
July 18, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Tiffany Marko Yiatras to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20748227. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Tiffany Marko Yiatras to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Missouri Good Standing Certificate of Tiffany Marko Yiatras, #3 Exhibit B - Illinois Good Standing Certificate of Illinois, #4 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Tiffany Marko Yiatras to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Yiatras, Tiffany)
July 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #56 MOTION for Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 17, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paul Culbertson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Lyon, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Javier Luis Merino on behalf of Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith..(Merino, Javier)
July 15, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Edward Dann on behalf of Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith..(Dann, Marc)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Marc Edward Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
July 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #52 MOTION for Marc Edward Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20682753. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 14, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Marc Edward Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20682753. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Marc E. Dann, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B-Letter of Explanation, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Dann, Marc)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Matthew R. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
July 13, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr on behalf of Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith..(Zimmerman, Thomas)
July 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #49 MOTION for Matthew R. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20661204. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 13, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Matthew R. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20661204. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Janet M. Burns. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew R. Wilson, #2 Exhibit 1--Certificate of Good Standing CA, #3 Exhibit 2--Certificate of Good Standing OH, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Wilon, Matthew)
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying as moot #25 Motion for John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Phyllis B. Sumner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Elizabeth D. Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Michael J. Boyle, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #38 Motion for John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
July 9, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #42 MOTION for Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 9, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Zimmerman, Thomas)
July 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #40 MOTION for Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20583528. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Ohio. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
July 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 AMENDED MOTION for Michael J. Boyle, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 7, 2020 Filing 41 AMENDED MOTION for Michael J. Boyle, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Janet M. Burns. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael J. Boyle, Jr., #2 Exhibit A--Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B--Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03962-LJL, 1:20-cv-04077-LJL, 1:20-cv-05070-LJL.(Boyle, Michael)
July 7, 2020 Filing 40 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20583528. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paul Culbertson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Lyon, Joseph) Modified on 7/7/2020 (aea).
July 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #39 MOTION for Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20566955. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Illinois - Clerk of Supreme Court Supreme Court Building 200 E. Capitol Springfield, IL 62701 212-782-2035. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
July 6, 2020 Filing 39 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20566955. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr., #2 Proposed Order).(Zimmerman, Thomas) Modified on 7/7/2020 (aea).
July 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 3, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit).(Yanchunis, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frederic Scott Fox, Sr on behalf of Janet M. Burns..(Fox, Frederic)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. For convenience, expedition, and judicial economy, the Court CONSOLIDATES this action into 1:20-cv-03962-LJL Culbertson et al v. Deloitte Consulting LLP. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2); Johnson v. Celotex Corp., 899 F.2d 1281, 128485 (2d. Cir 1990 (noting that district courts have "broad discretion to determine whether consolidation is appropriate" and that "courts have taken the view that considerations of judicial economy favor consolidation"); Garber v. Randell, 477 F.2d 711, 714 (2d Cir. 1973) ("[C]onsolidation of stockholders' suits during pretrial stages pursuant to [Rule 42] may benefit both the court and the parties by expediting pretrial proceedings, avoiding duplication and harassment of parties and witnesses, and minimizing expenditure of time and money by all persons concerned."). All orders in Culbertson apply equally to this action, and counsel in this action are directed to make filings only on the Culbertson docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/2/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03962-LJL, 1:20-cv-05070-LJL (yv)
June 30, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Deloitte Consulting LLP served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky Authorized Agent of New York Secretary of State. Document filed by Alexander Cabot; Kelly Allison-Pickering..(Peterson, Amanda)
June 30, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Deloitte Consulting LLP served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky Authorized Agent of New York Secretary of State. Document filed by William Gibson; Alexander Cabot; Paul Culbertson..(Peterson, Amanda)
June 26, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference Initial Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
June 26, 2020 Filing 32 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP..(Lee, Alvin)
June 26, 2020 Filing 31 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference from July 27, 2020 for a least one month addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Alvin Y. Lee, John A. Yanchunis, Matthew B. George, Hassan A. Zavareei and Katrina Carroll dated 6/26/2020. Document filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP..(Lee, Alvin)
June 26, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #30 MOTION for Michael J. Boyle, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20425095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from California Supreme; missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (laq)
June 25, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Michael J. Boyle, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20425095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Janet M. Burns. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A--Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B--Certificate of Good Standing).(Boyle, Michael)
June 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #28 MOTION for Phyllis B. Sumner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20423107. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
June 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Elizabeth D. Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20423568. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
June 25, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Elizabeth D. Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20423568. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Adler, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Phyllis B. Sumner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20423107. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Sumner, Phyllis)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The above-captioned cases involve common questions of law and fact. For convenience, expedition, and judicial economy, and noting that no party has objected despite the opportunity to do so, the Court exercises its discretion to consolidate these cases into a single action. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate all cases listed above under case number 20-cv-3962 (Culbertson et al v. Deloitte Consulting LLP), and to close all other cases. Counsel are directed to make filings only under case 20- cv-3962. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/23/2020) (va)
June 19, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #26 MOTION for Ryan J. McGee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20340821. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Certificate of Good Standing must be issued from the Florida Supreme Court Clerk Office 500 S. Duval Street Tallahassee, FL 32399 850-488-0125;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad)
June 19, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #25 MOTION for John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20340608. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Certificate of Good Standing must be issued from the Florida Supreme Court Clerk Office 500 S. Duval Street Tallahassee, FL 32399 850-488-0125;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad)
June 19, 2020 Filing 26 >>>DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. MOTION for Ryan J. McGee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20340821. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kelly Allison-Pickering, Alexander Cabot, Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of R. McGee, #2 Exhibit COGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order).(Yanchunis, John) Modified on 7/13/2020 (ad).
June 19, 2020 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for John A. Yanchunis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20340608. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexander Cabot, Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Yanchunis, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Yanchunis, John) Modified on 6/20/2020 (ad).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: These cases have all been assigned to the Court due to their relatedness. For convenience, expedition, and judicial economy, the Court intends to consolidate them into a single action. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2); Johnson v. Celotex Corp., 899 F.2d 1281, 128485 (2d. Cir 1990 (noting that district courts have "broad discretion to determine whether consolidation is appropriate" and that "courts have taken the view that considerations of judicial economy favor consolidation"); Garber v. Randell, 477 F.2d 711, 714 (2d Cir. 1973) ("[C]onsolidation of stockholders' suits during pretrial stages pursuant to [Rule 42] may benefit both the court and the parties by expediting pretrial proceedings, avoiding duplication and harassment of parties and witnesses, and minimizing expenditure of time and money by all persons concerned."). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any party objecting to consolidation shall file a letter on ECF, not to exceed two pages, by June 23, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to answer or move to dismiss any Complaint is ADJOURNED pending further order from the Court. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/16/2020) (va)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Jeffrey S. Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
June 12, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Jeffrey S. Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20239063. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 12, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Jeffrey S. Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20239063. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kelly Allison-Pickering, Alexander Cabot, Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey S. Goldenberg, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Gary E. Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Charles E. Schaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM)
June 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Gary E. Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20192876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 10, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Gary E. Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20192876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kelly Allison-Pickering, Alexander Cabot, Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gary E. Mason, #2 DC COGS, #3 MD COGS, #4 NY COGS, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Mason, Gary)
June 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Charles E. Schaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20191735. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
June 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Charles E. Schaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20191735. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kelly Allison-Pickering, Alexander Cabot, Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Schaffer, Charles)
June 8, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Alvin Y. Lee dated June 8, 2020 re: Motion to Transfer Bozin et al. v. Deloitte Consulting LLP, No. 1:20-cv-1191-PAG (N.D. Ohio). Document filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP..(Lee, Alvin)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deloitte LLP for Deloitte Consulting LLP. Document filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP..(Lee, Alvin)
June 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alvin Young Lee on behalf of Deloitte Consulting LLP..(Lee, Alvin)
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deloitte Consulting LLP..(jgo)
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kelly Allison-Pickering..(Peterson, Amanda)
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Alexander Cabot..(Peterson, Amanda)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Deloitte Consulting LLP, re: #10 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Kelly Allison-Pickering, Alexander Cabot, Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester..(Peterson, Amanda)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Deloitte Consulting LLP with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Paul Culbertson, Timothy Sylvester, William Gibson, Alexander Cabot, Kelly Allison-Pickering. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Peterson, Amanda)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Parties are directed to dial-in to the Court's teleconference number at 888- 251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/26/2020) (ks)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deloitte Consulting LLP..(pne)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deloitte Consulting LLP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester..(Peterson, Amanda)
May 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Amanda Peterson to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
May 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Amanda Peterson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
May 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
May 22, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Timothy Sylvester..(Peterson, Amanda)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by William Gibson..(Peterson, Amanda)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Paul Culbertson..(Peterson, Amanda)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deloitte Consulting LLP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester..(Peterson, Amanda) Modified on 5/22/2020 (pne).
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Peterson, Amanda)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19935418)Document filed by Paul Culbertson, Timothy Sylvester, William Gibson..(Peterson, Amanda)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19935418)Document filed by Paul Culbertson, Timothy Sylvester, William Gibson..(Peterson, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culbertson et al v. Deloitte Consulting LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Sylvester
Represented By: Amanda Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Culbertson
Represented By: Amanda Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gibson
Represented By: Amanda Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?