Martinez-Cruz et al v. York Bagels Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rogelio Martinez-Cruz and Erick Martinez-Castillo
Defendant: Yuri Ishakov, Vlad Djouraev, Amsterdam Ave Bagels Inc, York Bagels Inc. d/b/a Bagels & Co., Amsterdam Ave Bagels Inc doing business as Bagels & Co. and York Bagels Inc. doing business as Bagels & Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04084
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 8/21/2020..(rpr)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/29/2020. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/10/19) (rpr)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Vlad Djouraev(jointly and severally, in their individual capacities) waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; York Bagels Inc. waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Yuri Ishakov(jointly and severally, in their individual capacities) waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Amsterdam Ave Bagels Inc waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Vlad Djouraev(in their professional capacities) waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Yuri Ishakov(in their professional capacities) waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. Document filed by Vlad Djouraev(jointly and severally, in their individual capacities); York Bagels Inc. ; Yuri Ishakov(jointly and severally, in their individual capacities); Amsterdam Ave Bagels Inc; Vlad Djouraev(in their professional capacities); Yuri Ishakov(in their professional capacities)..(Kataev, Emanuel)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emanuel Kataev on behalf of Amsterdam Ave Bagels Inc, Vlad Djouraev(jointly and severally, in their individual capacities), Vlad Djouraev(in their professional capacities), Yuri Ishakov(jointly and severally, in their individual capacities), Yuri Ishakov(in their professional capacities), York Bagels Inc...(Kataev, Emanuel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to York Bagels Inc...(pc)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amsterdam Ave Bagels Inc..(pc)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yuri Ishakov..(pc)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vlad Djouraev..(pc)
May 29, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Erick Martinez-Castillo, Rogelio Martinez-Cruz added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Erick Martinez-Castillo, Rogelio Martinez-Cruz. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Lopez, Paula)
May 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paula Lopez. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Rogelio Martinez-Cruz, Erick Martinez-Castillo, Vlad Djouraev, Yuri Ishakov, York Bagels Inc. d/b/a Bagels & Co... The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
May 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Paula Lopez re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Rogelio Martinez-Cruz, Erick Martinez-Castillo to CM ECF with the party text "on behalf of others similarly situated" for each. Add Vlad Djouraev, Yuri Ishakov to CM ECF with the party text "in their professional capacities" for each. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
May 29, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 29, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paula Lopez. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code blank;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201fl;. (pc)
May 29, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yuri Ishakov, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Erick Martinez-Castillo, Rogelio Martinez-Cruz..(Lopez, Paula)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vlad Djouraev, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Erick Martinez-Castillo, Rogelio Martinez-Cruz..(Lopez, Paula)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amsterdam Ave Bagels Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Erick Martinez-Castillo, Rogelio Martinez-Cruz..(Lopez, Paula)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lopez, Paula)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to York Bagels Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Erick Martinez-Castillo, Rogelio Martinez-Cruz..(Lopez, Paula)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amsterdam Ave Bagels Inc, Vlad Djouraev, Yuri Ishakov, York Bagels Inc. d/b/a Bagels & Co.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20015296)Document filed by Rogelio Martinez-Cruz, Erick Martinez-Castillo..(Lopez, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Cruz et al v. York Bagels Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuri Ishakov
Represented By: Emanuel Kataev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vlad Djouraev
Represented By: Emanuel Kataev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amsterdam Ave Bagels Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York Bagels Inc. d/b/a Bagels & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amsterdam Ave Bagels Inc doing business as Bagels & Co.
Represented By: Emanuel Kataev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York Bagels Inc. doing business as Bagels & Co.
Represented By: Emanuel Kataev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Martinez-Cruz
Represented By: Paula Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Martinez-Castillo
Represented By: Paula Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?