Haby v. Time Warner Cable Pension Plan
Plaintiff: Doris Haby
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Pension Plan
Case Number: 1:2020cv04119
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
May 29, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
May 29, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
May 29, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Texas Western; Case Number: 5:20-cv-00069. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Time Warner Cable Pension Plan. It is Ordered that this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Time Warner Cable Pension Plan re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Carr, Ashley) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Time Warner Cable Pension Plan, re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Time Warner Cable Pension Plan (Carr, Ashley) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Doris Haby, re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Time Warner Cable Pension Plan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dahl, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case by Time Warner Cable Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Carr, Ashley) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2020.]
January 17, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13094513). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Doris Haby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dahl, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haby v. Time Warner Cable Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Pension Plan
Represented By: Ashley Allen Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Haby
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?