Alvarado v. H Code Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04150
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be, and hereby is, dismissed with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that if the settlement is not consummated within thirty days of this order, either party may apply by letter within the thirty-day period for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. Any pending dates and deadlines are adjourned sine die, and any pending motions are moot. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/2/2020) (rro)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Jose Alvarado..(Liebowitz, Richard)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/2/2020) (jca)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to H Code Media, Inc...(pne)
June 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
June 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
June 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
June 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
May 30, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to H Code Media, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Alvarado..(Liebowitz, Richard)
May 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against H Code Media, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20041625)Document filed by Jose Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado v. H Code Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?