Graterol-Garrido v. Vega
Plaintiff: Maria Herminia Graterol-Garrido
Defendant: Patricia Maria Vega
Case Number: 1:2020cv04209
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332lb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Patricia Maria Vega served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. Service was accepted by "Jane" Vega, identified herself as "relative" of defendant. Document filed by Maria Herminia Graterol-Garrido..(Katz, Joshua)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/3/2020) (rjm)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patricia Maria Vega..(pc)
June 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Patricia Maria Vega, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Herminia Graterol-Garrido..(Katz, Joshua)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Katz, Joshua)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patricia Maria Vega. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20076574)Document filed by Maria Herminia Graterol-Garrido..(Katz, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graterol-Garrido v. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Herminia Graterol-Garrido
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Maria Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?