Kirschner et al v. McClain et al
Plaintiff: Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Gerald C. Crotty, Pamela M. Paul, Suzanne Maloney, Nine Chapters Capital Management LLC, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Jack Gross, Arthur E. Lee, John T. McClain, Susan M. McCoy, John D'Souza, Defendant NJ-1, Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Priac funds, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL INC, Alison Hemming, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Arlene Starr, Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Mark DeZao, Ninive Giordano, Charles L. Pickett, Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Defendant NJ-2, Irene A. Koumendouros, Vincent Morales, Defendant NJ-4, Arundhati Kulkarni, Tami Fersko, Ira Margulies, Jeffrey Brisman, Patricia Kenny, Defendant NJ-3, Nancy L, Lee, Quantitative Management Associates LLC, Advanced Series Trust: AST Academic Strategies Asset Allocation Portfolio, QMA, LLC, Advanced Series Trust: AST Small-Cap Value Portfolio, The Target Portfolio Trust: PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Advanced Series Trust and Nine Chapters Systematic Master Fund, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04262
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (93 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor on Behalf of Former Director and Officer Defendants. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Former Director and Officer Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under 11 U.S.C. 546(e). Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Friedman, Edward)
July 27, 2020 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Public Shareholder Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under 11 U.S.C. 546(e). Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Friedman, Edward)
July 23, 2020 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE served on Nine Chapters Systematic Master Fund, Ltd. on June 12, 2020. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Summons)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04262-JSR.(Lack, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 112 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nine Chapters Systematic Master Fund, Ltd...(pne)
July 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Joel Lack. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Advanced Series Trust: AST Academic Strategies Asset Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust: AST Small-Cap Value Portfolio, QMA, LLC, The Target Portfolio Trust: PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne)
July 21, 2020 Filing 111 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nine Chapters Systematic Master Fund, Ltd., re: #110 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB..(Friedman, Edward)
July 20, 2020 Filing 110 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Jeffrey Brisman, Gerald C. Crotty, John D'Souza, Mark DeZao, Defendant NJ-1, Defendant NJ-2, Defendant NJ-3, Defendant NJ-4, Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Tami Fersko, Eric B. Fisher, Edward A. Friedman, Ninive Giordano, Jack Gross, Alison Hemming, Patricia Kenny, Irene A. Koumendouros, Arundhati Kulkarni, Arthur E. Lee, Nancy L, Lee, Suzanne Maloney, Ira Margulies, John T. McClain, Susan M. McCoy, Vincent Morales, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL INC, Pamela M. Paul, Charles L. Pickett, Priac funds, Gregory C. Pruden, Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Arlene Starr, Advanced Series Trust: AST Academic Strategies Asset Allocation Portfolio a/k/a Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Asset Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust: AST Small-Cap Value Portfolio a/k/a Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Nine Chapters Systematic Master Fund, Ltd., The Target Portfolio Trust: PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund a/k/a PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, QMA, LLC f/k/a Quantitative Management Associates LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Lack, Robert)
July 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #105 MOTION for Craig A. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20512937. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: As per Paragraph 5 of the Order dated June 12, 2020, see ECF No. 20, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the complaints, to the extent they are still sealed, in the actions 20-cv-4262, 20-cv-4265, 20-cv-4267, 20-cv-4286, 20-cv-4287, 20-cv-4289, 20-cv-4292, 20-cv-4299, 20-cv-4335, 20- cv-4346, 20-cv-4360, 20-cv-4404, 20-cv-4434, 20-cv-4436, 20-cv-4440, 20-cv-4479, 20-cv-4480, and 20-cv-4569 (but not the complaint in the 20-cv-4433 action) and replace any remaining pseudonyms with the corresponding names of the defendants contained in the captions of the complaints. Plaintiffs' counsel shall cooperate with the Clerk's Office in carrying out this process as promptly as possible. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/2/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (mml)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting (122) Motion for Craig A. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/2/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (jwh)
July 2, 2020 Filing 107 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner..(Lack, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 106 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner..(Lack, Robert)
July 1, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION for Craig A. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20512937. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Christopher R. Cade, Dianne Card, Wesley R Card, Ira M. Dansky, Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Richard L. Dickson, Joseph T. Donnalley, Tami Fersko, Ira Martin Dansky Revocable Trust, John T McClain, Aida Tejero-Decolli, John T. McClain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig A. Benson, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from the District of Columbia, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing from the State of Maryland, #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing from the State of New York, #5 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Benson, Craig)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: This Order addresses an additional housekeeping matter that has not been raised before. In the Order dated June 12, 2020, the Court, among other things, stated: "All counsel who had not appeared in an action prior to its transfer, and all counsel in actions filed originally in this district, must enter a notice of appearance in that action and in 20-MD-2941 and, if necessary, apply for admission pro hac vice." ECF No. 20, at 5. To further clarify, an attorney applying for admission pro hac vice should file such a motion in the 20-MD-2941 docket and "spread" the submission to all cases in which the attorney represents a party. The attorney shall be required to pay the pro hac vice fee for the equivalent of only one case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/1/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (jwh)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting (91) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Order. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Suzanne M. Cerra; Suzanne M. Cerra; Suzanne M. Cerra and Suzanne M. Cerra terminated in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR; granting (99) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Suzanne M. Cerra; Suzanne M. Cerra; Suzanne M. Cerra and Suzanne M. Cerra terminated in case 1:20-cv-04262-JSR. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/30/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04262-JSR. (mml)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Order. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Kristine Ryan and Kristine V. Ryan terminated in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR; granting (98) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kristine Ryan and Kristine V. Ryan terminated in case 1:20-cv-04262-JSR. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/30/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04262-JSR. (mml)
June 30, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION for Joinder to Join the Former Director and Officer Defendants Motion to Dismiss and the Public Shareholder Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Nicola Guarna, Robert Rodriguez, Robert Rodriguez.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Brennan, Travis)
June 30, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (142 in 1:20-cv-04346-JSR, 116 in 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 76 in 1:20-cv-04286-JSR, 48 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 68 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 79 in 1:20-cv-04292-JSR, 151 in 1:20-cv-04335-JSR, 96 in 1:20-cv-04262-JSR, 97 in 1:20-cv-04569-JSR) MOTION for Cliff C. Gardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20465400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al.(wb)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (68) Motion for Cliff C. Gardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/29/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (jwh)
June 29, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION for Suzanne M. Cerra to Withdraw as Attorney for the Prudential Defendants. Document filed by Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Priac Funds, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04262-JSR.(Pruden, Gregory)
June 29, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION for Kristine V. Ryan to Withdraw as Attorney for the Prudential Defendants. Document filed by Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Priac Funds, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04262-JSR.(Pruden, Gregory)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (63) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR; granting (95) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04262-JSR; granting (43) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04287-JSR; granting (75) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04286-JSR; granting (78) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04292-JSR; granting (150) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04335-JSR; granting (141) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04346-JSR; granting (115) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04436-JSR; granting (96) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04569-JSR. The motion of Robert S. Saunders for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Robert S. Saunders is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/29/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (yv)
June 29, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION for Cliff C. Gardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20465400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gerald C. Crotty, John D. Demsey, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades, Matthew H. Kamens, Sidney Kimmel, Robert L. Mettler, James A. Mitarotonda, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Lowell W. Robinson, TELENDOS, LLC, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Ann Marie C Wilkins, Susan T Mettler, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiadis, Telendos LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cliff C. Gardner, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Gardner, Cliff)
June 28, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (43 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 78 in 1:20-cv-04292-JSR, 150 in 1:20-cv-04335-JSR, 96 in 1:20-cv-04569-JSR, 75 in 1:20-cv-04286-JSR, 95 in 1:20-cv-04262-JSR, 63 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 115 in 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 141 in 1:20-cv-04346-JSR) MOTION for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20456704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al.(ad)
June 28, 2020 Filing 95 MOTION for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20456704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gerald C. Crotty, John D. Demsey, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades, Matthew H. Kamens, Sidney Kimmel, Robert L. Mettler, James A. Mitarotonda, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Lowell W. Robinson, TELENDOS, LLC, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Ann Marie C Wilkins, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiadis, Telendos LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert S. Saunders, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Saunders, Robert)
June 27, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Gerald C. Crotty, John D. Demsey, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades, Matthew H. Kamens, Sidney Kimmel, Robert L. Mettler, James A. Mitarotonda, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Lowell W. Robinson, TELENDOS, LLC, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Ann Marie C Wilkins, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiadis, Telendos LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Musoff, Scott)
June 26, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (43 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 78 in 1:20-cv-04292-JSR, 150 in 1:20-cv-04335-JSR, 96 in 1:20-cv-04569-JSR, 75 in 1:20-cv-04286-JSR, 95 in 1:20-cv-04262-JSR, 63 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 115 in 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 141 in 1:20-cv-04346-JSR) MOTION for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20456704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al.(ad)
June 24, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Elizabeth Tepper on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Tepper, Danielle)
June 24, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Priyanka Kishore Wityk on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Wityk, Priyanka)
June 24, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shenghao Stan Chiueh on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Chiueh, Shenghao)
June 24, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew W. Goldwater on behalf of Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Goldwater, Andrew)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/22/2020) (va)
June 22, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/12/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 22, 2020 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 6/12/2020 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2020.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: Upon further consideration of the issues discussed during the telephonic conference held earlier today at 2:00 p.m., see Transcript dated June 12, 2020, the Court sets the following schedule for certain pretrial proceedings in these consolidated actions, and resolves various housekeeping matters in the following manner. 1. By Orders dated June 4, 2020 and June 9, 2020, the Court consolidated 15 cases under the MDL docket 20-MD-2941 for all pre-trial purposes. See 20-MD-2941, ECF Nos. 2, 3. The following four additional related actions are hereby consolidated with all 15 other actions under the MDL docket 20-MD-2941 for all pretrial purposes: Kirschner, et al. v. Robeco Capital Growth Funds - Robeco BP US Premium Equities, No. 20-cv-4479, Kirschner, et al. v. Schwab Capital Trust, No. 20-cv-4480, Kirschner v. Advisors Series Trust (Kellner Merger Fund), et al., No. 20-cv-4433, and Kirschner v. Voya Russell Small Cap Index Portfolio, et al., No. 20-cv-4434. 2. The Court hereby adopts the following (partial) Case Management Plan. (a) Briefs on any anticipated motions to dismiss must be filed on the following bifurcated schedule: (First Round) For any motion to dismiss relating to 546(e) of the Bankruptcy Code, briefs must be filed on the following schedule: (a) moving papers due June 29, 2020; (b) answering papers due July 27, 2020; and (c) reply papers due August 3, 2020. Oral argument on these motions shall be held on August 13, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The Court will issue its decision on these motions in writing by no later than August 27, 2020. (Second Round) As to any action not dismissed after the First Round, any motion to dismiss on any other ground must be briefed on the following schedule: (a) moving papers due September 7, 2020; (b) answering papers due October 5, 2020; and (c) reply papers due October 12, 2020. Oral argument on the Second Round of motions will be held on October 21, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. The Court will issue its decision on these motions in writing by no later than November 4, 2020. (b) After plaintiffs' counsel serves those defendants who have not yet been served (which, based on plaintiffs' counsel's representation, the Court expects to be completed by no later than June 19, 2020), plaintiffs' counsel should promptly advise counsel for those defendants that the instant Order and schedule will apply to those defendants as well. If any of these defendants has any objection to that determination, their counsel, along with plaintiffs' counsel, must convene a joint telephonic conference with Chambers pursuant to Rules 1 and 2 of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice by no later than June 26, 2020. (c) These consolidated actions are not stayed after today, and any and all stays entered by district judges in the actions transferred from other districts are hereby lifted. Document discovery and interrogatories pursuant to Rule 33.3(a) of the Local Civil Rules of the Southern District of New York may commence whenever the parties wish, provided that all such document and interrogatory discovery must be completed by November 4, 2020. In its order of November 4 (see above), the Court will set a schedule for deposition discovery and any summary judgment motion practice. 3. To the extent that the parties anticipate seeking confidential treatment for any discovery in this case, they must jointly submit a proposed protective order, substantially in compliance with Judge Rakoff's model protective order, by no later than June 22, 2020. To the extent that there are any conflicts between the confidentiality order to be entered into by the Court on or about June 22, 2020 and the confidentiality order, as amended, entered into by the Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York in In re: Nine West Holdings, Inc., No. 18-10947 (SCC), ECF Nos. 972, 1471, and 1544 (Bankr. S.D.N.Y.), this Courts order will supersede the Bankruptcy Court's order. (If any party deems it necessary and so advises the Court, the Court will withdraw the reference in the aforesaid bankruptcy for the limited purpose of modifying that court's protective order.) 4. Two recently filed actions -- Kirschner v. Advisors Series Trust (Kellner Merger Fund), et al., No. 20-cv-4433, and Kirschner v. Voya Russell Small Cap Index Portfolio, et al., No. 20-cv-4434 -- were filed under seal at the request of plaintiffs' counsel. Plaintiffs' counsel has now advised the Court that 20-cv-4434 no longer needs to be kept under seal. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to unseal that action forthwith. As to the other action, the relevant parties are hereby directed to promptly consult with one another to see if this sealing should be lifted. In any event, the Court's present intention, unless convinced otherwise, is to unseal this remaining action on or shortly after June 22, 2020. 5. Inasmuch as it has been represented to the Court that the parties have now resolved the issues that had previously existed concerning the confidentiality of some documents (other than the 20-cv-4433 action referred to in #4) previously filed with the Court under seal, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal all such documents and to replace any remaining pseudonyms with the corresponding names of the defendants contained in the captions of the complaints. Plaintiffs' counsel shall cooperate with the Clerk's Office in carrying out this process as promptly as possible. 6. In accord with Rule 2.1(c) of the Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, all counsel who appeared in any of the actions prior to their transfer to this district may continue to represent his or her client and such client need not obtain local counsel. In addition, such counsel need not enter a notice of appearance, provided that they have entered one prior to the transfer, and need not apply for admission pro hac vice. 7. All counsel who had not appeared in an action prior to its transfer, and all counsel in actions filed originally in this district, must enter a notice of appearance in that action and in 20-MD-2941 and, if necessary, apply for admission pro hac vice, as further set forth in this Order. 10. Plaintiffs' unopposed pending motions to dismiss without prejudice Kirschner v. Card, et al., No. 20-cv-4360, and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Card, et al., No. 20-cv-4404, as duplicative of actions earlier commenced by the same plaintiff's against the same defendants and others, are hereby granted. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/7/2020, Responses due by 10/5/2020, Replies due by 10/12/2020. Service due by 6/19/2020. Oral Argument set for 8/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Oral Argument set for 10/21/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (mml)
June 10, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harlan Mitchell Lazarus on behalf of John D'Souza, Jack Gross, Patricia Kenny, Irene A. Koumendouros, Ira Margulies, Vincent Morales..(Lazarus, Harlan)
June 4, 2020 Case Stayed Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04262-JSR, 1:20-cv-04265-JSR, 1:20-cv-04267-JSR(jwh)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: Pursuant to the order of the MDL Panel dated June 2, 2020, see MDL No. 2941, ECF No. 196, the following 13 cases are hereby consolidated for all pre-trial purposes before the undersigned. See Kirschner, et al. v. McClain, et al., No. 20-cv-4262 (JSR) (S.D.N.Y.), and as further set forth in this order. The Court will convene a telephonic conference on June 12, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. (EDT) to set a schedule for any and all pretrial proceedings in these consolidated cases, with the following access information: USA Toll-Free: (888) 363-4735 USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657 Access Code: 1086415 Until that conference, all matters and proceedings in all these cases are stayed, but any counsel in any of these cases may, if they wish, file electronically with the Court such Status Reports as they deem relevant, apprising the Court of where each case stands and what counsel would like to have considered at the June 12 conference, provided such Status Reports are filed no later than June 10, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. (EDT). Counsel for the various plaintiffs and counsel for the various defendants should also confer prior to June 12 as to suggested arrangements for coordination of counsel and liaison with the Court. (Telephone Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/4/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04262-JSR, 1:20-cv-04265-JSR, 1:20-cv-04267-JSR (jwh) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk. Transmission to Civil Case Openings Clerk for processing.
June 4, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
June 4, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
June 4, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
June 4, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:20-md-02941-JSR. (sjo)
June 4, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-md-02941-JSR. (sjo)
June 4, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
June 4, 2020 Filing 82 MDL CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey; Case Number: 2:20-cv-01768. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) Modified on 6/4/2020 (sjo).
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of New York. (MDL 2941 In Re: Nine West Litigation - Judge Jed S. Rakoff) (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Proof of Service on defendant Alison Hemming (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Stay PROCEEDINGS UNTIL JUNE 30, 2020; The time (a) for the defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to theComplaint; (b) for the parties to engage in counsel and court conferences pursuant to Rules 16(b) or 26(f); and (c) for the parties to make initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) are stayed until June 30, 2020.;etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 5/12/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #78 Joint MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS UNTIL JUNE 30, 2020. Motion set for 6/1/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 78 Joint MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS UNTIL JUNE 30, 2020 by Gerald C. Crotty. (MUSCATO, ANDREW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ERIC B. FISHER, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, GREGORY C. PRUDEN, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 77 Copy of NOTICE of Appearance submitted to the U.S. Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (th, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 75 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric B. Fisher to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10693533.) (RYAN, KRISTINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 74 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gregory C. Pruden to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10693407.) (RYAN, KRISTINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory C. Pruden, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/8/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric B. Fisher, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/8/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC identifying Prudential Financial, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (RYAN, KRISTINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #69 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certification of Kristine V. Ryan in Support of Pro Hac Admission of Eric B. Fisher, #70 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certification of Kristine V. Ryan in Support of Pro Hac Admission of Gregory C. Pruden. Motion set for 5/4/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 70 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certification of Kristine V. Ryan in Support of Pro Hac Admission of Gregory C. Pruden by Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Hon. James B. Clark, III, #2 Certification of Gregory C. Pruden, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RYAN, KRISTINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 69 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certification of Kristine V. Ryan in Support of Pro Hac Admission of Eric B. Fisher by Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Hon. James B. Clark, III per Local Civil Rule 101.1, #2 Certification of Eric B. Fisher, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RYAN, KRISTINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiff's and Defendant Arlene Starr ("Defendant"), that Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendant on March 4, 2020, shall be extended from March 25,2020 to May 18, 2020; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/6/2020. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiff's and Defendants Arthur E. Lee and Nancy L. Lee ("Defendants"), that Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendant on March 1, 2020, shall be extended from March 23, 2020 to May 18, 2020; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/6/2020. (sms, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN on behalf of Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion Filed with United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation for Transfer of Actions to the District of Massachusetts Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Motion for Transfer, #2 Brief in Support of the Motion for Transfer, #3 Schedule of Actions, #4 Declaration of Priyanka Wityk in Support of the Motion for Transfer, #5 Docket sheets and complaints in the Actions, #6 Proof of Service of the Motion for Transfer)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 64 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendants Arthur E. Lee and Nancy L. Lee to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 63 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Arlene Starr to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiff's and Defendant Irene A. Koumendouros ("Defendant"), that Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendant on March 20. 2020, shall be extended from April 10, 2020 to May 18, 2020; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/25/2020. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that the Prudential Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to May 18, 2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/25/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 60 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Irene A. Koumendouros to Respond to the Complaint, #2 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendants Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Asset Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, PRIAC Funds (Defendant NJ-3), Prudential Financial, Inc. (The Prudential Insurance Company of America), Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., and Quantitative Management Associates LLC to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendants Susan M. McCoy, Jeffrey Brisman, Ninive Giardano, Mark Dezao, and Suzanne Maloney ("Defendants"), by and their undersigned counsel, that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, shall be extended from March 18, March 23, March 25, March 30, and April 7, 2020, respectively, to May 18, 2020.,; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/23/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendants Patricia Kenny, Vincent Morales, and Ira Margulies ("Defendants"), by and their undersigned counsel, that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, shall be extended from March 23, March 30, and April 1, 2020, respectively, to May 18, 2020.; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/23/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendant John DSouza ("Defendant"), by and their undersigned counsel, that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, shall be extended from March 23, 2020 to May 18, 2020.; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/23/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 56 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant John D'Souza to Respond to the Complaint, #2 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendants Patricia Kenny, Vincent Morales, and Ira Margulies to Respond to the Complaint, #3 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendants Susan M. McCory, Jeffrey Brisman, Ninive Giordano, Mark Dezao, and Suzanne Maloney to Respond to the Complain)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendant on March 3, 2020, shall be extended from March 24, 2020 to May 18, 2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/20/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 54 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant NJ-4 to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendant Gerald C. Crotty ("Defendant"), by and their undersigned counsel, that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendant on March 4, 2020, shall be extended from March 25, 2020 to May 18, 2020; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/18/2020. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 52 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Gerald C. Crotty to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Ninive Giordano served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #43 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Defendant NJ-3, Quantitative Management Associates LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc., Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/1/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that Defendant's (Charles L. Pickett) time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended from March 18, 2020 to May 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/16/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that Defendant's (Pamela M. Paul) time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended from March 18, 2020 to May 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/16/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that Defendant's (Jack Gross) time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended from March 18, 2020 to May 18,2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/16/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MUSCATO on behalf of Gerald C. Crotty (MUSCATO, ANDREW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. PRIAC FUNDS served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 45 Letter from Robert J. Lack. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Jack Gross to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by SUZANNE M. CERRA on behalf of Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC (CERRA, SUZANNE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 43 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (RYAN, KRISTINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTINE V. RYAN on behalf of Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC (RYAN, KRISTINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendants on February 26, 2020, shall be extended from March 18, 2020 to May 18, 2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/13/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 40 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendants John T. McClain and Tami Fersko to Respond to the Complaint, #2 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Pamela M. Paul to Respond to the Complain, #3 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Charles L. Pickett to Respond to the Complain)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Vincent Morales served on 3/7/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Gerald C. Crotty served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Patricia Kenny served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Nancy L. Lee served on 3/1/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Arthur E. Lee served on 3/1/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Arundhati Kulkarni served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Mark DeZao served on 3/7/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Cynthia DiPietrantonio served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Charles L. Pickett served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Pamela M. Paul served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Nine Chapters Capital Management LLC served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Arlene Starr served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. John D'Souza served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Jeffrey Brisman served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Tami Fersko served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Susan M. McCoy served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Quantitative Management Associates LLC served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Prudential Financial, Inc. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. John T. McClain served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Jack Gross served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark for all further proceedings. Judge Stanley R. Chesler, Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/28/20. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Seal Document #4 ; that the Plaintiffs Motion to Seal is hereby granted. The unredacted Complaint shall be filed under seal pending further order of this Court. The following materials shall be redacted from the publicly filed version of the Complaint;etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/27/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Edward A. Friedman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10457208.) (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/21/2020. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Robert J. Lack re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Notice of Motion for Admission of Edward A. Friedman Pro Hac Vice by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Edward A. Friedman re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Notice of Motion for Admission of Edward A. Friedman Pro Hac Vice by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Notice of Motion for Admission of Edward A. Friedman Pro Hac Vice by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Jeffrey Brisman, Gerald C. Crotty, John D'Souza, Mark DeZao, Defendant NJ-1, Defendant NJ-2, Defendant NJ-3, Defendant NJ-4, Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Tami Fersko, Ninive Giordano, Jack Gross, Alison Hemming, Patricia Kenny, Irene A. Koumendouros, Arundhati Kulkarni, Suzanne Maloney, Ira Margulies, John T. McClain, Susan M. McCoy, Vincent Morales, Nine Chapters Capital Management LLC, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Pamela M. Paul, Charles L. Pickett, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC, Arlene Starr. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Seal Document #4 Exhibit (to Document),, . Motion set for 3/16/2020 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Priyanka Wityk re #5 MOTION to Seal Document #4 Exhibit (to Document),, by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re #5 MOTION to Seal Document #4 Exhibit (to Document),, (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Document #4 Exhibit (to Document),, by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Unredacted Complaint by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (LACK, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB identifying WSFS Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10430469) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner.(LACK, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirschner et al v. McClain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald C. Crotty
Represented By: Andrew Muscato
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela M. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nine Chapters Capital Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund
Represented By: Suzanne M. Cerra
Represented By: Kristine V. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Gross
Represented By: Harlan Mitchell Lazarus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur E. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. McClain
Represented By: Craig Aaron Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D'Souza
Represented By: Harlan Mitchell Lazarus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia DiPietrantonio
Represented By: Craig Aaron Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priac funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL INC
Represented By: Suzanne M. Cerra
Represented By: Kristine V. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Hemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio
Represented By: Suzanne M. Cerra
Represented By: Kristine V. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio
Represented By: Suzanne M. Cerra
Represented By: Kristine V. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark DeZao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninive Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co.
Represented By: Suzanne M. Cerra
Represented By: Kristine V. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene A. Koumendouros
Represented By: Harlan Mitchell Lazarus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Morales
Represented By: Harlan Mitchell Lazarus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arundhati Kulkarni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami Fersko
Represented By: Craig Aaron Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Margulies
Represented By: Harlan Mitchell Lazarus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Brisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Kenny
Represented By: Harlan Mitchell Lazarus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-3
Represented By: Suzanne M. Cerra
Represented By: Kristine V. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L, Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantitative Management Associates LLC
Represented By: Suzanne M. Cerra
Represented By: Kristine V. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Series Trust: AST Academic Strategies Asset Allocation Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QMA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Series Trust: AST Small-Cap Value Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Target Portfolio Trust: PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Series Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nine Chapters Systematic Master Fund, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc S Kirschner
Represented By: Edward A. Friedman
Represented By: Robert J. Lack
Represented By: Robert Joel Lack
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Tepper
Represented By: Andrew W. Goldwater
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux
Represented By: Shenghao Stan Chiueh
Represented By: Priyanka Kishore Wityk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Edward A. Friedman
Represented By: Robert J. Lack
Represented By: Robert Joel Lack
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Tepper
Represented By: Andrew W. Goldwater
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux
Represented By: Shenghao Stan Chiueh
Represented By: Priyanka Kishore Wityk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?