Santos v. Tribune Publishing Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Marcus Santos
Defendant: Tribune Publishing Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04283
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Order. Document filed by Marcus Santos..(Liebowitz, Richard)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Tribune Publishing Company, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Marcus Santos. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit B).(Liebowitz, Richard)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Liebowitz, Richard)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Liebowitz, Richard)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Ready for Trial by 12/17/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/28/2020. Deposition due by 11/13/2020. Discovery due by 11/13/2020. Motions due by 11/19/2020. Responses due by 12/10/2020. Replies due by 12/16/2020. Oral Argument set for 1/7/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Harold J. Raby on 7/17/2020) (jwh)
July 17, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/17/2020, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H. Freeman on behalf of Marcus Santos..(Freeman, James)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tribune Publishing Company for Tribune Publishing Company, LLC. Document filed by Tribune Publishing Company, LLC..(Leish, Matthew)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Aaron Leish on behalf of Tribune Publishing Company, LLC..(Leish, Matthew)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Marcus Santos..(Liebowitz, Richard)
June 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this notice and enclosures, and to furnish Chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you should send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally, informing the party that any unrepresented party is required to appear at the conference in person. Finally, upon receipt of this notice, please immediately furnish Chambers with a courtesy copy of your complaint and F.R.C.P. Rule 7.1 Statement, if applicable. Since this case has been designated an electronic case, by the date of the initial pretrial conference counsel for all parties are required to register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures for Electronic Case Filing and file an Notice of Appearance. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 7-17-2020 at 12:00 PM on the following teleconference line: Dial-In (888) 363-4735; Access Code: 1086415. No application for adjournment will be considered unless made within one week of the date of this notice. The fact that any party has not answered the complaint does not excuse attendance by that party or warrant any adjournment of the conference, as further set forth. (Telephone Conference set for 7/17/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Initial Conference set for 7/17/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/14/2020) (mml)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tribune Publishing Company, LLC..(jgo)
June 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tribune Publishing Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marcus Santos..(Liebowitz, Richard)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tribune Publishing Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20118805)Document filed by Marcus Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Tribune Publishing Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Santos
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tribune Publishing Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?