International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc. v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv04284
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/22/2020).(mro)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(Levine, Danielle)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a fast disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/14/2020) (mro)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The time for the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to August 14, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Danielle J. Levine dated July 13, 2020. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(Levine, Danielle)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Judith Levine on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(Levine, Danielle)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance of Mariko Hirose served on U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services on 6/18/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Austin, Kathryn)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 6/11/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Civil Cover Sheet, Form AO 85, Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference (ECF No. 6), the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19 served on U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services on 06/11/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 6/11/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Austin, Kathryn)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mariko Hirose on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Hirose, Mariko)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/9/2020) (mro)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(jgo)
June 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Austin, Kathryn)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Austin, Kathryn)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Austin, Kathryn)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20122108)Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Austin, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc. v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Shu-Yeng Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?