Kirschner et al v. Kimmel et al
Plaintiff: MARC S. KIRCHNER, WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB and Mark S. Kirschner
Defendant: KBC EQUITY FUND STRATEGIC SATELLITES, SUSQUEHANNA INTERNATIONAL GROUP LLP, GREGORY CLARK, ROY CHAN, DREMAN CONTRARIAN FUNDS (DREMAN CONTRARIAN SMALL CAP VALUE FUND), ERIC DAUWALTER, EQ ADVISORS TRUST (ATM SMALL CAP MANAGED VOLATILITY PORTFOLIO), NATIXIS SA, WAYNE KULKIN, SEI INSTITUTIONAL INVESTMENTS TRUST (SIIT SMALL CAP FUND), JOSEPH STAFINIAK, LYNNE BERNSTOCK, STEPHEN C. TROY, ANTHEM HEALTH PLANS OF VIRGINIA, INC., VANGUARD INSTITUTIONAL TOTAL STOCK MARKET INDEX TRUST, SEI INSTITUTIONAL MANAGED TRUST (SIMT SMALL CAP VALUE FUND), JAMES A. MITAROTONDA, CHRYSLER WORLD IMI EQUITY INDEX ND, COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, TOUCHSTONE FUNDS GROUP TRUST (TOUCHSTONE ARBITRAGE FUND), RBB FUND, INC. (WPG PARTNERS SMALL/MICRO CAP VALUE FUND), VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD EXTENDED MARKET INDEX FUND), BARINGTON COMPANIES INVESTORS, LLC, LINCOLN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST (LVIP SSGA SMALL-CAP INDEX FUND), NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS (NATIONWIDE SMALL CAP INDEX FUND), DONNA F. ZARCONE, TIAA-CREF FUNDS, STEFANI GREENFIELD, NORMAN R. VEIT, JR., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO, JODI G. WRIGHT, UNIFIED SERIES TRUST (SYMONS SMALL CAP INSTITUTIONAL FUND), SIDNEY KIMMEL, THE GDL FUND, LARISSA SYGIDA, VANGUARD INTERNATIONAL EQUITY INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD TOTAL WORLD STOCK INDEX FUND), GABELLI INVESTOR FUNDS INC. (THE GABELLI ABC FUND), DANIEL FISHMAN, ROSA GENOVESI, KATHLEEN NEDOROSTEK KASWELL, EMERSON ELECTRIC CO., GREGG MARKS, MARY E. BELLE, VANGUARD WORLD FUND (VANGUARD CONSUMER DISCRETIONARY INDEX FUND), AMY RAPAWY, OPPENHEIMER GLOBAL MULTI STRATEGIES FUND, TIAA-CREF FUNDS (TIAA-CREF SMALL-CAP BLEND INDEX FUND), JAMIE CYGIELMAN, JANET CARR, JAMES CAPIOLA, ODIN HOLDINGS LP, KATHERINE BUTLER, CHI OPERATING INVESTMENT PROGRAM, LP, VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD SMALL-CAP VALUE INDEX FUND), JANICE BROWN, JAMES T. OSTROWSKI, VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD TOTAL STOCK MARKET INDEX FUND), EQ ADVISORS TRUST (EQ/2000 MANAGED VOLATILITY PORTFOLIO), GABELLI 787 FUND, INC. (ENTERPRISE MERGERS AND ACQUISITIONS FUND), KBC EQUITY FUND LEISURE AND TOURISM, TOUCHSTONE FUNDS GROUP TRUST (TOUCHSTONE MERGER ARBITRAGE FUND), QUANTITATIVE MASTER SERIES LLC (MASTER EXTENDED MARKET INDEX SERIES), FRANCIS X. CLAPS, BARINGTON COMPANIES EQUITY PARTNERS, L.P., STUART WEITZMAN, VANGUARD VALLEY FORGE FUNDS (VANGUARD BALANCED INDEX FUND), NATIONWIDE VARIABLE INSURANCE TRUST (NVIT SMALL CAP INDEX FUND), AIDA TEJERO-DECOLLI, SHARON HARGER, MATTHEW H. KAMENS, MULTIMANAGER SMALL CAP VALUE PORTFOLIO, PRINCIPAL VARIABLE CONTRACTS FUNDS INC. (SMALLCAP VALUE ACCOUNT I), JOSEPH A. ROSATO, BARBARA KREGER, LOWELL W. ROBINSON, FRANCES LUKAS, HEATHER ROUSSEL, KIMBERLY THOMAS, HEATHER HARLAN, JOHN D. DEMSEY, ROYCE INSTITUTIONAL, LLC (OPPORTUNITY PORTFOLIO), TFS CAPITAL LLC, THE SIDNEY KIMMEL REVOCABLE INDENTURE OF TRUST, VALUED ADVISERS TRUST (FOUNDRY PARTNERS FUNDAMENTAL SMALL CAP VALUE FUND), GEORGE SHARP, ROBIN WHITNEY MILLS, SUZANNE KARKUS, NATIONWIDE VARIABLE INSURANCE TRUST (NVIT MULTI-MANAGER SMALL CAP VALUE FUND), SCOTT BOWMAN, TALCOTT RESOLUTION LIFE INSURANCE CO., JPMORGAN SYSTEMATIC ALPHA FUND, GERALD HOOD, ALLIANZ GLOBAL INVESTORS OF AMERICA LP, TWO SIGMA INVESTMENTS LP, SUSAN DUFFY, VANGUARD SCOTTSDALE FUNDS (VANGUARD RUSSELL 2000 INDEX FUND), BLUECREST CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LTD., EILEEN DUNN, THE ARBITRAGE EVENT-DRIVEN FUND, JOSEPH T DONNALLEY, CREF EQUITY INDEX ACCOUNT, FEDERATED EQUITY FUNDS (FEDERATED CLOVER SMALL VALUE FUND), VANGUARD SCOTTSDALE FUNDS (VANGUARD RUSSELL 2000 VALUE INDEX FUND), RUSSELL US SMALL CAP EQUITY FUND, ZINE MAZOUZI, PROSHARES TRUST (PROSHARES MERGER ETF), VANGUARD RUSSELL 2000 VALUE INDEX TRUST, JAMES CHAN, PRINCIPAL FUNDS INC. (SMALLCAP VALUE FUND II), CALVERT VARIABLE PRODUCTS, INC. (CALVERT VP RUSSELL 2000 SMALL CAP INDEX PORTFOLIO), NICOLETTA PALMA, KBC EQUITY FUND FALLEN ANGELS, VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD SMALL-CAP INDEX FUND), SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. f/k/a MINNESOTA LIFE INSURANCE CO., AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS (NATIONWIDE U.S. SMALL CAP VALUE FUND), TIAA-CREF FUNDS (TIAA-CREF EQUITY INDEX FUND), MITCHEL LEVINE, JEFFREY D. NUECHTERLEIN, PINEBRIDGE INVESTMENTS LP, PRINCIPAL FUNDS INC. (GLOBAL MULTI-STRATEGY FUND), Joseph AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC., VANGUARD INSTITUTIONAL INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD INSTITUTIONAL TOTAL STOCK MARKET INDEX FUND), Securian Life Insurance Co., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND, KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism, Principal Funds Inc. (Global Multi-Strategy Fund), Robyn Whitney Mills, KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels, Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund f/k/a Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund), Community Insurance Company, Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund f/k/a Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), Joseph T. Donnalley, Minnesota Life Insurance Co.,, Allianz Global Investors of America L.P, Pinebridge Investments LP, College Retirement Equities Fund (CREF Equity Index Account), American International Group Inc. and KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites
Case Number: 1:2020cv04287
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 165 NOTICE of Joinder of Defendant Wayne Kulkin in Reply Memorandum of Law of Former Director and Officer Defendants in Support of their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. re: #159 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,,. Document filed by Wayne Kulkin..(Seife, Howard)
August 3, 2020 Filing 164 JOINDER to join re: (279 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (159 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 281 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,, Defendant Janet Carr's Joinder in Reply in Support of Motions to Dismiss the Complaint by Public Shareholder Defendants and Former Director and Officer Defendants. Document filed by Janet Carr.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Chou, James)
August 3, 2020 Filing 163 JOINDER to join re: (279 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, REPLY JOINDER AND SUPPLEMENT OF DEFENDANT NATIXIS S.A. TO PUBLIC SHAREHOLDER DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER THE SAFE HARBOR OF 11 U.S.C. 546(e). Document filed by Natixis SA.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Levy, Adam)
August 3, 2020 Filing 162 JOINDER to join (NOTICE OF JOINDER AND STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND (CREF EQUITY INDEX ACCOUNT), TIAA-CREF FUNDS, TIAA-CREF FUNDS (TIAA-CREF EQUITY INDEX FUND), TIAA-CREF FUNDS (TIAA-CREF SMALL-CAP BLEND INDEX FUND) IN SUPPORT OF REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PUBLIC SHAREHOLDER DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER THE SAFE HARBOR OF 11 U.S.C. 546(e)). Document filed by Cref Equity Index Account, TIAA-CREF Funds, TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund), TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund)..(Martin, Craig)
August 3, 2020 Filing 161 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants. . Document filed by Mary E. Belle, Kathleen Nedorostek Kaswell, Joseph Stafiniak. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Wilson, Ryan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 160 JOINDER to join re: (279 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (281 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,, . Document filed by Lynne Bernstock, Jeff Brisman, Janice Brown, Katherine Butler, James Capiola, Gregory Clark, Jamie Cygielman, Eric Dauwalter, Mark DeZao, Beth B. Dorfsman, Eileen Dunn, Rosa Genovesi, Laurie J. Gentile, Bryan R. Gilligan, Ninive Giordano, Stacey A. Harmon, Harvest Street Capital LLC, Mahmood Hassani-Sadi, Richard H. Hein, Gerald Hood, Linda V. Kothe, Arundhati Kulkarni, Suzanne Maloney, Zine Mazouzi, Susan M. McCoy, Robyn Whitney Mills, Thomas Nolan, Pamela M. Paul, Charles Joseph Pickett, Joseph A. Rosato, Arlene Starr, Larissa Sygida, Kimberly Thomas, Thomas M. Murray PO N. Murray Jt Ten, Norman R Veit, Jr., John W. Deem, Kathleen A. O'Brien Gibber, Gregory Clark, Amy Rapawy, Norman R. Veit, Jr..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Kagen, Stuart)
August 3, 2020 Filing 159 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (93 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor on Behalf of Former Director and Officer Defendants. . Document filed by Christopher R. Cade, Dianne Card, Wesley R Card, Gerald C. Crotty, Ira M. Dansky, John D. Demsey, Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Richard L. Dickson, Joseph T. Donnalley, Tami Fersko, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades, Ira Martin Dansky Revocable Trust, Matthew H. Kamens, Sidney Kimmel, John T McClain, Robert L. Mettler, James A. Mitarotonda, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Lowell W. Robinson, TELENDOS, LLC, Aida Tejero-Decolli, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Ann Marie C Wilkins. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04289-JSR.(Gordon, Andrew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Scott Bowman served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. Service was made by first-class mail. Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Mark S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons).(Friedman, Edward)
July 30, 2020 Filing 157 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scott Bowman. (sj)
July 29, 2020 Filing 156 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Scott Bowman, re: #130 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB..(Friedman, Edward)
July 28, 2020 Filing 155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Community Insurance Company served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. Service was made by first-class mail. Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Mark S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons).(Friedman, Edward)
July 28, 2020 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. Service was made by first-class mail. Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Mark S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons).(Friedman, Edward)
July 27, 2020 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (93 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor on Behalf of Former Director and Officer Defendants. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Former Director and Officer Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under 11 U.S.C. 546(e). Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Friedman, Edward)
July 27, 2020 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Public Shareholder Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under 11 U.S.C. 546(e). Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Friedman, Edward)
July 27, 2020 Filing 151 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Metropolitan Life Insurance Co served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. Service was made by first-class mail. Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Mark S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons).(Friedman, Edward)
July 27, 2020 Filing 150 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Community Insurance Company. (sj)
July 27, 2020 Filing 149 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (sj)
July 24, 2020 Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of Bam Advisor Services, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, Manulife Financial, Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD, Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, Schwab Capital Trust, Schwab Fundamental US Small Company Index Fund, Schwab Small-Cap Index Fund, Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund, Transamerica Asset Management, Inc., US Small Company Fund, USAA Extended Market Index Fund, Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company I- Small Cap Index Fund, Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company I- Small Cap Special Values Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD, Bam Advisor Services, SA U.S. Small Company Fund, SA U.S.Small Company Fund, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund a/k/a John Hancock II SEA Small Cap. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Doluisio, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Christopher Raphel on behalf of Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund..(Raphel, Brian)
July 24, 2020 Filing 146 JOINDER to join re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants., (93 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor on Behalf of Former Director and Officer Defendants. . Document filed by Kathleen A. O'Brien Gibber, Thomas M. Murray PO N. Murray Jt Ten.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Kagen, Stuart)
July 24, 2020 Filing 145 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Malen Taylor on behalf of John W. Deem, Kathleen A. O'Brien Gibber, Thomas M. Murray PO N. Murray Jt Ten. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Taylor, Joel)
July 24, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Kagen on behalf of John W. Deem, Kathleen A. O'Brien Gibber, Thomas M. Murray PO N. Murray Jt Ten. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Kagen, Stuart)
July 24, 2020 Filing 143 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., re: #130 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB..(Friedman, Edward)
July 24, 2020 Filing 142 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Community Insurance Company, re: #130 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB..(Friedman, Edward)
July 24, 2020 Filing 141 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(pc)
July 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Edward A. Friedman to RE-FILE Document No. #140 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #139 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Link the summons to the Amended Complaint (document 130);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 140 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., re: (245 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Friedman, Edward) Modified on 7/24/2020 (pc).
July 23, 2020 Filing 139 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Community Insurance Company, re: (245 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Friedman, Edward) Modified on 7/24/2020 (pc).
July 23, 2020 Filing 138 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., re: #130 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB..(Friedman, Edward)
July 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Edward A. Friedman to RE-FILE Document No. #135 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Levy on behalf of Natixis SA. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Levy, Adam)
July 22, 2020 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE served on Suzanne Karkus. Document filed by Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB..(Friedman, Edward)
July 22, 2020 Filing 135 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO PARTY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., re: #130 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB..(Friedman, Edward) Modified on 7/23/2020 (pc).
July 21, 2020 Filing 134 JOINDER to join re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants. . Document filed by Valued Advisers Trust (Foundry Partners Fundamental Small Cap Value Fund). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration In Support of Joinder to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Parker, Marissa)
July 21, 2020 Filing 133 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Valued Advisers Trust (Foundry Partners Fundamental Small Cap Value Fund).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Parker, Marissa)
July 21, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marissa Rachel Parker on behalf of Valued Advisers Trust (Foundry Partners Fundamental Small Cap Value Fund). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Parker, Marissa)
July 20, 2020 Filing 131 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Suzanne Karkus..(jgo)
July 20, 2020 Filing 130 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, against American Family Mutual Insurance Co., American International Group Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Barington Companies Equity Partners, L.P., Barington Companies Investors, LLC, Mary E. Belle, Lynne Bernstock, Bluecrest Capital Management Ltd., Scott Bowman, Janice Brown, Katherine Butler, Calvert Variable Products, Inc. (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio), James Capiola, Janet Carr, James Chan, Roy Chan, Chi Operating Investment Program, LP, Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND, Francis X. Claps, Gregory Clark, Community Insurance Company, Jamie Cygielman, Eric Dauwalter, John D. Demsey, Joseph T. Donnalley, Dreman Contrarian Funds (Dreman Contrarian Small Cap Value Fund), Susan Duffy, Eileen Dunn, EQ Advisors Trust (ATM Small Cap Managed Volatility Portfolio), EQ Advisors Trust (EQ/2000 Managed Volatility Portfolio), Emerson Electric Co., Daniel Fishman, Gabelli 787 Fund, Inc. (Enterprise Mergers and Acquisitions Fund), Gabelli Investor Funds Inc. (The Gabelli ABC Fund), Rosa Genovesi, Stefani Greenfield, Sharon Harger, Heather Harlan, Gerald Hood, JPMorgan Systematic Alpha Fund, KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels, KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism, KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites, Matthew H. Kamens, Suzanne Karkus, Kathleen Nedorostek Kaswell, Sidney Kimmel, Barbara Kreger, Wayne Kulkin, Mitchel Levine, Lincoln Variable Insurance Products Trust (LVIP SSGA Small-Cap Index Fund), Frances Lukas, Gregg Marks, Zine Mazouzi, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co, Robyn Whitney Mills, James A. Mitarotonda, Multimanager Small Cap Value Portfolio, Nationwide Mutual Funds (Nationwide Small Cap Index Fund), Nationwide Mutual Funds (Nationwide U.S. Small Cap Value Fund), Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust (NVIT Multi-Manager Small Cap Value Fund), Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust (NVIT Small Cap Index Fund), Natixis SA, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Odin Holdings LP, Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, James T. Ostrowski, Nicoletta Palma, Pinebridge Investments LP, Principal Funds Inc. (Global Multi-Strategy Fund), Principal Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Fund II), Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Account I), Proshares Trust (Proshares Merger ETF), Quantitative Master Series LLC (Master Extended Market Index Series), RBB Fund, Inc. (WPG Partners Small/Micro Cap Value Fund), Amy Rapawy, Lowell W. Robinson, Joseph A. Rosato, Heather Roussel, Royce Institutional, LLC (Opportunity Portfolio), Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, SEI Institutional Investments Trust (SIIT Small Cap Fund), SEI Institutional Managed Trust (SIMT Small Cap Value Fund), Securian Life Insurance Co., George Sharp, Joseph Stafiniak, Susquehanna International Group LLP, Larissa Sygida, TFS Capital LLC, TIAA-CREF Funds, TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund), TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund), Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co., Aida Tejero-Decolli, The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, The GDL Fund, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Kimberly Thomas, Stephen C. Troy, Two Sigma Investments LP, Unified Series Trust (Symons Small Cap Institutional Fund), Valued Advisers Trust (Foundry Partners Fundamental Small Cap Value Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Extended Market Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Index Funds (Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds (Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund), Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Index Fund), Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Fund), Vanguard Valley Forge Funds (Vanguard Balanced Index Fund), Vanguard World Fund (Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund), Norman R. Veit, Jr., Stuart Weitzman, Jodi G. Wright, Donna F. Zarcone, Allianz Asset Management of America L.P. f/k/a Allianz Global Investors of America LP, College Retirement Equities Fund (CREF Equity Index Account), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund f/k/a Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund f/k/a Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Mark S. Kirschner. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,..(Friedman, Edward)
July 17, 2020 Filing 129 DECLARATION of Joseph Cioffi in Support re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants.. Document filed by Natixis SA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 2B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Cioffi, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Filing 128 JOINDER to join re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants. . Document filed by Natixis SA.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Cioffi, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Filing 127 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natixis SA.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Cioffi, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Filing 126 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Cioffi on behalf of Natixis SA. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Cioffi, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Filing 125 JOINDER to join re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants., (88 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR) Notice of Appearance,,, . Document filed by Janet Carr.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Chou, James)
July 17, 2020 Filing 124 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Two Sigma Investments LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Raiford, Landon)
July 17, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Matthew Kirby on behalf of Wayne Kulkin. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Kirby, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Seife on behalf of Wayne Kulkin. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Seife, Howard)
July 17, 2020 Filing 121 NOTICE of Joinder And Statement Of Defendant Wayne Kulkin In Support Of Former Director And Officer Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Under Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor re: (93 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor on Behalf of Former Director and Officer Defendants.. Document filed by Wayne Kulkin. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Seife, Howard)
July 17, 2020 Filing 120 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Suzanne Karkus, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB..(Friedman, Edward)
July 17, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Matthew Joel Aaronson on behalf of Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Community Insurance Company. New Address: Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP, 875 Third Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10022, (212) 704-6000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Aaronson, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Filing 118 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Principal Financial Group, Inc. for Calvert Variable Products, Inc. (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio). Document filed by Calvert Variable Products, Inc. (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Weiner, Gregg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 117 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund, Royce Fund (Royce Opportunity Fund), Royce Institutional, LLC (Opportunity Portfolio).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Weiner, Gregg)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER FOR MOTION PRO HAC VICE granting #109 Motion for John J. Cruciani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/15/2020) (jwh)
July 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Edward A. Friedman to RE-FILE Document No. #115 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 14, 2020 Filing 115 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO PARTY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Suzanne Karkus, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB..(Friedman, Edward) Modified on 7/15/2020 (pc).
July 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Edward A. Friedman to RE-FILE Document No. #107 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; case number and caption on PDF do not match this case; summons request is not linked to a pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
July 14, 2020 Filing 114 DECLARATION of Brian D. Koosed in Support re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants., (112 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 225 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) Joinder,. Document filed by Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Koosed, Brian)
July 14, 2020 Filing 113 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Emerson Electric Co...(Turner, Marshall)
July 14, 2020 Filing 112 JOINDER to join re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants. . Document filed by Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Koosed, Brian)
July 14, 2020 Filing 111 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund, Other Affiliate Western & Southern Life and Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC for the Exclusive Benefit of its Customers for Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund). Document filed by Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Koosed, Brian)
July 14, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian David Koosed on behalf of Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Koosed, Brian)
July 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #109 MOTION for John J Cruciani to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED Cruciani Motion Pro Hac Vice, Notarized Affidavit, MO Good Standing Certificate, KS Good Standing Certificate, Proposed Order (Fee already paid on Doc. 52). Mo. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
July 14, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION for John J Cruciani to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED Cruciani Motion Pro Hac Vice, Notarized Affidavit, MO Good Standing Certificate, KS Good Standing Certificate, Proposed Order (Fee already paid on Doc. 52). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notarized Affidavit of John J Cruciani, #2 Exhibit Cruciani Kansas Certificate Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Cruciani Missouri Certificate Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Cruciani Proposed Order).(Turner, Marshall)
July 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/13/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT WAYNE KULKIN TO JOIN MOTIONS TO DISMISS UNDER 11 U.S.C. 546(e): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED 1. Defendant has agreed to accept service of the complaint and that the effective date of service will be the date of the Court's endorsement of this stipulation and order, with Defendant expressly reserving all other rights and defenses. 2. The deadline for Defendant to file joinder to one or more of the motions to dismiss under 11 U.S.C. 546(e) filed in these associated cases shall be up to and including July 17, 2020. 3. Except as expressly set forth herein or as may otherwise be ordered by the Court, the schedule for motions to dismiss set forth in Paragraph 2(a) of the Court's Order dated June 12, 2020 (ECF No. 20) shall apply to Defendant. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/13/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR (jwh)
July 13, 2020 Filing 107 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Suzanne Karkus, re: Complaint. Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Friedman, Edward) Modified on 7/14/2020 (pne).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE granting #101 Motion for Ryan M. Tosi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/13/2020) (nb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Riccardo M. DeBari in Support re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants.. Document filed by Unified Series Trust (Symons Small Cap Institutional Fund). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Form N-CSR))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Debari, Riccardo)
July 13, 2020 Filing 104 JOINDER to join re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants. . Document filed by Unified Series Trust (Symons Small Cap Institutional Fund).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Debari, Riccardo)
July 13, 2020 Filing 103 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Unified Series Trust (Symons Small Cap Institutional Fund)..(Debari, Riccardo)
July 13, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Riccardo Debari on behalf of Unified Series Trust (Symons Small Cap Institutional Fund)..(Debari, Riccardo)
July 10, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION for Ryan M. Tosi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20640129. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wisdom Tree Asset Management Inc., Federated Equity Funds (Federated Clover Small Value Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ryan M. Tosi, #3 Exhibit C - Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Tosi, Ryan)
July 10, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brett David Goodman on behalf of Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Community Insurance Company. New Address: Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP, 875 Third Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10022, 212-704-6000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Goodman, Brett)
July 10, 2020 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Brian D. Koosed in Support re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants.. Document filed by Federated Equity Funds (Federated Clover Small Value Fund). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Shareholder Report)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Koosed, Brian)
July 10, 2020 Filing 98 JOINDER to join re: (90 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants. . Document filed by Federated Equity Funds (Federated Clover Small Value Fund).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Koosed, Brian)
July 10, 2020 Filing 97 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Federated Equity Funds (Federated Clover Small Value Fund).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Koosed, Brian)
July 10, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian David Koosed on behalf of Federated Equity Funds (Federated Clover Small Value Fund). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Koosed, Brian)
July 9, 2020 Filing 95 JOINDER to join re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants., (93 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor on Behalf of Former Director and Officer Defendants. . Document filed by Jamie Cygielman, Harvest Street Capital LLC, Robyn Whitney Mills.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Kagen, Stuart)
July 9, 2020 Filing 94 DECLARATION of Andrew G. Devore in Support re: (73 in 1:20-cv-04433-JSR) Joinder,,. Document filed by Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund, Royce Fund (Royce Opportunity Fund), Calvert Variable Products, Inc. (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio), Royce Institutional, LLC (Opportunity Portfolio). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A(a), #3 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Devore, Andrew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 93 JOINDER to join re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants. . Document filed by Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund, Royce Fund (Royce Opportunity Fund), Calvert Variable Products, Inc. (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio), Royce Institutional, LLC (Opportunity Portfolio).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Weiner, Gregg)
July 9, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Michael Harris on behalf of Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund, Royce Fund (Royce Opportunity Fund), Calvert Variable Products, Inc. (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio), Royce Institutional, LLC (Opportunity Portfolio). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Harris, Adam)
July 9, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Glenn Devore on behalf of Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund, Royce Fund (Royce Opportunity Fund), Calvert Variable Products, Inc. (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio), Royce Institutional, LLC (Opportunity Portfolio). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Devore, Andrew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregg L Weiner on behalf of Legg Mason Royce U.S. Small Cap Opportunity Fund, Royce Fund (Royce Opportunity Fund), Calvert Variable Products, Inc. (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio), Royce Institutional, LLC (Opportunity Portfolio). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Weiner, Gregg)
July 9, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Malen Taylor on behalf of Lynne Bernstock, Jeff Brisman, Janice Brown, Katherine Butler, James Capiola, Gregory Clark, Jamie Cygielman, Eric Dauwalter, Mark DeZao, Beth B. Dorfsman, Eileen Dunn, Rosa Genovesi, Laurie J. Gentile, Bryan R. Gilligan, Ninive Giordano, Stacey A. Harmon, Harvest Street Capital LLC, Mahmood Hassani-Sadi, Richard H. Hein, Gerald Hood, Linda V. Kothe, Arundhati Kulkarni, Suzanne Maloney, Zine Mazouzi, Susan M. McCoy, Robyn Whitney Mills, Thomas Nolan, Pamela M. Paul, Charles Joseph Pickett, Joseph A. Rosato, Arlene Starr, Larissa Sygida, Kimberly Thomas, Norman R Veit, Jr., Gregory Clark, Amy Rapawy, Norman R. Veit, Jr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Taylor, Joel)
July 9, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Kagen on behalf of Lynne Bernstock, Jeff Brisman, Janice Brown, Katherine Butler, James Capiola, Gregory Clark, Jamie Cygielman, Eric Dauwalter, Mark DeZao, Beth B. Dorfsman, Eileen Dunn, Rosa Genovesi, Laurie J. Gentile, Bryan R. Gilligan, Ninive Giordano, Stacey A. Harmon, Harvest Street Capital LLC, Mahmood Hassani-Sadi, Richard H. Hein, Gerald Hood, Linda V. Kothe, Arundhati Kulkarni, Suzanne Maloney, Zine Mazouzi, Susan M. McCoy, Robyn Whitney Mills, Thomas Nolan, Pamela M. Paul, Charles Joseph Pickett, Joseph A. Rosato, Arlene Starr, Larissa Sygida, Kimberly Thomas, Norman R Veit, Jr., Gregory Clark, Amy Rapawy, Norman R. Veit, Jr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Kagen, Stuart)
July 9, 2020 Filing 87 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Other Affiliate Allianz Asset Management of Amercia L.P. for Allianz Global Investors of America L.P. Document filed by Allianz Global Investors of America L.P.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Weiner, Gregg)
July 9, 2020 Filing 86 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Weiner, Gregg)
July 8, 2020 Filing 85 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barington Capital Group, L.P. for Barington Companies Investors, LLC; Other Affiliate BARINGTON COMPANIES INVESTORS, LLC for Barington Companies Equity Partners, L.P.. Document filed by Barington Companies Equity Partners, L.P., Barington Companies Investors, LLC..(Entwistle, Andrew)
July 8, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Alan Schrader on behalf of Stefani Greenfield..(Schrader, David)
July 7, 2020 Filing 83 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund..(Entwistle, Andrew)
July 7, 2020 Filing 82 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gabelli 787 Fund, Inc. (Enterprise Mergers and Acquisitions Fund), Gabelli Investor Funds Inc. (The Gabelli ABC Fund), The GDL Fund..(Entwistle, Andrew)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (127) Motion for Craig C. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR; granting (74) Motion for Craig C. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04287-JSR. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/7/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR (jwh)
July 6, 2020 Filing 80 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Principal Variable Contracts Funds, Inc. (SmallCap Account) for Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Account I). Document filed by Principal Funds Inc. (Global Multi-Strategy Fund), Principal Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Fund II), Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Account I), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Extended Market Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Index Funds (Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds (Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund), Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Index Fund), Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Fund), Vanguard Valley Forge Funds (Vanguard Balanced Index Fund), Vanguard World Fund (Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Weiner, Gregg)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: As per Paragraph 5 of the Order dated June 12, 2020, see ECF No. 20, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the complaints, to the extent they are still sealed, in the actions 20-cv-4262, 20-cv-4265, 20-cv-4267, 20-cv-4286, 20-cv-4287, 20-cv-4289, 20-cv-4292, 20-cv-4299, 20-cv-4335, 20- cv-4346, 20-cv-4360, 20-cv-4404, 20-cv-4434, 20-cv-4436, 20-cv-4440, 20-cv-4479, 20-cv-4480, and 20-cv-4569 (but not the complaint in the 20-cv-4433 action) and replace any remaining pseudonyms with the corresponding names of the defendants contained in the captions of the complaints. Plaintiffs' counsel shall cooperate with the Clerk's Office in carrying out this process as promptly as possible. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/2/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (mml)
July 2, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law. Document filed by Heather Harlan, George Sharp..(O'Connor, Kevin)
July 2, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Joinder to Join the Public Shareholder Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Heather Harlan, George Sharp..(O'Connor, Kevin)
July 2, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Joseph O'Connor, Sr on behalf of George Sharp..(O'Connor, Kevin)
July 2, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Joseph O'Connor, Sr on behalf of Heather Harlan..(O'Connor, Kevin)
July 2, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #74 MOTION for Craig C. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20526761. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
July 2, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION for Craig C. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20526761. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cref Equity Index Account, TIAA-CREF Funds, TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund), TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Craig C. Martin, #2 Exhibit B - Illinois Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C- Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Martin, Craig)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting (122) Motion for Craig A. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/2/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (jwh)
July 1, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Craig A. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20512937. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Christopher R. Cade, Dianne Card, Wesley R Card, Ira M. Dansky, Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Richard L. Dickson, Joseph T. Donnalley, Tami Fersko, Ira Martin Dansky Revocable Trust, John T McClain, Aida Tejero-Decolli, John T. McClain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig A. Benson, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from the District of Columbia, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing from the State of Maryland, #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing from the State of New York, #5 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Benson, Craig)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: This Order addresses an additional housekeeping matter that has not been raised before. In the Order dated June 12, 2020, the Court, among other things, stated: "All counsel who had not appeared in an action prior to its transfer, and all counsel in actions filed originally in this district, must enter a notice of appearance in that action and in 20-MD-2941 and, if necessary, apply for admission pro hac vice." ECF No. 20, at 5. To further clarify, an attorney applying for admission pro hac vice should file such a motion in the 20-MD-2941 docket and "spread" the submission to all cases in which the attorney represents a party. The attorney shall be required to pay the pro hac vice fee for the equivalent of only one case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/1/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (jwh)
June 30, 2020 Filing 70 JOINDER to join re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants., (93 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor on Behalf of Former Director and Officer Defendants. . Document filed by Lynne Bernstock, Jeff Brisman, Janice Brown, Katherine Butler, James Capiola, Gregory Clark, Eric Dauwalter, Mark DeZao, Beth B. Dorfsman, Eileen Dunn, Rosa Genovesi, Laurie J. Gentile, Bryan R. Gilligan, Ninive Giordano, Stacey A. Harmon, Mahmood Hassani-Sadi, Richard H. Hein, Gerald Hood, Linda V. Kothe, Arundhati Kulkarni, Suzanne Maloney, Zine Mazouzi, Susan M. McCoy, Thomas Nolan, Pamela M. Paul, Charles Joseph Pickett, Joseph A. Rosato, Arlene Starr, Larissa Sygida, Kimberly Thomas, Norman R Veit, Jr., Gregory Clark, Amy Rapawy, Norman R. Veit, Jr..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Kagen, Stuart)
June 30, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Joinder to Join the Former Director and Officer Defendants Motion to Dismiss and the Public Shareholder Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Nicola Guarna, Robert Rodriguez, Robert Rodriguez.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Brennan, Travis)
June 30, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Malen Taylor on behalf of Lynne Bernstock, Jeff Brisman, Janice Brown, Katherine Butler, James Capiola, Gregory Clark, Eric Dauwalter, Mark DeZao, Beth B. Dorfsman, Eileen Dunn, Rosa Genovesi, Laurie J. Gentile, Bryan R. Gilligan, Ninive Giordano, Stacey A. Harmon, Mahmood Hassani-Sadi, Richard H. Hein, Gerald Hood, Linda V. Kothe, Arundhati Kulkarni, Suzanne Maloney, Zine Mazouzi, Susan M. McCoy, Thomas Nolan, Pamela M. Paul, Charles Joseph Pickett, Joseph A. Rosato, Arlene Starr, Larissa Sygida, Kimberly Thomas, Norman R Veit, Jr., Amy Rapawy, Norman R. Veit, Jr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Taylor, Joel)
June 30, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (142 in 1:20-cv-04346-JSR, 116 in 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 76 in 1:20-cv-04286-JSR, 48 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 68 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 79 in 1:20-cv-04292-JSR, 151 in 1:20-cv-04335-JSR, 96 in 1:20-cv-04262-JSR, 97 in 1:20-cv-04569-JSR) MOTION for Cliff C. Gardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20465400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al.(wb)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (68) Motion for Cliff C. Gardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/29/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (jwh)
June 29, 2020 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants., (93 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor on Behalf of Former Director and Officer Defendants. . Document filed by Mary E. Belle, Kathleen Nedorostek Kaswell, Joseph Stafiniak. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Wilson, Ryan)
June 29, 2020 Filing 65 JOINDER to join re: (90 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants., (94 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,, (93 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor on Behalf of Former Director and Officer Defendants. . Document filed by Mary E. Belle, Kathleen Nedorostek Kaswell, Joseph Stafiniak.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Wilson, Ryan)
June 29, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Michael Wilson on behalf of Mary E. Belle, Kathleen Nedorostek Kaswell, Joseph Stafiniak. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Wilson, Ryan)
June 29, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yehuda David Scharf on behalf of Mary E. Belle, Kathleen Nedorostek Kaswell, Joseph Stafiniak. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Scharf, Yehuda)
June 29, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Joinder NOTICE OF JOINDER AND STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT JANET CARR IN SUPPORT OF FORMER DIRECTOR AND OFFICER DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER SECTION 546(e) SECURITIES SAFE HARBOR. Document filed by Janet Carr.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Chou, James)
June 29, 2020 Filing 61 JOINDER to join re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants., (93 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor on Behalf of Former Director and Officer Defendants. . Document filed by Lynne Bernstock, Jeff Brisman, Janice Brown, Katherine Butler, James Capiola, Gregory Clark, Eric Dauwalter, Mark DeZao, Beth B. Dorfsman, Eileen Dunn, Rosa Genovesi, Laurie J. Gentile, Bryan R. Gilligan, Ninive Giordano, Stacey A. Harmon, Mahmood Hassani-Sadi, Richard H. Hein, Gerald Hood, Linda V. Kothe, Arundhati Kulkarni, Suzanne Maloney, Zine Mazouzi, Susan M. McCoy, Thomas Nolan, Charles Joseph Pickett, Joseph A. Rosato, Arlene Starr, Larissa Sygida, Kimberly Thomas, Gregory Clark, Amy Rapawy, Norman R. Veit, Jr..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Kagen, Stuart)
June 29, 2020 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Brienne M. Letourneau in Support re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants.. Document filed by Cref Equity Index Account, TIAA-CREF Funds, TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund), TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CREF Equity Index Form N-CSR, #2 Exhibit 2- TIAA Equity Index Form N-CSR)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Letourneau, Brienne)
June 29, 2020 Filing 59 JOINDER to join re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants. . Document filed by Cref Equity Index Account, TIAA-CREF Funds, TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund), TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Letourneau, Brienne)
June 29, 2020 Filing 58 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cref Equity Index Account, TIAA-CREF Funds, TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund), TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Letourneau, Brienne)
June 29, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Kagen on behalf of Lynne Bernstock, Jeff Brisman, Janice Brown, Katherine Butler, James Capiola, Gregory Clark, Eric Dauwalter, Mark DeZao, Beth B. Dorfsman, Eileen Dunn, Rosa Genovesi, Laurie J. Gentile, Bryan R. Gilligan, Ninive Giordano, Stacey A. Harmon, Mahmood Hassani-Sadi, Richard H. Hein, Gerald Hood, Linda V. Kothe, Arundhati Kulkarni, Suzanne Maloney, Zine Mazouzi, Susan M. McCoy, Thomas Nolan, Pamela M. Paul, Charles Joseph Pickett, Joseph A. Rosato, Arlene Starr, Larissa Sygida, Kimberly Thomas, Norman R Veit, Jr., Gregory Clark, Amy Rapawy, Norman R. Veit, Jr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04433-JSR.(Kagen, Stuart)
June 29, 2020 Filing 56 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ATH Holding Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Community Insurance Company. Document filed by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Community Insurance Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Goodman, Brett)
June 29, 2020 Filing 55 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Anthem Southeast, Inc., Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. Document filed by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Community Insurance Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Goodman, Brett)
June 29, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex David Corey on behalf of Janet Carr..(Corey, Alex)
June 29, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Philip Chou on behalf of Janet Carr..(Chou, James)
June 29, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #52 MOTION for John J. Cruciani to Appear Pro Hac Vice John J. Cruciani's Motion for Admission for Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit, Exhibits and Proposed Order. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20469966. Motio.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Kansas and Missouri supreme;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (laq)
June 29, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for John J. Cruciani to Appear Pro Hac Vice John J. Cruciani's Motion for Admission for Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit, Exhibits and Proposed Order. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20469966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit to John J Cruciani Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Cruciani Kansas Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit Cruciani Missouri Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Turner, Marshall)
June 29, 2020 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Susquehanna International Group LLP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Anker, Philip)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (63) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR; granting (95) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04262-JSR; granting (43) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04287-JSR; granting (75) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04286-JSR; granting (78) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04292-JSR; granting (150) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04335-JSR; granting (141) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04346-JSR; granting (115) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04436-JSR; granting (96) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04569-JSR. The motion of Robert S. Saunders for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Robert S. Saunders is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/29/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (yv)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HA C VICE granting (57) Motion for Brienne M. Letourneau to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR; granting (40) Motion for Brienne M. Letourneau to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04287-JSR. The motion of Brienne M. Letourneau to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Brienne M. Letourneau is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/29/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR (yv)
June 29, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Cliff C. Gardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20465400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gerald C. Crotty, John D. Demsey, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades, Matthew H. Kamens, Sidney Kimmel, Robert L. Mettler, James A. Mitarotonda, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Lowell W. Robinson, TELENDOS, LLC, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Ann Marie C Wilkins, Susan T Mettler, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiadis, Telendos LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cliff C. Gardner, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Gardner, Cliff)
June 29, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Michael Harris on behalf of Allianz Global Investors of America L.P, Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, Principal Funds Inc. (Global Multi-Strategy Fund), Principal Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Fund II), Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Account I), Proshares Trust (Proshares Merger ETF), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Extended Market Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Index Funds (Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds (Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund), Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Index Fund), Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Fund), Vanguard Valley Forge Funds (Vanguard Balanced Index Fund), Vanguard World Fund (Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Harris, Adam)
June 29, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Glenn Devore on behalf of Allianz Global Investors of America L.P, Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, Principal Funds Inc. (Global Multi-Strategy Fund), Principal Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Fund II), Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Account I), Proshares Trust (Proshares Merger ETF), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Extended Market Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Index Funds (Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds (Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund), Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Index Fund), Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Fund), Vanguard Valley Forge Funds (Vanguard Balanced Index Fund), Vanguard World Fund (Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Devore, Andrew)
June 29, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregg L Weiner on behalf of Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, Principal Funds Inc. (Global Multi-Strategy Fund), Principal Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Fund II), Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Account I), Proshares Trust (Proshares Merger ETF), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Extended Market Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Index Funds (Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds (Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund), Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Index Fund), Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Fund), Vanguard Valley Forge Funds (Vanguard Balanced Index Fund), Vanguard World Fund (Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund), Allianz Global Investors of America L.P. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Weiner, Gregg)
June 29, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marshall Clinton Turner on behalf of Emerson Electric Co...(Turner, Marshall)
June 28, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (43 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 78 in 1:20-cv-04292-JSR, 150 in 1:20-cv-04335-JSR, 96 in 1:20-cv-04569-JSR, 75 in 1:20-cv-04286-JSR, 95 in 1:20-cv-04262-JSR, 63 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 115 in 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 141 in 1:20-cv-04346-JSR) MOTION for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20456704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al.(ad)
June 28, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20456704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gerald C. Crotty, John D. Demsey, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades, Matthew H. Kamens, Sidney Kimmel, Robert L. Mettler, James A. Mitarotonda, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Lowell W. Robinson, TELENDOS, LLC, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Ann Marie C Wilkins, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiadis, Telendos LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert S. Saunders, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Saunders, Robert)
June 27, 2020 Filing 42 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Musoff, Scott)
June 27, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Gerald C. Crotty, John D. Demsey, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades, Matthew H. Kamens, Sidney Kimmel, Robert L. Mettler, James A. Mitarotonda, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Lowell W. Robinson, TELENDOS, LLC, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Ann Marie C Wilkins, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiadis, Telendos LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Musoff, Scott)
June 26, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Brienne M. Letourneau to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20447947. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 26, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (43 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 78 in 1:20-cv-04292-JSR, 150 in 1:20-cv-04335-JSR, 96 in 1:20-cv-04569-JSR, 75 in 1:20-cv-04286-JSR, 95 in 1:20-cv-04262-JSR, 63 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 115 in 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 141 in 1:20-cv-04346-JSR) MOTION for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20456704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al.(ad)
June 26, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Brienne M. Letourneau to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20447947. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cref Equity Index Account, TIAA-CREF Funds, TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund), TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Brienne M. Letourneau, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order).(Letourneau, Brienne)
June 26, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Landon Raiford on behalf of Two Sigma Investments LP..(Raiford, Landon)
June 26, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Killion Porter on behalf of Barington Companies Equity Partners, L.P., Barington Companies Investors, LLC..(Porter, Joshua)
June 26, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew J Entwistle on behalf of Barington Companies Equity Partners, L.P., Barington Companies Investors, LLC..(Entwistle, Andrew)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR; granting (33) Motion for Landon S. Raiford to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04287-JSR. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/25/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR (jwh)
June 25, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. Service was accepted by Cliff C. Gardner. Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Mark S. Kirschner..(Lack, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marissa Rachel Parker on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Funds (Nationwide Small Cap Index Fund), Nationwide Mutual Funds (Nationwide U.S. Small Cap Value Fund), Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust (NVIT Multi-Manager Small Cap Value Fund), Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust (NVIT Small Cap Index Fund). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Parker, Marissa)
June 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Landon S. Raiford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
June 24, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Landon S. Raiford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Two Sigma Investments LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Landon S. Raiford, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Text of Proposed Order).(Raiford, Landon)
June 24, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #32 MOTION for Landon S. Raiford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20403666. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): affidavit is missing - page 6 is blank;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (laq)
June 24, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Landon S. Raiford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20403666. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Two Sigma Investments LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Landon S. Raiford, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Text of Proposed Order).(Raiford, Landon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Elizabeth Tepper on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Tepper, Danielle)
June 24, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Priyanka Kishore Wityk on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Wityk, Priyanka)
June 24, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shenghao Stan Chiueh on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Chiueh, Shenghao)
June 24, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew W. Goldwater on behalf of Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Goldwater, Andrew)
June 23, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Killion Porter on behalf of Gabelli 787 Fund, Inc. (Enterprise Mergers and Acquisitions Fund), Gabelli Investor Funds Inc. (The Gabelli ABC Fund), The GDL Fund..(Porter, Joshua)
June 23, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew J Entwistle on behalf of Gabelli 787 Fund, Inc. (Enterprise Mergers and Acquisitions Fund), Gabelli Investor Funds Inc. (The Gabelli ABC Fund), The GDL Fund..(Entwistle, Andrew)
June 23, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Extended Market Index Fund) served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund) served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund) served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund) served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Vanguard Institutional Index Funds (Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund) served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Vanguard International Equity Index Funds (Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund) served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Index Fund) served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Fund) served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Vanguard Valley Forge Funds (Vanguard Balanced Index Fund) served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; Vanguard World Fund (Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund) served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. Service was accepted by Adam M. Harris. Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Mark S. Kirschner..(Lack, Robert)
June 23, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. John D. Demsey served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020; Matthew H. Kamens served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020; Sidney Kimmel served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020; James A. Mitarotonda served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020; Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020; Lowell W. Robinson served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. Service was accepted by Scott D. Musoff. Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Mark S. Kirschner..(Lack, Robert)
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Killion Porter on behalf of The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund..(Porter, Joshua)
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew J Entwistle on behalf of The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund..(Entwistle, Andrew)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/22/2020) (va)
June 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/12/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 6/12/2020 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2020.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Lack, Robert)
June 17, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. Susquehanna International Group LLP served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. Service was accepted by Ross Firsenbaum, Esq.. Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Mark S. Kirschner..(Lack, Robert)
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, served. Joseph T. Donnalley served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service was accepted by Andrew Gordon. Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Mark S. Kirschner..(Lack, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Upon further consideration of the issues discussed during the telephonic conference held earlier today at 2:00 p.m., see Transcript dated June 12, 2020, the Court sets the following schedule for certain pretrial proceedings in these consolidated actions, and resolves various housekeeping matters in the following manner. 1. By Orders dated June 4, 2020 and June 9, 2020, the Court consolidated 15 cases under the MDL docket 20-MD-2941 for all pre-trial purposes. See 20-MD-2941, ECF Nos. 2, 3. The following four additional related actions are hereby consolidated with all 15 other actions under the MDL docket 20-MD-2941 for all pretrial purposes: Kirschner, et al. v. Robeco Capital Growth Funds - Robeco BP US Premium Equities, No. 20-cv-4479, Kirschner, et al. v. Schwab Capital Trust, No. 20-cv-4480, Kirschner v. Advisors Series Trust (Kellner Merger Fund), et al., No. 20-cv-4433, and Kirschner v. Voya Russell Small Cap Index Portfolio, et al., No. 20-cv-4434. 2. The Court hereby adopts the following (partial) Case Management Plan. (a) Briefs on any anticipated motions to dismiss must be filed on the following bifurcated schedule: (First Round) For any motion to dismiss relating to 546(e) of the Bankruptcy Code, briefs must be filed on the following schedule: (a) moving papers due June 29, 2020; (b) answering papers due July 27, 2020; and (c) reply papers due August 3, 2020. Oral argument on these motions shall be held on August 13, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The Court will issue its decision on these motions in writing by no later than August 27, 2020. (Second Round) As to any action not dismissed after the First Round, any motion to dismiss on any other ground must be briefed on the following schedule: (a) moving papers due September 7, 2020; (b) answering papers due October 5, 2020; and (c) reply papers due October 12, 2020. Oral argument on the Second Round of motions will be held on October 21, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. The Court will issue its decision on these motions in writing by no later than November 4, 2020. (b) After plaintiffs' counsel serves those defendants who have not yet been served (which, based on plaintiffs' counsel's representation, the Court expects to be completed by no later than June 19, 2020), plaintiffs' counsel should promptly advise counsel for those defendants that the instant Order and schedule will apply to those defendants as well. If any of these defendants has any objection to that determination, their counsel, along with plaintiffs' counsel, must convene a joint telephonic conference with Chambers pursuant to Rules 1 and 2 of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice by no later than June 26, 2020. (c) These consolidated actions are not stayed after today, and any and all stays entered by district judges in the actions transferred from other districts are hereby lifted. Document discovery and interrogatories pursuant to Rule 33.3(a) of the Local Civil Rules of the Southern District of New York may commence whenever the parties wish, provided that all such document and interrogatory discovery must be completed by November 4, 2020. In its order of November 4 (see above), the Court will set a schedule for deposition discovery and any summary judgment motion practice. 3. To the extent that the parties anticipate seeking confidential treatment for any discovery in this case, they must jointly submit a proposed protective order, substantially in compliance with Judge Rakoff's model protective order, by no later than June 22, 2020. To the extent that there are any conflicts between the confidentiality order to be entered into by the Court on or about June 22, 2020 and the confidentiality order, as amended, entered into by the Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York in In re: Nine West Holdings, Inc., No. 18-10947 (SCC), ECF Nos. 972, 1471, and 1544 (Bankr. S.D.N.Y.), this Courts order will supersede the Bankruptcy Court's order. (If any party deems it necessary and so advises the Court, the Court will withdraw the reference in the aforesaid bankruptcy for the limited purpose of modifying that court's protective order.) 4. Two recently filed actions -- Kirschner v. Advisors Series Trust (Kellner Merger Fund), et al., No. 20-cv-4433, and Kirschner v. Voya Russell Small Cap Index Portfolio, et al., No. 20-cv-4434 -- were filed under seal at the request of plaintiffs' counsel. Plaintiffs' counsel has now advised the Court that 20-cv-4434 no longer needs to be kept under seal. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to unseal that action forthwith. As to the other action, the relevant parties are hereby directed to promptly consult with one another to see if this sealing should be lifted. In any event, the Court's present intention, unless convinced otherwise, is to unseal this remaining action on or shortly after June 22, 2020. 5. Inasmuch as it has been represented to the Court that the parties have now resolved the issues that had previously existed concerning the confidentiality of some documents (other than the 20-cv-4433 action referred to in #4) previously filed with the Court under seal, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal all such documents and to replace any remaining pseudonyms with the corresponding names of the defendants contained in the captions of the complaints. Plaintiffs' counsel shall cooperate with the Clerk's Office in carrying out this process as promptly as possible. 6. In accord with Rule 2.1(c) of the Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, all counsel who appeared in any of the actions prior to their transfer to this district may continue to represent his or her client and such client need not obtain local counsel. In addition, such counsel need not enter a notice of appearance, provided that they have entered one prior to the transfer, and need not apply for admission pro hac vice. 7. All counsel who had not appeared in an action prior to its transfer, and all counsel in actions filed originally in this district, must enter a notice of appearance in that action and in 20-MD-2941 and, if necessary, apply for admission pro hac vice, as further set forth in this Order. 10. Plaintiffs' unopposed pending motions to dismiss without prejudice Kirschner v. Card, et al., No. 20-cv-4360, and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Card, et al., No. 20-cv-4404, as duplicative of actions earlier commenced by the same plaintiff's against the same defendants and others, are hereby granted. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/7/2020, Responses due by 10/5/2020, Replies due by 10/12/2020. Service due by 6/19/2020. Oral Argument set for 8/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Oral Argument set for 10/21/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (mml)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allianz Global Investors of America LP, American Family Mutual Insurance Co., American International Group Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Barington Companies Equity Partners, L.P., Barington Companies Investors, LLC, Mary E. Belle, Lynne Bernstock, Bluecrest Capital Management Ltd., Scott Bowman, Janice Brown, Katherine Butler, Calvert Variable Products, Inc. (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio), James Capiola, Janet Carr, James Chan, Roy Chan, Chi Operating Investment Program, LP, Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND, Francis X. Claps, Gregory Clark, Community Insurance Company, Cref Equity Index Account, Jamie Cygielman, Eric Dauwalter, John D. Demsey, Joseph T. Donnalley, Dreman Contrarian Funds (Dreman Contrarian Small Cap Value Fund), Susan Duffy, Eileen Dunn, EQ Advisors Trust (ATM Small Cap Managed Volatility Portfolio), EQ Advisors Trust (EQ/2000 Managed Volatility Portfolio), Emerson Electric Co., Federated Equity Funds (Federated Clover Small Value Fund), Daniel Fishman, Gabelli 787 Fund, Inc. (Enterprise Mergers and Acquisitions Fund), Gabelli Investor Funds Inc. (The Gabelli ABC Fund), Rosa Genovesi, Stefani Greenfield, Sharon Harger, Heather Harlan, Gerald Hood, JPMorgan Systematic Alpha Fund, KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels, KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism, KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites, Matthew H. Kamens, Suzanne Karkus, Kathleen Nedorostek Kaswell, Sidney Kimmel, Barbara Kreger, Wayne Kulkin, Mitchel Levine, Lincoln Variable Insurance Products Trust (LVIP SSGA Small-Cap Index Fund), Frances Lukas, Gregg Marks, Zine Mazouzi, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co, Robyn Whitney Mills, James A. Mitarotonda, Multimanager Small Cap Value Portfolio, Nationwide Mutual Funds (Nationwide Small Cap Index Fund), Nationwide Mutual Funds (Nationwide U.S. Small Cap Value Fund), Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust (NVIT Multi-Manager Small Cap Value Fund), Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust (NVIT Small Cap Index Fund), Natixis SA, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Odin Holdings LP, Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, James T. Ostrowski, Nicoletta Palma, Pinebridge Investments LP, Principal Funds Inc. (Global Multi-Strategy Fund), Principal Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Fund II), Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. (Smallcap Value Account I), Proshares Trust (Proshares Merger ETF), Quantitative Master Series LLC (Master Extended Market Index Series), RBB Fund, Inc. (WPG Partners Small/Micro Cap Value Fund), Amy Rapawy, Lowell W. Robinson, Joseph A. Rosato, Heather Roussel, Royce Institutional, LLC (Opportunity Portfolio), Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, SEI Institutional Investments Trust (SIIT Small Cap Fund), SEI Institutional Managed Trust (SIMT Small Cap Value Fund), Securian Life Insurance Co., George Sharp, Joseph Stafiniak, Susquehanna International Group LLP, Larissa Sygida, TFS Capital LLC, TIAA-CREF Funds, TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund), TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund), Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co., Aida Tejero-Decolli, The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, The GDL Fund, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Kimberly Thomas, Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund), Stephen C. Troy, Two Sigma Investments LP, Unified Series Trust (Symons Small Cap Institutional Fund), Valued Advisers Trust (Foundry Partners Fundamental Small Cap Value Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Extended Market Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Index Funds (Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust, Vanguard International Equity Index Funds (Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund), Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Index Fund), Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Fund), Vanguard Valley Forge Funds (Vanguard Balanced Index Fund), Vanguard World Fund (Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund), Norman R. Veit, Jr., Stuart Weitzman, Jodi G. Wright, Donna F. Zarcone..(pne)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett David Goodman on behalf of Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Community Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Goodman, Brett)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joel Aaronson on behalf of Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Community Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR.(Aaronson, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sidney Kimmel, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust John D. Demsey, Matthew H. Kamens, James A. Mitarotonda, Barington Companies Equity Partners, L.P., Barington Companies Investors, LLC, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Lowell W. Robinson, Joseph T. Donnalley, Aida Tejero-DeColli, Allianz Global Investors of America LP, American Family Mutual Insurance Co., American International Group Inc., Amy Rapawy, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Barbara Kreger, BlueCrest Capital Management Ltd., Calvert Variable Products, Inc. (Calvert VP Russell 2000 Small Cap Index Portfolio), CHI Operating Investment Program, LP, Chrysler World IMI Equity Index ND, Community Insurance Company, CREF Equity Index Account, Daniel Fishman, Donna F. Zarcone, Dreman Contrarian Funds (Dreman Contrarian Small Cap Value Fund), Eileen Dunn, Emerson Electric Co, EQ Advisors Trust (ATM Small Cap Managed Volatility Portfolio), EQ Advisors Trust (EQ/2000 Managed Volatility Portfolio), Eric Dauwalter, Federated Equity Funds (Federated Clover Small Value Fund), Frances Lukas, Francis X. Claps, Gabelli Investor Funds Inc. (The Gabelli ABC Fund), Gabelli 787 Fund, Inc. (Enterprise Mergers and Acquisitions Fund), George Sharp, Gerald Hood, Gregg Marks, Gregory Clark, Heather Harlan, Heather Roussel, James Capiola, James Chan, James T. Ostrowski, Jamie Cygielman, Janet Carr, Janice Brown, Jodi G. Wright, Joseph A. Rosato, Joseph Stafiniak, JPMorgan Systematic Alpha Fund, Katherine Butler, Kathleen Nedorostek Kaswell, KBC Equity Fund Fallen Angels, KBC Equity Fund Leisure and Tourism, KBC Equity Fund Strategic Satellites, Kimberly Thomas, Larissa Sygida, Lincoln Variable Insurance Products Trust (LVIP SSgA Small-Cap Index Fund), Lynne Bernstock, Mary E. Belle, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co, Mitchel Levine, Multimanager Small Cap Value Portfolio, Nationwide Mutual Funds (Nationwide Small Cap Index Fund), Nationwide Mutual Funds (Nationwide U.S. Small Cap Value Fund), Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust (NVIT Multi-Manager Small Cap Value Fund), Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust (NVIT Small Cap Index Fund), Natixis SA, Nicoletta Palma, Norman R. Veit, Jr., Odin Holdings LP, Oppenheimer Global Multi Strategies Fund, PineBridge Investments LP, Principal Funds Inc. (Global Multi-Strategy Fund), Principal Funds Inc. (SmallCap Value Fund II), Principal Variable Contracts Funds Inc. (SmallCap Value Account I), ProShares Trust (ProShares Merger ETF), Quantitative Master Series LLC (Master Extended Market Index Series), RBB Fund, Inc. (WPG Partners Small/Micro Cap Value Fund), Robyn Whitney Mills, Rosa Genovesi, Roy Chan, Royce Institutional, LLC (Opportunity Portfolio), Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, Scott Bowman, Securian Life Insurance Co. f/k/a Minnesota Life Insurance Co., SEI Institutional Investments Trust (SIIT Small Cap Fund), SEI Institutional Managed Trust (SIMT Small Cap Value Fund), Sharon Harger, Stefani Greenfield, Stephen C. Troy, Stuart Weitzman, Susan Duffy, Susquehanna International Group LLP, Suzanne Karkus, Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co., TFS Capital LLC, The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, The GDL Fund, TIAA-CREF Funds, TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Equity Index Fund), TIAA-CREF Funds (TIAA-CREF Small-Cap Blend Index Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Arbitrage Fund), Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund), Two Sigma Investments LP, Unified Series Trust (Symons Small Cap Institutional Fund), Valued Advisers Trust (Foundry Partners Fundamental Small Cap Value Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Extended Market Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Small-Cap Value Index Fund), Vanguard Index Funds (Vanguard Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Index Funds (Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Fund), Vanguard Institutional Total, Stock Market Index Trust, Vanguard International Equity, Index Funds (Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund), Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Trust, Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Index Fund), Vanguard Scottsdale Funds (Vanguard Russell 2000 Value Index Fund), Vanguard Valley Forge Funds (Vanguard Balanced Index Fund), Vanguard World Fund (Vanguard Consumer Discretionary Index Fund), Wayne Kulkin, Zine Mazouzi, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Address rider).(Friedman, Edward)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Kimmel and AQR actions are hereby consolidated with other actions under the MDL docket 20-MD-2941 for all pre-trial purposes and are subject to the June 4 Order. Accordingly, among others, counsel for the Kimmel and AQR actions must join the June 12 telephonic conference and may, if they wish, file electronically with the Court such Status Reports as they deem relevant, apprising the Court of where each case stands and what counsel would like to have considered at the June 12 conference, provided such Status Reports are filed no later than June 10, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. (EDT). SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff). (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/9/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 1:20-cv-04289-JSR (rjm)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joel Lack on behalf of Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB..(Lack, Robert)
June 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Edward A. Friedman to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): List each defendant listed on the rider for the docket entry on CM ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
June 9, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:20-md-02941-JSR. (sjo)
June 9, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
June 9, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
June 9, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-md-02941-JSR. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
June 8, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Community Insurance Company, Principal Funds Inc. (Global Multi-Strategy Fund) added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.Document filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Mark S. Kirschner. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,..(Friedman, Edward)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendants (see attached rider), re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Address rider).(Friedman, Edward) Modified on 6/9/2020 (pc).
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-md-2941 (JSR). Document filed by Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB..(Friedman, Edward)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Edward A. Friedman to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney; all of the party names whom summons is for must be listed on the 'as to' docket entry text; missing parties must be added to the case if listing them on the attached rider. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jed S. Rakoff as possibly related to 20-md-2941. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Edward A. Friedman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the entire related case number must be listed on the docket entry text;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edward A. Friedman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: all of the parties. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward A. Friedman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Nassau;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Edward A. Friedman re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties Community Insurance Company, and, Principal Funds Inc. (Global Multi-Strategy Fund). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST 'As To' AND PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendants (see attached rider), re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by MARC S. KIRCHNER, WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Address Rider).(Friedman, Edward) Modified on 6/8/2020 (jgo).
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - FILING ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to MDL 2941. Document filed by MARC S. KIRCHNER, WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB..(Friedman, Edward) Modified on 6/8/2020 (jgo).
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB. Document filed by MARC S. KIRCHNER, WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB..(Friedman, Edward)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Friedman, Edward)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, MARC S. KIRCHNER, ALLIANZ GLOBAL INVESTORS OF AMERICA LP, AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., Joseph AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC., ANTHEM HEALTH PLANS OF VIRGINIA, INC., BARINGTON COMPANIES EQUITY PARTNERS, L.P., BARINGTON COMPANIES INVESTORS, LLC, MARY E. BELLE, LYNNE BERNSTOCK, BLUECREST CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LTD., SCOTT BOWMAN, JANICE BROWN, KATHERINE BUTLER, CALVERT VARIABLE PRODUCTS, INC. (CALVERT VP RUSSELL 2000 SMALL CAP INDEX PORTFOLIO), JAMES CAPIOLA, JANET CARR, JAMES CHAN, ROY CHAN, CHI OPERATING INVESTMENT PROGRAM, LP, CHRYSLER WORLD IMI EQUITY INDEX ND, COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, FRANCIS X. CLAPS, GREGORY CLARK, CREF EQUITY INDEX ACCOUNT, JAMIE CYGIELMAN, ERIC DAUWALTER, JOHN D. DEMSEY, JOSEPH T DONNALLEY, DREMAN CONTRARIAN FUNDS (DREMAN CONTRARIAN SMALL CAP VALUE FUND), SUSAN DUFFY, EILEEN DUNN, EMERSON ELECTRIC CO., EQ ADVISORS TRUST (ATM SMALL CAP MANAGED VOLATILITY PORTFOLIO), EQ ADVISORS TRUST (EQ/2000 MANAGED VOLATILITY PORTFOLIO), FEDERATED EQUITY FUNDS (FEDERATED CLOVER SMALL VALUE FUND), DANIEL FISHMAN, GABELLI 787 FUND, INC. (ENTERPRISE MERGERS AND ACQUISITIONS FUND), GABELLI INVESTOR FUNDS INC. (THE GABELLI ABC FUND), ROSA GENOVESI, STEFANI GREENFIELD, SHARON HARGER, HEATHER HARLAN, GERALD HOOD, JPMORGAN SYSTEMATIC ALPHA FUND, MATTHEW H. KAMENS, SUZANNE KARKUS, KATHLEEN NEDOROSTEK KASWELL, KBC EQUITY FUND FALLEN ANGELS, KBC EQUITY FUND LEISURE AND TOURISM, KBC EQUITY FUND STRATEGIC SATELLITES, SIDNEY KIMMEL, BARBARA KREGER, WAYNE KULKIN, MITCHEL LEVINE, LINCOLN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST (LVIP SSGA SMALL-CAP INDEX FUND), FRANCES LUKAS, GREGG MARKS, ZINE MAZOUZI, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO, JAMES A. MITAROTONDA, MULTIMANAGER SMALL CAP VALUE PORTFOLIO, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS (NATIONWIDE SMALL CAP INDEX FUND), NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS (NATIONWIDE U.S. SMALL CAP VALUE FUND), NATIONWIDE VARIABLE INSURANCE TRUST (NVIT MULTI-MANAGER SMALL CAP VALUE FUND), NATIONWIDE VARIABLE INSURANCE TRUST (NVIT SMALL CAP INDEX FUND), NATIXIS SA, JEFFREY D. NUECHTERLEIN, ODIN HOLDINGS LP, OPPENHEIMER GLOBAL MULTI STRATEGIES FUND, JAMES T. OSTROWSKI, NICOLETTA PALMA, PINEBRIDGE INVESTMENTS LP, PRINCIPAL FUNDS INC. (GLOBAL MULTI-STRATEGY FUND), PRINCIPAL FUNDS INC. (SMALLCAP VALUE FUND II), PRINCIPAL VARIABLE CONTRACTS FUNDS INC. (SMALLCAP VALUE ACCOUNT I), PROSHARES TRUST (PROSHARES MERGER ETF), QUANTITATIVE MASTER SERIES LLC (MASTER EXTENDED MARKET INDEX SERIES), AMY RAPAWY, RBB FUND, INC. (WPG PARTNERS SMALL/MICRO CAP VALUE FUND), LOWELL W. ROBINSON, JOSEPH A. ROSATO, HEATHER ROUSSEL, ROYCE INSTITUTIONAL, LLC (OPPORTUNITY PORTFOLIO), RUSSELL US SMALL CAP EQUITY FUND, SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. f/k/a MINNESOTA LIFE INSURANCE CO., SEI INSTITUTIONAL INVESTMENTS TRUST (SIIT SMALL CAP FUND), SEI INSTITUTIONAL MANAGED TRUST (SIMT SMALL CAP VALUE FUND), GEORGE SHARP, JOSEPH STAFINIAK, SUSQUEHANNA INTERNATIONAL GROUP LLP, LARISSA SYGIDA, TALCOTT RESOLUTION LIFE INSURANCE CO., AIDA TEJERO-DECOLLI, TFS CAPITAL LLC, THE ARBITRAGE EVENT-DRIVEN FUND, THE GDL FUND, THE SIDNEY KIMMEL REVOCABLE INDENTURE OF TRUST, KIMBERLY THOMAS, TIAA-CREF FUNDS, TIAA-CREF FUNDS (TIAA-CREF EQUITY INDEX FUND), TIAA-CREF FUNDS (TIAA-CREF SMALL-CAP BLEND INDEX FUND), TOUCHSTONE FUNDS GROUP TRUST (TOUCHSTONE ARBITRAGE FUND), TOUCHSTONE FUNDS GROUP TRUST (TOUCHSTONE MERGER ARBITRAGE FUND), STEPHEN C. TROY, TWO SIGMA INVESTMENTS LP, UNIFIED SERIES TRUST (SYMONS SMALL CAP INSTITUTIONAL FUND), VALUED ADVISERS TRUST (FOUNDRY PARTNERS FUNDAMENTAL SMALL CAP VALUE FUND), VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD EXTENDED MARKET INDEX FUND), VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD SMALL-CAP INDEX FUND), VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD SMALL-CAP VALUE INDEX FUND), VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD TOTAL STOCK MARKET INDEX FUND), VANGUARD INSTITUTIONAL INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD INSTITUTIONAL TOTAL STOCK MARKET INDEX FUND), VANGUARD INSTITUTIONAL TOTAL STOCK MARKET INDEX TRUST, VANGUARD INTERNATIONAL EQUITY INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD TOTAL WORLD STOCK INDEX FUND), VANGUARD RUSSELL 2000 VALUE INDEX TRUST, VANGUARD SCOTTSDALE FUNDS (VANGUARD RUSSELL 2000 INDEX FUND), VANGUARD SCOTTSDALE FUNDS (VANGUARD RUSSELL 2000 VALUE INDEX FUND), VANGUARD VALLEY FORGE FUNDS (VANGUARD BALANCED INDEX FUND), VANGUARD WORLD FUND (VANGUARD CONSUMER DISCRETIONARY INDEX FUND), NORMAN R. VEIT, JR., STUART WEITZMAN, ROBIN WHITNEY MILLS, JODI G. WRIGHT, DONNA F. ZARCONE. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20124357)Document filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, MARC S. KIRCHNER..(Friedman, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirschner et al v. Kimmel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBC EQUITY FUND STRATEGIC SATELLITES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSQUEHANNA INTERNATIONAL GROUP LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY CLARK
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROY CHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREMAN CONTRARIAN FUNDS (DREMAN CONTRARIAN SMALL CAP VALUE FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC DAUWALTER
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQ ADVISORS TRUST (ATM SMALL CAP MANAGED VOLATILITY PORTFOLIO)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIXIS SA
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Adam Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE KULKIN
Represented By: Robert Matthew Kirby
Represented By: Howard Seife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI INSTITUTIONAL INVESTMENTS TRUST (SIIT SMALL CAP FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH STAFINIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNNE BERNSTOCK
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN C. TROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHEM HEALTH PLANS OF VIRGINIA, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson
Represented By: Brett David Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD INSTITUTIONAL TOTAL STOCK MARKET INDEX TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI INSTITUTIONAL MANAGED TRUST (SIMT SMALL CAP VALUE FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES A. MITAROTONDA
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRYSLER WORLD IMI EQUITY INDEX ND, COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOUCHSTONE FUNDS GROUP TRUST (TOUCHSTONE ARBITRAGE FUND)
Represented By: Ryan M. Tosi
Represented By: Brian David Koosed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBB FUND, INC. (WPG PARTNERS SMALL/MICRO CAP VALUE FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD EXTENDED MARKET INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARINGTON COMPANIES INVESTORS, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCOLN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST (LVIP SSGA SMALL-CAP INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS (NATIONWIDE SMALL CAP INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA F. ZARCONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIAA-CREF FUNDS
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Represented By: Brienne M. Letourneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEFANI GREENFIELD
Represented By: David Alan Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMAN R. VEIT, JR.
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JODI G. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIFIED SERIES TRUST (SYMONS SMALL CAP INSTITUTIONAL FUND)
Represented By: Riccardo Debari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIDNEY KIMMEL
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GDL FUND
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARISSA SYGIDA
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD INTERNATIONAL EQUITY INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD TOTAL WORLD STOCK INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABELLI INVESTOR FUNDS INC. (THE GABELLI ABC FUND)
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL FISHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSA GENOVESI
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN NEDOROSTEK KASWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.
Represented By: Marshall Clinton Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGG MARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY E. BELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD WORLD FUND (VANGUARD CONSUMER DISCRETIONARY INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY RAPAWY
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPPENHEIMER GLOBAL MULTI STRATEGIES FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIAA-CREF FUNDS (TIAA-CREF SMALL-CAP BLEND INDEX FUND)
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Represented By: Brienne M. Letourneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE CYGIELMAN
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET CARR
Represented By: Alex David Corey
Represented By: James Philip Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES CAPIOLA
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODIN HOLDINGS LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE BUTLER
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHI OPERATING INVESTMENT PROGRAM, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD SMALL-CAP VALUE INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANICE BROWN
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES T. OSTROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD TOTAL STOCK MARKET INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQ ADVISORS TRUST (EQ/2000 MANAGED VOLATILITY PORTFOLIO)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABELLI 787 FUND, INC. (ENTERPRISE MERGERS AND ACQUISITIONS FUND)
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBC EQUITY FUND LEISURE AND TOURISM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOUCHSTONE FUNDS GROUP TRUST (TOUCHSTONE MERGER ARBITRAGE FUND)
Represented By: Ryan M. Tosi
Represented By: Brian David Koosed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUANTITATIVE MASTER SERIES LLC (MASTER EXTENDED MARKET INDEX SERIES)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS X. CLAPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARINGTON COMPANIES EQUITY PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART WEITZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD VALLEY FORGE FUNDS (VANGUARD BALANCED INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE VARIABLE INSURANCE TRUST (NVIT SMALL CAP INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIDA TEJERO-DECOLLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON HARGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW H. KAMENS
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MULTIMANAGER SMALL CAP VALUE PORTFOLIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCIPAL VARIABLE CONTRACTS FUNDS INC. (SMALLCAP VALUE ACCOUNT I)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH A. ROSATO
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA KREGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWELL W. ROBINSON
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCES LUKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER ROUSSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY THOMAS
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER HARLAN
Represented By: Kevin Joseph O'Connor, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN D. DEMSEY
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYCE INSTITUTIONAL, LLC (OPPORTUNITY PORTFOLIO)
Represented By: Adam Michael Harris
Represented By: Gregg L Weiner
Represented By: Andrew Glenn Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TFS CAPITAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SIDNEY KIMMEL REVOCABLE INDENTURE OF TRUST
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALUED ADVISERS TRUST (FOUNDRY PARTNERS FUNDAMENTAL SMALL CAP VALUE FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE SHARP
Represented By: Kevin Joseph O'Connor, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN WHITNEY MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZANNE KARKUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE VARIABLE INSURANCE TRUST (NVIT MULTI-MANAGER SMALL CAP VALUE FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT BOWMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TALCOTT RESOLUTION LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN SYSTEMATIC ALPHA FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD HOOD
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANZ GLOBAL INVESTORS OF AMERICA LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWO SIGMA INVESTMENTS LP
Represented By: Landon Raiford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD SCOTTSDALE FUNDS (VANGUARD RUSSELL 2000 INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUECREST CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EILEEN DUNN
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ARBITRAGE EVENT-DRIVEN FUND
Represented By: Andrew J Entwistle
Represented By: Joshua Killion Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH T DONNALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CREF EQUITY INDEX ACCOUNT
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Represented By: Brienne M. Letourneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERATED EQUITY FUNDS (FEDERATED CLOVER SMALL VALUE FUND)
Represented By: Ryan M. Tosi
Represented By: Brian David Koosed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD SCOTTSDALE FUNDS (VANGUARD RUSSELL 2000 VALUE INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL US SMALL CAP EQUITY FUND
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Represented By: Brian Christopher Raphel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZINE MAZOUZI
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROSHARES TRUST (PROSHARES MERGER ETF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD RUSSELL 2000 VALUE INDEX TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES CHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCIPAL FUNDS INC. (SMALLCAP VALUE FUND II)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALVERT VARIABLE PRODUCTS, INC. (CALVERT VP RUSSELL 2000 SMALL CAP INDEX PORTFOLIO)
Represented By: Adam Michael Harris
Represented By: Gregg L Weiner
Represented By: Andrew Glenn Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLETTA PALMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBC EQUITY FUND FALLEN ANGELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD SMALL-CAP INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECURIAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. f/k/a MINNESOTA LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS (NATIONWIDE U.S. SMALL CAP VALUE FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIAA-CREF FUNDS (TIAA-CREF EQUITY INDEX FUND)
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Represented By: Brienne M. Letourneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCHEL LEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY D. NUECHTERLEIN
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PINEBRIDGE INVESTMENTS LP, PRINCIPAL FUNDS INC. (GLOBAL MULTI-STRATEGY FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD INSTITUTIONAL INDEX FUNDS (VANGUARD INSTITUTIONAL TOTAL STOCK MARKET INDEX FUND)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securian Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Asset Management of America L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Funds Inc. (Global Multi-Strategy Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Whitney Mills
Represented By: Joel Malen Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Kagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund f/k/a Touchstone Merger Arbitrage Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson
Represented By: Brett David Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touchstone Funds Group Trust (Touchstone Credit Opportunities II Fund f/k/a Touchstone Arbitrage Fund)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph T. Donnalley
Represented By: Craig Aaron Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Co.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Investors of America L.P
Represented By: Gregg L Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinebridge Investments LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College Retirement Equities Fund (CREF Equity Index Account)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC S. KIRCHNER
Represented By: Edward A. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB
Represented By: Edward A. Friedman
Represented By: Priyanka Kishore Wityk
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Tepper
Represented By: Shenghao Stan Chiueh
Represented By: Andrew W. Goldwater
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux
Represented By: Robert Joel Lack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S. Kirschner
Represented By: Edward A. Friedman
Represented By: Priyanka Kishore Wityk
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Tepper
Represented By: Shenghao Stan Chiueh
Represented By: Andrew W. Goldwater
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux
Represented By: Robert Joel Lack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?