Angie Knost, LLC v. Liberty Alliance Real Estate Group LLC.
Plaintiff: Angie Knost, LLC
Defendant: Liberty Alliance Real Estate Group LLC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04288
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/9/2020) (rro)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/9/2020) (rro)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 10:40 a.m., on August 12, 2020, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/9/2020) (jca)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liberty Alliance Real Estate Group LLC...(jgo)
June 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Angie Knost, LLC..(Parker, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Alliance Real Estate Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Angie Knost, LLC..(Parker, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Parker, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Parker, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Alliance Real Estate Group LLC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20125306)Document filed by Angie Knost, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Original Image, #2 Exhibit B- USCO Certificate, #3 Exhibit C- Screenshots).(Parker, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angie Knost, LLC v. Liberty Alliance Real Estate Group LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Alliance Real Estate Group LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Knost, LLC
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?