Goldzweig v. Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharon Goldzweig
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04297
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc. waiver sent on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. Document filed by Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc...(Pierre, Ephraim)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ephraim Jason Pierre on behalf of Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc...(Pierre, Ephraim)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lorie Elizabeth Almon on behalf of Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc...(Almon, Lorie)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/9/2020) (jwh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Iadevaia, Jeremiah)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc...(jgo)
June 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremiah Joseph Iadevaia. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeremiah Joseph Iadevaia. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings;. (jgo)
June 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jeremiah Joseph Iadevaia to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not dated or signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Miller on behalf of Sharon Goldzweig..(Miller, Emily)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sharon Goldzweig..(Iadevaia, Jeremiah)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Iadevaia, Jeremiah) Modified on 6/8/2020 (jgo).
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20128274)Document filed by Sharon Goldzweig..(Iadevaia, Jeremiah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldzweig v. Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.
Represented By: Ephraim Jason Pierre
Represented By: Lorie Elizabeth Almon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Goldzweig
Represented By: Emily Miller
Represented By: Jeremiah Joseph Iadevaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?