Marc S. Kirschner v. Richard L. Dickson et al
Plaintiff: Marc S Kirschner
Defendant: Russell 2500 Index Fund, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, RUSSELL 3000 INDEX FUND, Extended Equity Market Fund, Blackrock Russell, Richard L. Dickson, Blue Shield of California, iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, SA U.S. Small Company Fund, Ishares Russell Small, iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, DT DV MARKET COMPLETION FUND, State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Equities, George M Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Ishares 405, George M. Klabin, BlackRock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund B, MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 a/k/a BlackRock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, Bam Advisor Services, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, PG and E Co. Nuclear Facilities Qualified Cpuc Decommissioning Master Trust, iShares Russell 3000 ETF, iShares Russell 2000 Value ETF, Robert Rodriguez, iShares Europe, Research Affiliates Equity US Large, L.P., U.S. Equity Market Fund, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, State Street North America Confidential CLient 1 FOF, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, HAWAII DE LLC, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, Ishares Total U.S. Stock Market Index Fund, VERICIMETRY US SMALL CAP VALUE FUND, Nicola Guarna, Blue Cross of California, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, Robert L. Mettler, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, DAGT Small Cap Outliers, Ishares Russell, LITMAN GREGORY MASTERS ALTERNATIVE STRATEGIES FUND, Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, N.A., Bam Advisor Services doing business as Loring Ward, Enhanced Rafi US Large LP, California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California and California Physicians' Service d/b/a Blue Shield of California
Not Classified By Court: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Interested Party: State Street Bank and Trust Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04436
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (93 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Section 546(e) Securities Safe Harbor on Behalf of Former Director and Officer Defendants. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Former Director and Officer Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under 11 U.S.C. 546(e). Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Friedman, Edward)
July 27, 2020 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (88 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Under the Safe Harbor of 11 U.S.C. 546(e) of Public Shareholder Defendants. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Public Shareholder Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under 11 U.S.C. 546(e). Document filed by Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Friedman, Edward)
July 24, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of Bam Advisor Services, JHF II Strategic Equity Allocation Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Fund, John Hancock U.S. Targeted Value Trust, Manulife Financial, Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD, Russell US Small Cap Equity Fund, Schwab Capital Trust, Schwab Fundamental US Small Company Index Fund, Schwab Small-Cap Index Fund, Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund, Transamerica Asset Management, Inc., US Small Company Fund, USAA Extended Market Index Fund, Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company I- Small Cap Index Fund, Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company I- Small Cap Special Values Fund, JHVIT Small Cap Index Trust, JHVIT Small Cap Opportunities Trust, JHVIT Strategic Equity Allocation Trust, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund, Manulife Investment Management (North America) LTD, Bam Advisor Services, SA U.S. Small Company Fund, SA U.S.Small Company Fund, John Hancock II Strategic Equity Allocation Small Cap Fund a/k/a John Hancock II SEA Small Cap. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Doluisio, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Filing 136 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Christopher Raphel on behalf of Bam Advisor Services, SA U.S. Small Company Fund..(Raphel, Brian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joel Lack on behalf of Marc S Kirschner. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR.(Lack, Robert)
July 20, 2020 Filing 134 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bam Advisor Services, BlackRock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Blue Cross of California, DT DV MARKET COMPLETION FUND, Richard L. Dickson, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, Nicola Guarna, HAWAII DE LLC, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, George M. Klabin, LITMAN GREGORY MASTERS ALTERNATIVE STRATEGIES FUND, MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 a/k/a BlackRock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, Robert L. Mettler, PG and E Co. Nuclear Facilities Qualified Cpuc Decommissioning Master Trust, George M Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, RUSSELL 3000 INDEX FUND, Research Affiliates Equity US Large, L.P., Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Robert Rodriguez, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, SA U.S. Small Company Fund, State Street Bank and Trust Co., State Street North America Confidential CLient 1 FOF, State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Equities, State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Ishares 405, U.S. Equity Market Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund B, iShares Europe, iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, iShares Russell 2000 Value ETF, iShares Russell 3000 ETF, California Physicians' Service d/b/a Blue Shield of California with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Marc S Kirschner..(Friedman, Edward)
July 17, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Matthew Joel Aaronson on behalf of Blue Cross of California. New Address: Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP, 875 Third Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10022, (212) 704-6000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR.(Aaronson, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Filing 132 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by HAWAII DE LLC..(Seligmann, Reade)
July 15, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Reade William Seligmann on behalf of HAWAII DE LLC..(Seligmann, Reade)
July 10, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brett David Goodman on behalf of Blue Cross of California. New Address: Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP, 875 Third Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10022, 212-704-6000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR.(Goodman, Brett)
July 9, 2020 Filing 129 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 1:20-cv-04569-JSR.(Reynolds, Michael)
July 9, 2020 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael B Reynolds on behalf of California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 1:20-cv-04569-JSR.(Reynolds, Michael)
July 9, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Reade William Seligmann on behalf of HAWAII DE LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 1:20-cv-04569-JSR.(Seligmann, Reade)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: As per Paragraph 5 of the Order dated June 12, 2020, see ECF No. 20, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the complaints, to the extent they are still sealed, in the actions 20-cv-4262, 20-cv-4265, 20-cv-4267, 20-cv-4286, 20-cv-4287, 20-cv-4289, 20-cv-4292, 20-cv-4299, 20-cv-4335, 20- cv-4346, 20-cv-4360, 20-cv-4404, 20-cv-4434, 20-cv-4436, 20-cv-4440, 20-cv-4479, 20-cv-4480, and 20-cv-4569 (but not the complaint in the 20-cv-4433 action) and replace any remaining pseudonyms with the corresponding names of the defendants contained in the captions of the complaints. Plaintiffs' counsel shall cooperate with the Clerk's Office in carrying out this process as promptly as possible. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/2/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (mml)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting (122) Motion for Craig A. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/2/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (jwh)
July 1, 2020 Filing 124 MOTION for Craig A. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20512937. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Christopher R. Cade, Dianne Card, Wesley R Card, Ira M. Dansky, Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Richard L. Dickson, Joseph T. Donnalley, Tami Fersko, Ira Martin Dansky Revocable Trust, John T McClain, Aida Tejero-Decolli, John T. McClain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig A. Benson, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from the District of Columbia, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing from the State of Maryland, #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing from the State of New York, #5 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Benson, Craig)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER: This Order addresses an additional housekeeping matter that has not been raised before. In the Order dated June 12, 2020, the Court, among other things, stated: "All counsel who had not appeared in an action prior to its transfer, and all counsel in actions filed originally in this district, must enter a notice of appearance in that action and in 20-MD-2941 and, if necessary, apply for admission pro hac vice." ECF No. 20, at 5. To further clarify, an attorney applying for admission pro hac vice should file such a motion in the 20-MD-2941 docket and "spread" the submission to all cases in which the attorney represents a party. The attorney shall be required to pay the pro hac vice fee for the equivalent of only one case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/1/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (jwh)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (113) Motion for Michael B. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR; granting (121) Motion for Michael B. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04436-JSR; granting (101) Motion for Michael B. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04569-JSR. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/1/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 1:20-cv-04569-JSR (jwh)
June 30, 2020 Filing 121 MOTION for Michael B. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20487156. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael B. Reynolds, #2 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 1:20-cv-04569-JSR.(Reynolds, Michael)
June 30, 2020 Filing 120 MOTION for Joinder to Join the Former Director and Officer Defendants Motion to Dismiss and the Public Shareholder Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Nicola Guarna, Robert Rodriguez, Robert Rodriguez.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Brennan, Travis)
June 30, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (142 in 1:20-cv-04346-JSR, 116 in 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 76 in 1:20-cv-04286-JSR, 48 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 68 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 79 in 1:20-cv-04292-JSR, 151 in 1:20-cv-04335-JSR, 96 in 1:20-cv-04262-JSR, 97 in 1:20-cv-04569-JSR) MOTION for Cliff C. Gardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20465400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al.(wb)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (68) Motion for Cliff C. Gardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/29/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (jwh)
June 29, 2020 Filing 118 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Anthem Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Wellpoint California Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Blue Cross of California. Document filed by Blue Cross of California.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR.(Goodman, Brett)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (63) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02941-JSR; granting (95) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04262-JSR; granting (43) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04287-JSR; granting (75) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04286-JSR; granting (78) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04292-JSR; granting (150) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04335-JSR; granting (141) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04346-JSR; granting (115) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04436-JSR; granting (96) Motion for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-cv-04569-JSR. The motion of Robert S. Saunders for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Robert S. Saunders is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/29/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (yv)
June 29, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION for Cliff C. Gardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20465400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gerald C. Crotty, John D. Demsey, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades, Matthew H. Kamens, Sidney Kimmel, Robert L. Mettler, James A. Mitarotonda, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Lowell W. Robinson, TELENDOS, LLC, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Ann Marie C Wilkins, Susan T Mettler, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiadis, Telendos LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cliff C. Gardner, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Gardner, Cliff)
June 28, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (43 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 78 in 1:20-cv-04292-JSR, 150 in 1:20-cv-04335-JSR, 96 in 1:20-cv-04569-JSR, 75 in 1:20-cv-04286-JSR, 95 in 1:20-cv-04262-JSR, 63 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 115 in 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 141 in 1:20-cv-04346-JSR) MOTION for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20456704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al.(ad)
June 28, 2020 Filing 115 MOTION for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20456704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gerald C. Crotty, John D. Demsey, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades, Matthew H. Kamens, Sidney Kimmel, Robert L. Mettler, James A. Mitarotonda, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Lowell W. Robinson, TELENDOS, LLC, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Ann Marie C Wilkins, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiadis, Telendos LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert S. Saunders, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Saunders, Robert)
June 27, 2020 Filing 114 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 1:20-cv-04569-JSR.(Musoff, Scott)
June 27, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Gerald C. Crotty, John D. Demsey, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiades, Matthew H. Kamens, Sidney Kimmel, Robert L. Mettler, James A. Mitarotonda, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A 3/27/06, Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees, Lowell W. Robinson, TELENDOS, LLC, The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, Ann Marie C Wilkins, Mary Margaret Hastings Georgiadis, Telendos LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Musoff, Scott)
June 26, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (43 in 1:20-cv-04287-JSR, 78 in 1:20-cv-04292-JSR, 150 in 1:20-cv-04335-JSR, 96 in 1:20-cv-04569-JSR, 75 in 1:20-cv-04286-JSR, 95 in 1:20-cv-04262-JSR, 63 in 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 115 in 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 141 in 1:20-cv-04346-JSR) MOTION for Robert S. Saunders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-20456704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al.(ad)
June 24, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Elizabeth Tepper on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Tepper, Danielle)
June 24, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Priyanka Kishore Wityk on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Wityk, Priyanka)
June 24, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shenghao Stan Chiueh on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Chiueh, Shenghao)
June 24, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux on behalf of ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, ABC, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2020 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew W. Goldwater on behalf of Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Marc S. Kirschner, Mark S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S Kirschner, Marc S Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(Goldwater, Andrew)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/22/2020) (va)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT VERICIMETRY US SMALL CAP VALUE FUND Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions, and limitations of a Settlement Agreement, dated as of May 20, 2020, between the parties, plaintiffs Marc S. Kirschner, as Trustee for the NWHI Litigation Trust, and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as successor indenture trustee for the 6.875% Senior Notes due 2019, the 8.25% Senior Notes due 2019, and the 6.125% Senior Notes due 2034 of Nine West Holdings, Inc., hereby give notice that they are dismissing the above-entitled actions with prejudice solely against defendant Vericimetry US Small Cap Value Fund, without costs and without fees to any party. SO ORDERED. VERICIMETRY US SMALL CAP VALUE FUND, VERICIMETRY US SMALL CAP VALUE FUND and VERICIMETRY US SMALL CAP VALUE FUND terminated. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/22/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR, 1:20-cv-04569-JSR. (mml)
June 22, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/12/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 22, 2020 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 6/12/2020 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2020.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #103 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Jed S. Rakoff for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
June 22, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) VERICIMETRY US SMALL CAP VALUE FUND. Document filed by Marc S Kirschner. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Lack, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: Upon further consideration of the issues discussed during the telephonic conference held earlier today at 2:00 p.m., see Transcript dated June 12, 2020, the Court sets the following schedule for certain pretrial proceedings in these consolidated actions, and resolves various housekeeping matters in the following manner. 1. By Orders dated June 4, 2020 and June 9, 2020, the Court consolidated 15 cases under the MDL docket 20-MD-2941 for all pre-trial purposes. See 20-MD-2941, ECF Nos. 2, 3. The following four additional related actions are hereby consolidated with all 15 other actions under the MDL docket 20-MD-2941 for all pretrial purposes: Kirschner, et al. v. Robeco Capital Growth Funds - Robeco BP US Premium Equities, No. 20-cv-4479, Kirschner, et al. v. Schwab Capital Trust, No. 20-cv-4480, Kirschner v. Advisors Series Trust (Kellner Merger Fund), et al., No. 20-cv-4433, and Kirschner v. Voya Russell Small Cap Index Portfolio, et al., No. 20-cv-4434. 2. The Court hereby adopts the following (partial) Case Management Plan. (a) Briefs on any anticipated motions to dismiss must be filed on the following bifurcated schedule: (First Round) For any motion to dismiss relating to 546(e) of the Bankruptcy Code, briefs must be filed on the following schedule: (a) moving papers due June 29, 2020; (b) answering papers due July 27, 2020; and (c) reply papers due August 3, 2020. Oral argument on these motions shall be held on August 13, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The Court will issue its decision on these motions in writing by no later than August 27, 2020. (Second Round) As to any action not dismissed after the First Round, any motion to dismiss on any other ground must be briefed on the following schedule: (a) moving papers due September 7, 2020; (b) answering papers due October 5, 2020; and (c) reply papers due October 12, 2020. Oral argument on the Second Round of motions will be held on October 21, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. The Court will issue its decision on these motions in writing by no later than November 4, 2020. (b) After plaintiffs' counsel serves those defendants who have not yet been served (which, based on plaintiffs' counsel's representation, the Court expects to be completed by no later than June 19, 2020), plaintiffs' counsel should promptly advise counsel for those defendants that the instant Order and schedule will apply to those defendants as well. If any of these defendants has any objection to that determination, their counsel, along with plaintiffs' counsel, must convene a joint telephonic conference with Chambers pursuant to Rules 1 and 2 of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice by no later than June 26, 2020. (c) These consolidated actions are not stayed after today, and any and all stays entered by district judges in the actions transferred from other districts are hereby lifted. Document discovery and interrogatories pursuant to Rule 33.3(a) of the Local Civil Rules of the Southern District of New York may commence whenever the parties wish, provided that all such document and interrogatory discovery must be completed by November 4, 2020. In its order of November 4 (see above), the Court will set a schedule for deposition discovery and any summary judgment motion practice. 3. To the extent that the parties anticipate seeking confidential treatment for any discovery in this case, they must jointly submit a proposed protective order, substantially in compliance with Judge Rakoff's model protective order, by no later than June 22, 2020. To the extent that there are any conflicts between the confidentiality order to be entered into by the Court on or about June 22, 2020 and the confidentiality order, as amended, entered into by the Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York in In re: Nine West Holdings, Inc., No. 18-10947 (SCC), ECF Nos. 972, 1471, and 1544 (Bankr. S.D.N.Y.), this Courts order will supersede the Bankruptcy Court's order. (If any party deems it necessary and so advises the Court, the Court will withdraw the reference in the aforesaid bankruptcy for the limited purpose of modifying that court's protective order.) 4. Two recently filed actions -- Kirschner v. Advisors Series Trust (Kellner Merger Fund), et al., No. 20-cv-4433, and Kirschner v. Voya Russell Small Cap Index Portfolio, et al., No. 20-cv-4434 -- were filed under seal at the request of plaintiffs' counsel. Plaintiffs' counsel has now advised the Court that 20-cv-4434 no longer needs to be kept under seal. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to unseal that action forthwith. As to the other action, the relevant parties are hereby directed to promptly consult with one another to see if this sealing should be lifted. In any event, the Court's present intention, unless convinced otherwise, is to unseal this remaining action on or shortly after June 22, 2020. 5. Inasmuch as it has been represented to the Court that the parties have now resolved the issues that had previously existed concerning the confidentiality of some documents (other than the 20-cv-4433 action referred to in #4) previously filed with the Court under seal, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal all such documents and to replace any remaining pseudonyms with the corresponding names of the defendants contained in the captions of the complaints. Plaintiffs' counsel shall cooperate with the Clerk's Office in carrying out this process as promptly as possible. 6. In accord with Rule 2.1(c) of the Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, all counsel who appeared in any of the actions prior to their transfer to this district may continue to represent his or her client and such client need not obtain local counsel. In addition, such counsel need not enter a notice of appearance, provided that they have entered one prior to the transfer, and need not apply for admission pro hac vice. 7. All counsel who had not appeared in an action prior to its transfer, and all counsel in actions filed originally in this district, must enter a notice of appearance in that action and in 20-MD-2941 and, if necessary, apply for admission pro hac vice, as further set forth in this Order. 10. Plaintiffs' unopposed pending motions to dismiss without prejudice Kirschner v. Card, et al., No. 20-cv-4360, and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Card, et al., No. 20-cv-4404, as duplicative of actions earlier commenced by the same plaintiff's against the same defendants and others, are hereby granted. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/7/2020, Responses due by 10/5/2020, Replies due by 10/12/2020. Service due by 6/19/2020. Oral Argument set for 8/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Oral Argument set for 10/21/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR et al. (mml)
June 12, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett David Goodman on behalf of Blue Cross of California. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR.(Goodman, Brett)
June 12, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joel Aaronson on behalf of Blue Cross of California. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02941-JSR, 1:20-cv-04436-JSR.(Aaronson, Matthew)
June 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
June 10, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
June 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
June 10, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:20-md-02941-JSR. (sjo)
June 10, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-md-02941-JSR. (sjo)
June 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
June 10, 2020 Filing 99 MDL CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:20-cv-01480. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (laq). Modified on 6/10/2020 (sjo).
June 8, 2020 Filing 98 Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2941, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Jed S. Rakoff. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 97 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Seaver, Assistant Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 96 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant Litman Gregory Masters Alternative Strategies Fund served on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jennifer Ceccarelli, Chief Compliance Officer in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 95 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant Ishares Europe served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tod Hexter, Mailroom Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 94 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant Hawaii De LLC served on 3/4/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, c/o CT Corporation System in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 93 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant Nicola Guarna served on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicola Guarna, Individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 92 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant George M. Klabin served on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon George M. Klabin, individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 91 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant Diversified Alpha Group Trust served on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Taurean Feaster, Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 90 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant DAGT Small Cap Outliers served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ana D. Tran, Mailroom Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 89 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant Blue Cross of California served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hazel G., Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 88 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant Bam Advisor Services served on 3/6/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sara Buser, Senior Compliance Analyst in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 87 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Ishares 405 served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Seaver, Assistant Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 86 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Equities served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Seaver, Assistant Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 85 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, upon Defendant U.S. Equity Market Fund B served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Seaver, Assistant Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Blackrock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, Ishares Europe, Ishares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, Ishares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 Value ETF, Ishares Russell 3000 ETF, MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 a/k/a Blackrock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, George M Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund B, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,, #83 served on Certification and Notice of Interested Parties. (Palmer, Anne) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Blackrock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, Ishares Europe, Ishares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, Ishares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 Value ETF, Ishares Russell 3000 ETF, MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 a/k/a Blackrock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, George M Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund B, (Palmer, Anne) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Blackrock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, Ishares Europe, Ishares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, Ishares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 Value ETF, Ishares Russell 3000 ETF, MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 a/k/a Blackrock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, George M Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund B, re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending (Partially) Proceedings Until June 30, 2020 #80 served on May 11, 2020 and May 12, 2020. (Palmer, Anne) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO PARTIALLY STAY PROCEEDINGS TO JUNE 30, 2020 #80 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED and the hearing noticed for June 8, 2020 is VACATED. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 80 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending (Partially) Proceedings Until June 30, 2020 filed by Defendants Blackrock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, Ishares Europe, Ishares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, Ishares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 Value ETF, Ishares Russell 3000 ETF, MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 a/k/a Blackrock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, George M Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund B. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Palmer, Anne) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 79 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anne Johnson Palmer counsel for Defendants Blackrock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, Ishares Europe, Ishares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, Ishares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 ETF, Ishares Russell 2000 Value ETF, Ishares Russell 3000 ETF, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, George M Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund B, MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 a/k/a Blackrock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2. Adding Anne Johnson Palmer as counsel of record for Blackrock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Extended Equity Market Fund a/k/a Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, N.A. Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, iShares Europe, iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, iShares Russell 2000 ETF, iShares Russell 2000 Value ETF, iShares Russell 3000 ETF, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC a/k/a iShares Russell 2000 Small-Cap Index Fund, MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 a/k/a Blackrock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, Pacific Select Fund PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund a/k/a Blackrock Russell 2000 Index Non- Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund a/k/a iShares Russell Small/Mid-Cap Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Fund a/k/a iShares Total U.S. Stock Market Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund, and U.S. Equity Market Fund B for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Blackrock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Extended Equity Market Fund a/k/a Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, N.A. Extended Equity Market Fund, Extended Equity Market Master Fund B, iShares Europe, iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF, iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF, iShares Russell 2000 ETF, iShares Russell 2000 Value ETF, iShares Russell 3000 ETF, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC a/k/a iShares Russell 2000 Small-Cap Index Fund, MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 a/k/a Blackrock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, Pacific Select Fund PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund Small-Cap Equity Portfolio, Pacific Select Fund Small-Cap Index Portfolio, Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B, Russell 2000 Index Fund, Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund a/k/a Blackrock Russell 2000 Index Non- Lendable Fund, Russell 2000 Value Fund B, Russell 2500 Index Fund a/k/a iShares Russell Small/Mid-Cap Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Fund a/k/a iShares Total U.S. Stock Market Index Fund, Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund, U.S. Equity Market Fund, and U.S. Equity Market Fund B. (Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Blackrock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Diversified Alpha Group Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Extended Equity Market Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Extended Equity Market Master Fund B(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Ishares Europe(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Ishares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Ishares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Ishares Russell 2000 ETF(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Ishares Russell 2000 Value ETF(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Ishares Russell 3000 ETF(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party George M Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Russell 2000 Index Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Russell 2000 Value Fund B(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Russell 2500 Index Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Russell 3000 Index Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party U.S. Equity Market Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party U.S. Equity Market Fund B(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 a/k/a Blackrock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2(pty:dft))(Palmer, Anne) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #73 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. It is hereby ordered that Pacific Select Fund Small-Cap Index Portfolio shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #72 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. It is hereby ordered that Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #71 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. It is hereby ordered that Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (lom)[Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. correcting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #73 (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 74 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 73 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 72 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 71 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #69 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. PG&E Co. Nuclear Facilities Qualified CPUC Decommissioning Master Trust shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 69 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Pacific Gas and Electric Co.)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Plaintiffs Motion Filed With United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation for Transfer of Actions to the District of Massachusetts Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Transfer, #2 Exhibit Brief in Support of the Motion for Transfer, #3 Exhibit Schedule of Actions, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Priyanka Wityk in Support of the Motion for Transfer, #5 Exhibit Docket sheets and complaints in the Actions, #6 Exhibit Proof of Service of the Motion for Transfer)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #62 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SA U.S. Small Company Fund shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #61 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. BAM Advisor Services d/b/a Loring Ward shall have until 21 May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #60 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Hawaii DE LLC shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #59 . Defendant Litman Gregory Masters Alternative Strategies Fund answer due 5/18/2020. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #58 . Defendant George M. Klabin answer due 5/18/2020 (twdb) Modified on 3/25/2020 (smom). [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 62 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by SA U.S. Small Company Fund)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 61 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by BAM Advisor Services d/b/a Loring Ward)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 60 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Hawaii DE LLC)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 59 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 05-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Litman Gregory Masters Alternative Strategies Fund)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 58 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 05-18-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by George M. Klabin)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California (Reynolds, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California, identifying California Physicians Service dba Blue Shield of California. (Reynolds, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California.(Attorney Michael B Reynolds added to party California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California(pty:dft))(Reynolds, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 54 Plaintiff's Unredacted Notice of Interested Parties re: Notice (Other) #52 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 43 (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 53 UNREDACTED COMPLAINT re: Complaint #1 , Per Notice 43 (Lapine, Ryan) Modified on 3/27/2020 (iv). [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE Re Filing of Unredacted Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Marc S. Kirschner. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #46 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Nicola Guama and Robert Rodriguez shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #45 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Research Affiliates Equity US Large, L.P. f/k/a Enhanced RAFI US Large LP shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #44 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Robert L. Mettler and Defendant CA-1 shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #39 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Vericimetry US Small Cap Value Fund shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #38 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Diversified Alpha Group Trust shall have until May 18, 2020 to respond to the complaint in this matter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 46 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/18/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS NICOLA GUARNA AND ROBERT RODRIGUEZ)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/18/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY RESEARCH AFFILIATES EQUITY US LARGE, L.P. F/K/A ENHANCED RAFI US LARGE LP)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/18/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT ROBERT L. METTLER, DEFENDANT CA-1, THE ROBERT & SUSAN METTLER FAMILY TRUST U/A 3/27/06, AND ROBERT L. METTLER, SUSAN T. METTLER, TRUSTEES)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On 3/3/2020, the Court issued an Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Application to File the Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties Under Seal (the "Order") #35 . The Order provided that the remaining Designating Parties make a further showing of the need for sealing portions of the Complaint and the Notice of Interested Parties by 3/17/2020, or consent to the filing of their designated information on the public docket. No Designating Parties have made such a showing as of 3/19/2020. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to publicly file a Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties by no later than 3/30/2020. The publicly filed Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties shall only redact information the Court has approved to be filed under seal in its previous Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CA-1 (DiCanio, Jack) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Robert L. Mettler CA-1, Robert L. Mettler, identifying National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.; Westchester Fire Insurance Company; Alterra America Insurance Company; Illinois National Insurance Company. (DiCanio, Jack) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jack P DiCanio counsel for Defendants CA-1, Robert L. Mettler. Adding Jack P. DiCanio as counsel of record for CA-1 and Robert L. Mettler for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants CA-1 and Robert L. Mettler. (Attorney Jack P DiCanio added to party CA-1(pty:dft), Attorney Jack P DiCanio added to party Robert L. Mettler(pty:dft))(DiCanio, Jack) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 39 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/18/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY VERICIMETRY US SMALL CAP VALUE FUND)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/18/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DIVERSIFIED ALPHA GROUP TRUST)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ryan M Lapine counsel for Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. Changing address to 333 South Hope Street, Suite 4050, Los Angeles, California 90071. Filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #35 served on March 4, 2020. (Mockler, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART APPLICATION TO FILE THE COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES UNDER SEAL #13 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Application is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice. The Court will keep the unredacted Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties under seal until March 17, 2020. Plaintiff shall serve this order on the remaining Designating Parties and must serve proof of his service by March 10, 2020. By March 17, 2020, the remaining Designating Parties shall make a further showing of the need for sealing the requested documents or consent to the filing of their designated information on the public docket. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 32 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Blue Cross of California, CA-1, CA-10, CA-11, CA-12, CA-13, CA-14, CA-15, CA-16, CA-17, CA-18, CA-19, CA-2, CA-20, CA-21, CA-22, CA-23, CA-24, CA-25, CA-26, CA-27, CA-28, CA-29, CA-3, CA-30, CA-4, CA-5, CA-6, CA-7, CA-8, CA-9, DT DV Market Completion Fund, Richard L. Dickson, Diversified Alpha Group Trust, Nicola Guarna, Hawaii De LLC, George M. Klabin, Litman Gregory Masters Alternative Strategies Fund, Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC, Robert L. Mettler, PG and E Co. Nuclear Facilities Qualified Cpuc Decommissioning Master Trust, Research Affiliates Equity US Large, L.P., Robert Rodriguez, Vericimetry US Small Cap Value Fund. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: App. for Leave to File Complaint, etc., Under Seal #12 , for the following reasons: Docket Nos. 12 and 13 appear to be duplicative. Therefore, the Court orders the Clerk to STRIKE Docket No. 12 and TERMINATE the gavel. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Edward A. Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, designating Ryan M. Lapine as local counsel #19 . (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney Ross E. Firsenbaum APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of non-party State Street Bank and Trust Co, designating Christopher T. Casamassima as local counsel. (mrgo)[Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Robert J. Lack APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, designating Ryan M. Lapine as local counsel. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Allan Brent Diamond APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, designating Ryan M. Lapine as local counsel. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment No. 1 to Summons, #2 Supplement Attachment No. 2 to Summons, #3 Supplement Attachment No. 3 to Summons)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-01480 MWF(KSx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration #24 served on February 24, 2020. (Casamassima, Christopher) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ross E. Firsenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25486878) filed by Intereseted Party State Street Bank and Trust Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Casamassima, Christopher) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 24 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #13 filed by Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Casamassima, Christopher) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co. identifying State Street Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Casamassima, Christopher) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Thomas Casamassima counsel for Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co.. Adding Christopher T. Casamassima as counsel of record for State Street Bank and Trust Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Party State Street Bank and Trust Co.. (Attorney Christopher Thomas Casamassima added to party State Street Bank and Trust Co. (pty:ip))(Casamassima, Christopher) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Lara Samet Buchwald in Support of APPLICATION to file document under seal #13 Declaration of Lara Samet Buchwald in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File the Complaint and Notice of Interested Parties Under Seal filed by Miscellaneous Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated. (Attorney Neal Alan Potischman added to party Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated(pty:misc))(Potischman, Neal) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert J. Lack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25482546) filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice Robert Lack) (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward A. Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25482388) filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice Edward A. Friedman) (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allan Brent Diamond to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25481746) filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order 2020.02.24 (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice Allan B. Diamond) (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/19/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-25408319) #10 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ROBERT J. LACK to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25408763) #11 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ALLAN B. DIAMOND to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25407346) #9 , for the following reasons: Comply with the instructions on docket no. 16. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ALLAN B. DIAMOND to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25407346) #9 ; APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/19/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-25408319) #10 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ROBERT J. LACK to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25408763) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Other error(s) with document(s): Doc no. 9 -Missing GSC for New York; Doc 10 - missing GSC for DC, unable to verify on DC Bar.. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT to APPLICATION to file document under seal #13 EXHIBITS A, B AND C TO WITYK DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #13 filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document COMPLAINT, #2 Unredacted Document NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES)(Lapine, Ryan)[Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF PRIYANKA WlTYK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE COMPLAINT AND THE NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit D (REDACTED COMPLAINT), #3 Exhibit E (REDACTED NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES), #4 Proposed Order)(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 **STRICKEN** APPLICATION to Seal Case filed by PLAINTIFF Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF PRIYANKA WlTYK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE COMPLAINT AND THE NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit D (REDACTED COMPLAINT), #3 Exhibit E (REDACTED NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES), #4 Proposed Order) (Lapine, Ryan) Modified on 2/28/2020 Per Order #33 (iv). [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ROBERT J. LACK to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25408763) filed by PLAINTIFF Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING NEW YORK, #2 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING NEW JERSEY SUPREME COURT, #3 Proposed Order ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/19/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-25408319) filed by PLAINTIFF Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #2 Proposed Order ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ALLAN B. DIAMOND to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25407346) filed by PLAINTIFF Marc S. Kirschner. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #2 Proposed Order ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-01480 ODW(KSx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Allan B. Diamond. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert J. Lack. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward A. Friedman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF MARC S. KIRSCHNER, as Trustee for the NWHI LITIGATION TRUST, (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MARC S. KIRSCHNER, as Trustee for the NWHI LITIGATION TRUST. (Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25325937 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF MARC S. KIRSCHNER, as Trustee for the NWHI LITIGATION TRUST. (Attorney Ryan M Lapine added to party MARC S. KIRSCHNER, as Trustee for the NWHI LITIGATION TRUST(pty:pla))(Lapine, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 6/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marc S. Kirschner v. Richard L. Dickson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell 2500 Index Fund
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Small Cap Index Series of Quantitative Master Series LLC
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell 2000 Index Non-Lendable Fund
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL 3000 INDEX FUND
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extended Equity Market Fund
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackrock Russell
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Dickson
Represented By: Craig Aaron Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iShares Morningstar Small-Cap Value ETF
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA U.S. Small Company Fund
Represented By: Brian Christopher Raphel
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ishares Russell Small
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iShares MSCI USA Small Cap UCITS ETF
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DT DV MARKET COMPLETION FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Equities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M Pacific Select Fund-PD Small-Cap Value Index Portfolio
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Ishares 405
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M. Klabin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlackRock MSCI USA Small Cap Equity Index Fund
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell 2000 Index Fund
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Equity Market Fund B
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2 a/k/a BlackRock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bam Advisor Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Select Fund-Small-Cap Equity Portfolio
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert and Susan Mettler Family Trust U/A Robert L. Mettler, Susan T. Mettler, Trustees
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PG and E Co. Nuclear Facilities Qualified Cpuc Decommissioning Master Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iShares Russell 3000 ETF
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iShares Russell 2000 Value ETF
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rodriguez
Represented By: Travis P Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iShares Europe
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research Affiliates Equity US Large, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Equity Market Fund
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ishares Russell 2000 ETF
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell 2000 Value Fund B
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street North America Confidential CLient 1 FOF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell 3000 Index Non-Lendable Fund
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAWAII DE LLC
Represented By: Reade William Seligmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extended Equity Market Master Fund B
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ishares Total U.S. Stock Market Index Fund
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERICIMETRY US SMALL CAP VALUE FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicola Guarna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Alpha Group Trust
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackrock Institutional Trust Company
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Mettler
Represented By: Jack P. Dicanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Select-Fund-Small-Cap Index Portfolio
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell 2000 Alpha Tilts Fund B
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAGT Small Cap Outliers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ishares Russell
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LITMAN GREGORY MASTERS ALTERNATIVE STRATEGIES FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackrock Institutional Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bam Advisor Services doing business as Loring Ward
Represented By: Brian Christopher Raphel
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Rafi US Large LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California
Represented By: Michael B Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Physicians' Service d/b/a Blue Shield of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc S Kirschner
Represented By: Robert J Lack
Represented By: Ryan M Lapine
Represented By: Allan B Diamond
Represented By: Edward A Friedman
Represented By: Priyanka Kishore Wityk
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Tepper
Represented By: Edward A. Friedman
Represented By: Shenghao Stan Chiueh
Represented By: Andrew W. Goldwater
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State Street Bank and Trust Co.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Casamassima
Represented By: Ross E Firsenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?