Francois v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Plaintiff: Manoucheka Francois
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Metro-North Commuter Railroad
3Rd Party Defendant: Michael T. Cellante and Hudson Valley Transportation
Case Number: 1:2020cv04439
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael T. Cellante, Hudson Valley Transportation. (sj)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hudson Valley Transportation and Michael T. Cellante, re: #10 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
August 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alan Muraidekh to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to:' Error; party names listed in the 'as to' docket entry text must appear exactly as they do in the pleading caption ( Michael T. Cellante ). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hudson Valley Transportation and Michael Cellante, re: #10 Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan) Modified on 8/4/2020 (dnh).
July 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alan Muraidekh to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): link the summons to the third party complaint;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Hudson Valley Transportation, Michael T. Cellante.Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Metro-North's Answer, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service from PM Legal of Hudson Valley Transportation, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Service from PM Legal - Michael T. Cellante).(Muraidekh, Alan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hudson Valley Transportation, Michael T. Cellante, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan) Modified on 7/29/2020 (pc).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: This action is scheduled for an Initial Case Management Telephone Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Wednesday, August 19, 2020 at 11:45 a.m. Counsel is directed to call the courts telephone conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 4858267. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/19/2020 at 11:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7//9/2020) (jca)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/9/2020) (rj)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(pc)
June 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Manoucheka Francois..(Wietzke, Marc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Commuter Railroad. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20191258)Document filed by Manoucheka Francois..(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francois v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manoucheka Francois
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Michael T. Cellante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hudson Valley Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?