Holmes et al v. Chet Mining Co, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JOSH NAVARRO, YASAR CORPORATION, BITCOIN VENTURES 2020 LLC, NICO TRAMONTANA, Alexander M. Holmes, ONEPURPOSE LTD., Bitcoin Ventures 2020, LLC and Alex Holmes
Defendant: CHET MINING CO, LLC, CHET MINING CO CANADA LTD. and CHET STOJANOVICH
Case Number: 1:2020cv04448
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Chet Mining Co Canada LTD. served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Chet Mining Co, LLC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service was accepted by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Document filed by OnePurpose LTD.; Nico Tramontana; Josh Navarro; Bitcoin Ventures 2020, LLC; Alex Holmes; Yasar Corporation..(Harwick, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was made by mail. Document filed by OnePurpose LTD., Nico Tramontana, Josh Navarro, Bitcoin Ventures 2020, LLC, Alex Holmes, Yasar Corporation..(Harwick, John)
June 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
June 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 16, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-01880-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chet Mining Co Canada LTD...(pc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chet Stojanovich..(pc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chet Mining Co, LLC..(pc)
June 11, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 20cv1880. (pc)
June 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
June 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Frederick Harwick. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alexander M. Holmes. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
June 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Frederick Harwick. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
June 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John Frederick Harwick to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Multiple natures of suit were selected. Choose one. Note the related case number and judge on the bottom of the first page of the civil cover sheet. Remove the citizenship of principal parties selections. (pc)
June 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Frederick Harwick. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ONEPURPOSE LTD., BITCOIN VENTURES 2020 LLC, NICO TRAMONTANA, JOSH NAVARRO, YASAR CORPORATION, CHET MINING CO CANADA LTD., CHET MINING CO, LLC, CHET STOJANOVICH. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHET STOJANOVICH, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BITCOIN VENTURES 2020 LLC, Alexander M. Holmes, JOSH NAVARRO, ONEPURPOSE LTD., NICO TRAMONTANA, YASAR CORPORATION..(Harwick, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHET MINING CO, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BITCOIN VENTURES 2020 LLC, Alexander M. Holmes, JOSH NAVARRO, ONEPURPOSE LTD., NICO TRAMONTANA, YASAR CORPORATION..(Harwick, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHET MINING CO CANADA, LTD., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BITCOIN VENTURES 2020 LLC, Alexander M. Holmes, JOSH NAVARRO, ONEPURPOSE LTD., NICO TRAMONTANA, YASAR CORPORATION..(Harwick, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-CV-01880. Document filed by BITCOIN VENTURES 2020 LLC, Alexander M. Holmes, JOSH NAVARRO, ONEPURPOSE LTD., NICO TRAMONTANA, YASAR CORPORATION..(Harwick, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Harwick, John) Modified on 6/11/2020 (pc).
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHET MINING CO CANADA LTD., CHET MINING CO, LLC, CHET STOJANOVICH. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20194742)Document filed by ONEPURPOSE LTD., Alexander M. Holmes, BITCOIN VENTURES 2020 LLC, NICO TRAMONTANA, JOSH NAVARRO, YASAR CORPORATION..(Harwick, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes et al v. Chet Mining Co, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSH NAVARRO
Represented By: John Frederick Harwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YASAR CORPORATION
Represented By: John Frederick Harwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BITCOIN VENTURES 2020 LLC
Represented By: John Frederick Harwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICO TRAMONTANA
Represented By: John Frederick Harwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander M. Holmes
Represented By: John Frederick Harwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONEPURPOSE LTD.
Represented By: John Frederick Harwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bitcoin Ventures 2020, LLC
Represented By: John Frederick Harwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Holmes
Represented By: John Frederick Harwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHET MINING CO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHET MINING CO CANADA LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHET STOJANOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?