Bannister et al v. United States Treasury Department
Plaintiff: Sarah Bannister, LaBarron Tate and Brandon Hood
Defendant: United States Treasury Department, Brian P. Brooks and Steven T. Mnuchin
Case Number: 1:2020cv04458
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilan Stein on behalf of Brian P. Brooks, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Treasury Department..(Stein, Ilan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Steven T. Mnuchin served on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Sarah Bannister; Brandon Hood; LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Brian P. Brooks served on 7/1/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Sarah Bannister; Brandon Hood; LaBarron Tate., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Brian P. Brooks served on 7/1/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Sarah Bannister; Brandon Hood; LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin)
June 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Austin Connell Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; the defendant section is incomplete; if all names do not fit, name the first listed defendant followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Treasury Department, re: #5 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin) Modified on 6/23/2020 (pne).
June 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Austin Connell Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Court name is not on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven T. Mnuchin..(jgo)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian P. Brooks..(jgo)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Treasury Department, re: #5 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin) Modified on 6/19/2020 (jgo).
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hon. Brian P. Brooks, re: #5 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hon. Steven T. Mnuchin, re: #5 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Austin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #2 Amended Complaint, against Brian P. Brooks, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States Treasury Department.Document filed by Sarah Bannister, Brandon Hood, LaBarron Tate. Related document: #2 Amended Complaint,..(Smith, Austin)
June 17, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
June 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
June 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Austin Connell Smith. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Brandon C. Hood; STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN; United States Treasury Department; Brian P. Brooks. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
June 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Austin Connell Smith. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
June 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Austin Connell Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
June 17, 2020 Transmission to Case Assignment Clerk. Transmitted re: #3 Amended Civil Case Administrative Closing Order,,,,, to the Case Assignment Clerk for preparation of notice of case assignment/reassignment..(gp)
June 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Austin Smith. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Steven Terner Mnuchin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (gp)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPLICATION TO REOPEN CASE: Pursuant to Amended Standing Order (15-MC-131):. The deficiency(ies) has been cured and the party(ies) seek to reopen the civil case..(Smith, Austin)
June 17, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20293685..(Smith, Austin)
June 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Austin Connell Smith re: Document No. #2 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee for the original Complaint was not paid; the Amended Complaint has not been reviewed. (pne)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The filing fee due was not paid either in whole or in part.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 8/17/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2017) (pne)
June 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against United States Treasury Department, STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, Brian P. Brooks, Brandon C. Hood.Document filed by Sarah Bannister. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Smith, Austin) Modified on 6/17/2020 (jgo).
June 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Austin Connell Smith. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
June 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Austin Connell Smith. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 6/16/2020..(pne)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Treasury Department. Document filed by LaBarron Tate..(Smith, Austin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bannister et al v. United States Treasury Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Bannister
Represented By: Austin C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaBarron Tate
Represented By: Austin Connell Smith
Represented By: Austin C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Hood
Represented By: Austin C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Treasury Department
Represented By: Ilan Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian P. Brooks
Represented By: Ilan Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Mnuchin
Represented By: Ilan Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?