Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Plaintiff: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Accord Healthcare Inc. and Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04483
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 DC Certificate of Good Standing).(Connor, Colette)
July 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 CA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 DC Certificate of Good Standing).(Schmidtlein, John)
July 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #14 MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20931655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #13 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20931031. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit not notarized. Please re-file entire motion and make sure your affidavit is notarized.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20931655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit PHV Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit VA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing).(Connor, Colette) Modified on 7/31/2020 (bcu).
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20931031. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing).(Schmidtlein, John) Modified on 7/31/2020 (bcu).
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to All parties in the above captioned matters:from Chief Judge Colleen McMahon dated 7/30/2020 re: CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., et al.(19-cv-9999-CM); Walgreen Co. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. et al. (19-cv-10049-CM); Hy-Vee, Inc. v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al. (20-cv-4483-CM) ENDORSEMENT: In their motion papers, the parties reference certain inventory management agreements dated April 1, 2016 between Defendants AstraZeneca LP and AstraZeneca Pharmaceutical LP and each of the Retailer Plaintiffs' assignors: AmerisourceBergen Corporation (through its operating subsidiaries, including AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation); Cardinal Health, Inc. (through its operating affiliates); and McKesson Corporation. I cannot seem to find copies of those agreements in the record. Please file these agreements on ECF immediately.Thank you all for your prompt response to this inquiry. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/30/2020) (js)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Astrazeneca PLC for Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/24/2020) (mml)
June 24, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-07233-CM. (mml)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION: 1. The Complaint filed in this action on June 11, 2020 shall be deemed to have been served on all Defendants as of the date this Stipulation is approved and entered by the Court. 2. Except as to service of process, in joining this Stipulation, Defendants do not thereby waive, and expressly reserve, all objections and defenses to these actions, including without limitation any objections and defenses as to personal jurisdiction and venue. 3. This action is hereby consolidated as a member case to the J.M. Smith case, Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-7233. 4. The pending motions to dismiss or transfer, oppositions thereto, reply briefs, and documents submitted in support thereof filed in the Walgreen and CVS actions I shall be deemed to have been filed in this action, mutatis mutandis, and the Court's ruling on those motions shall be deemed to apply to this action. The parties shall retain all appellate rights they would have if the motions and oppositions were refiled in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/24/2020) (mml)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc...(Perwin, Scott)
June 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
June 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 16, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-07233-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
June 12, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 19cv7233. (pc)
June 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
June 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20217912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20217912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Perwin, Scott)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc...(Perwin, Scott)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-10049. Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc...(Perwin, Scott)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-07233. Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc...(Perwin, Scott)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perwin, Scott)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Accord Healthcare Inc., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20217641)Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc...(Perwin, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca LP
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: Colette Connor
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca UK Limited
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: Colette Connor
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: Colette Connor
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Eliot Perwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?