Amador Rubio v. Varela Da Costa et al
Plaintiff: Sandy C. Amador Rubio
Defendant: Carlos Manuel Varela Da Costa and Beatriz Ontanon Nasarre
Case Number: 1:2020cv04487
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Carlos Manuel Varela Da Costa served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service was accepted by Beatriz Ontanon Nasarre, a person of suitable age and discretion and. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sandy C. Amador Rubio..(Rapaport, Marc)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Beatriz Ontanon Nasarre served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service was accepted by Beatriz Ontanon Nasarre. Document filed by Sandy C. Amador Rubio..(Rapaport, Marc)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/15/2020) (jwh)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carlos Manuel Varela Da Costa..(pne)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beatriz Ontanon Nasarre..(pne)
June 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
June 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beatriz Ontanon Nasarre, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sandy C. Amador Rubio..(Rapaport, Marc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carlos Manuel Varela Da Costa, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sandy C. Amador Rubio..(Rapaport, Marc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rapaport, Marc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beatriz Ontanon Nasarre, Carlos Manuel Varela Da Costa. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20218311)Document filed by Sandy C. Amador Rubio..(Rapaport, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amador Rubio v. Varela Da Costa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Manuel Varela Da Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatriz Ontanon Nasarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy C. Amador Rubio
Represented By: Marc Andrew Rapaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?