Perry Street Software, Inc. v. Jedi Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Perry Street Software, Inc.
Defendant: Jedi Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04539
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for Mitchell Reed Sibley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21077218. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 10, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Mitchell Reed Sibley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21077218. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Perry Street Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sibley Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Texas Good Standing Cert, #3 Exhibit Colorado Good Standing Cert, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Sibley, Mitchell)
August 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Chase Callahan on behalf of Perry Street Software, Inc...(Callahan, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Perry Street Software, Inc.. Document filed by Jedi Technologies, Inc...(Haan, Brian)
July 29, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Withdrawal re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6).. Document filed by Jedi Technologies, Inc...(Haan, Brian)
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6). . Document filed by Perry Street Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Charhon, Brett)
July 24, 2020 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #6 Complaint against Jedi Technologies, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Perry Street Software, Inc.. Related document: #6 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (Part I), #5 Exhibit D (Part II)).(Charhon, Brett)
July 10, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jedi Technologies, Inc...(LaValley, Ashley)
July 10, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Ashley E. LaValley in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6).. Document filed by Jedi Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- US Patent No. 10,164,918, #2 Exhibit 2 - 6/11/20 Email Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 3 -6/12/20 Email Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 4 - 6/25/20 Email Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5 - 6/26/20 Correspondence).(LaValley, Ashley)
July 10, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6). . Document filed by Jedi Technologies, Inc...(LaValley, Ashley)
July 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6). Document filed by Jedi Technologies, Inc...(LaValley, Ashley)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Brian Erik Haan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/9/2020) (mro)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #12 Motion for Dragan Gjorgiev to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion for Dragan Gjorgiev to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/9/2020) (mro)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Ashley E. La Valley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/9/2020) (mro)
July 8, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Dragan Gjorgiev to Appear Pro Hac ViceReceipt Number ANYSDC-20597746. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. #12 MOTION for Dragan Gjorgiev to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20597746. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Dragan Gjorgiev to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number ANYSDC-20597746. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jedi Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Gjorgiev, Dragan)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Dragan Gjorgiev to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20597746. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jedi Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Admission Pro Hace Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Gjorgiev, Dragan)
July 8, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Ashley Elizabeth LaValley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20597570. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #10 MOTION for Brian Erik Haan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20597268. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Ashley Elizabeth LaValley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20597570. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jedi Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(LaValley, Ashley)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Brian Erik Haan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20597268. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jedi Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Haan, Brian)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct for Steven Callahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/24/2020) (rj)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Steven Callahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Perry Street Software, Inc.. Return Date set for 6/22/2020 at 02:27 PM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Callahan Declaration), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Texas Supreme Court), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (Massachusetts), #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Charhon, Brett)
June 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for Steven Callahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20360853. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Texas Supreme;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (laq)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Steven Callahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20360853. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Perry Street Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Callahan Declaration), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Massachusetts), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (Texas)), #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Charhon, Brett)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Jedi Technologies, Inc.. Document filed by Perry Street Software, Inc...(Charhon, Brett)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
June 15, 2020 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
June 15, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 15, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brett Charhon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Perry Street Software, Inc., Jedi Technologies, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
June 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brett Charhon to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Charhon, Brett)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Charhon, Brett)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Perry Street Software, Inc...(Charhon, Brett)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Perry Street Software, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20242478)Document filed by Perry Street Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Part I), #3 Exhibit B (Part II)).(Charhon, Brett) Modified on 6/15/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry Street Software, Inc. v. Jedi Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jedi Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Dragan Gjorgiev
Represented By: Brian Erik Haan
Represented By: Ashley E. LaValley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Street Software, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Charhon
Represented By: Mitchell Reed Sibley
Represented By: Steven Chase Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?