Independent Service Provider, LLC et al v National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburg, PA
Plaintiff: Independent Service Provider, LLC
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Case Number: 1:2020cv04713
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
June 19, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
June 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
June 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Illinois Southern; Case Number: 3:20-cv-00441. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court of the Southern District of New York filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. Case transferred to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 6/17/2020. (lmo) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-441-RJD. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Moran, Patrick) unsealed on 6/8/2020 (trb). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 6/11/2020 (trb) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court of the Southern District of New York filed by Independent Service Provider, LLC. (Scoggins, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Scoggins, Mark) unsealed on 6/8/2020 (trb). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Scoggins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Scoggins, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick F Moran on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Moran, Patrick) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorneys Scoggins and Moran do not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Independent Service Provider, LLC, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-441-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 6/3/2020 (trb) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court of the Southern District of New York by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott Schmookler)(Moran, Patrick) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court of Monroe County, Illinois, case number 2020L12 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4179170), filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pleadings Served, #2 Exhibit B: State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C: Member Information)(Moran, Patrick) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Independent Service Provider, LLC et al v National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburg, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: Patrick F Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Independent Service Provider, LLC
Represented By: Mark C. Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?