Windward Bora LLC v. Browne et al
Plaintiff: Windward Bora LLC
Defendant: Royston D. Browne and Constance R. Browne
Case Number: 1:2020cv04748
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Stipulation is GRANTED. Christopher B. Spuches (NY Bar No.: 2848653) and the law firm of AGENTIS PLLC is hereby substituted as counsel of record for the Plaintiff, WINDWARD BORA LLC, and Benjamin M. Kahrl (NY Bar No.: 3059912) and the law firm of LAW OFFICE OF BENJAMIN M. KAHRL are hereby relieved of any further responsibility in the above styled action. DONE AND ORDERED in Chambers in New York, New York this 5th day of August, 2020. So Ordered Attorney Christopher Brendan Spuches for Windward Bora LLC added. Attorney Benjamin Michael Kahrl terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/6/2020) (js)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Windward Bora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL).(Spuches, Christopher)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Notice of Substitution of Attorney, filed by Windward Bora LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ordered. Attorney Alan Smikun and Alan H. Weinreb terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/15/2020) (js)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Michael Kahrl on behalf of Windward Bora LLC..(Kahrl, Benjamin)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Alan Weinreb and Alan Smikun, New Attorney: Benjamin M. Kahrl, Address: Law Office of Benjamin M. Kahrl, P.C., 100 Park Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10017, 2023743475. Document filed by Windward Bora LLC..(Kahrl, Benjamin)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Constance R. Browne..(dnh)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Royston D. Browne..(dnh)
June 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
June 22, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Smikun on behalf of Windward Bora LLC..(Smikun, Alan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Windward Bora LLC..(Weinreb, Alan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Constance Browne, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Windward Bora LLC..(Weinreb, Alan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Royston D. Browne, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Windward Bora LLC..(Weinreb, Alan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weinreb, Alan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Constance R. Browne, Royston D. Browne. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20344258)Document filed by Windward Bora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Note).(Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windward Bora LLC v. Browne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royston D. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance R. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windward Bora LLC
Represented By: Alan Smikun
Represented By: Alan H. Weinreb
Represented By: Christopher Brendan Spuches
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Kahrl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?