Hennelly v. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv04786
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: granting 12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/29/2021) (ama)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/19/2021) (ks)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The time for the plaintiff's motion adjourned until March 19, 2021. The defendant's cross motion due April 23, 2021. The plaintiff's reply due May 14. The defendant's reply due May 28, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/17/2021) (ks) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/17/2021) (ks).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hennelly v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?