Open Society Justice Initiative v. Department of Defense et al
Plaintiff: Open Society Justice Initiative
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of State, Department of Treasury, Defense Intelligence Agency, United States Indo-Pacific Command and Department of Defense
Case Number: 1:2020cv05096
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 42(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the two cases are consolidated under the case number 20-CV-5096 (JMF). All future filings should be in 20-CV-5096 (JMF) alone. The parties shall appear for a teleconference with the Court on September 23, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. At least twenty-four hours before the conference, counsel shall email to the Court the names and telephone numbers of those who will have speaking roles at the conference, and the Court will provide call-in information to those counsel. All others counsel who will not have speaking roles and members of the public may listen to the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference call line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540 followed by the pound (#) key. The parties are reminded to follow the procedures for teleconferences described in the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. No later than the Thursday before the conference, the parties shall file a joint status letter setting forth their views of the case and how it should proceed, including, if appropriate, a proposed briefing schedule. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate 20-CV-5096 (JMF) and 20-CV-6359 (JMF) under case number 20-CV-5096 (JMF), and to close 20-CV-6359. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 9/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/25/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05096-JMF, 1:20-cv-06359-JMF (yv)
August 21, 2020 Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Mark F. Mendelsohn dated August 21, 2020 re: Joint Response to the Court's August 14, 2020 Order. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. The deadline to file the status letter in 20-CV-5096, see ECF No. 27, is EXTENDED to August 24, 2020. The status letter shall be filed jointly by all parties in both cases and shall address not only whether a conference is necessary and a proposed briefing schedule for any motion for summary judgment, but also the parties views regarding whether the Court should consolidate these cases pursuant to Rule 42 or modify the dates, deadlines, or procedures in either. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, any other dates and deadlines remain in effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/14/20) (yv)
August 7, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Defense Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Department of Treasury, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, United States Indo-Pacific Command..(Cha-Kim, Stephen)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Natasha Arnpriester to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 23, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Natasha Arnpriester to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20817842. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 23, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Natasha Arnpriester to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20817842. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Natasha Arnpriester, #2 Exhibit A - AD1 COGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Arnpriester, Natasha)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Tanya Stephanie Manno to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Brian Shiue to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Joseph Morris Granzotto to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 23, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Tanya Stephanie Manno to Appear Pro Hac Vic . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20803102. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. #32 MOTION for Joseph Morris Granzotto to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20802974. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. #33 MOTION for Brian Shiue to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20803036. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
July 22, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Tanya Stephanie Manno to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20803102. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tanya Stephanie Manno, #2 Exhibit A - DC COGS, #3 Exhibit B - CA COGS, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Manno, Tanya)
July 22, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Brian Shiue to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20803036. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Shiue, #2 Exhibit A-DC COGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Shiue, Brian)
July 22, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Joseph Morris Granzotto to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20802974. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Morris Granzotto, #2 Exhibit A-DC COGS, #3 Exhibit B-MI COGS, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Granzotto, Joseph)
July 22, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amrit Singh on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative..(Singh, Amrit)
July 22, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Jonah Klein on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative..(Klein, Daniel)
July 22, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Alan Stone on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative..(Stone, Eric)
July 21, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Seungkun Cha-Kim on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, Defense Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Department of Treasury, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, United States Indo-Pacific Command..(Cha-Kim, Stephen)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #26 Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Defense Intelligence Agency, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency, United States Indo-Pacific Command, Department of Treasury. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/21/20) (yv)
July 20, 2020 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Defense Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Department of Treasury, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, United States Indo-Pacific Command..(Folch, Monica)
July 8, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Department of Treasury served on 7/7/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 8, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Department of State served on 7/7/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 8, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). United States Indo-Pacific Command served on 7/7/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 8, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Department of Defense served on 7/7/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 8, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 7/7/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 8, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Defense Intelligence Agency served on 7/7/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 8, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Central Intelligence Agency served on 7/7/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: This case arises under the Freedom of Information Act, Title 5, United States Code, Section 552. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint letter, no later than two weeks from the date of this order and not to exceed two pages, indicating whether there is any need for discovery or an initial conference in this case. If there is no such need, the parties should include in their letter a proposed briefing schedule for any motions, including motions for summary judgment. If Defendants have not yet entered a notice of appearance, Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendants and file proof of such service. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/6/2020) (rro)
July 6, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Defense..(pc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of State..(pc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Indo-Pacific Command..(pc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defense Intelligence Agency..(pc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency..(pc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Treasury..(pc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(pc)
July 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Open Society Institute for Open Society Justice Initiative. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Treasury, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of State, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Indo-Pacific Command, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defense Intelligence Agency, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mendelsohn, Mark)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Defense Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Department of Treasury, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, United States Indo-Pacific Command. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20529644)Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DOD FOIA Request, #2 Exhibit B - DIA FOIA Request, #3 Exhibit C - IndoPac FOIA Request, #4 Exhibit D - State FOIA Request, #5 Exhibit E - Treasury FOIA Request, #6 Exhibit F - CIA FOIA Request, #7 Exhibit G - ODNI FOIA Request, #8 Exhibit H - DOD Interim Response, #9 Exhibit I - DOD Clarification, #10 Exhibit J - Email Attaching DIA FOIA, #11 Exhibit K - IndoPac Interim Response, #12 Exhibit L - State FOIA Acknowledgement, #13 Exhibit M - Treasury FOIA Acknowledgement, #14 Exhibit N - ODNI FOIA Acknowledgement, #15 Exhibit O - CIA FOIA Acknowledgement, #16 Exhibit P - CIA Final Response, #17 Exhibit Q - CIA FOIA Appeal).(Mendelsohn, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Open Society Justice Initiative v. Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Stephen Seungkun Cha-Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Stephen Seungkun Cha-Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State
Represented By: Stephen Seungkun Cha-Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury
Represented By: Stephen Seungkun Cha-Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Stephen Seungkun Cha-Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Indo-Pacific Command
Represented By: Stephen Seungkun Cha-Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Represented By: Stephen Seungkun Cha-Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Society Justice Initiative
Represented By: Mark F. Mendelsohn
Represented By: Brian Shiue
Represented By: Natasha Arnpriester
Represented By: Tanya Manno
Represented By: Eric Alan Stone
Represented By: Joseph Granzotto
Represented By: Amrit Singh
Represented By: Daniel Jonah Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?