Fleetwood Services, LLC v. Ram Capital Funding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fleetwood Services, LLC
Defendant: RICHMOND CAPITAL GROUP LLC, Tzvi Reich, Robert Giardina, Ram Capital Funding, LLC, TSVI Reich and Steve Reich
Case Number: 1:2020cv05120
Filed: July 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fleetwood Services, LLC..(Heskin, Shane)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shane R. Heskin on behalf of Fleetwood Services, LLC..(Heskin, Shane)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Abraham Beinhorn dated August 5, 2020 re: Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Ram Capital Funding, LLC, TSVI Reich..(Beinhorn, Abraham)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on September 24, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-lewis-j-liman. This document should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, which are available on the same webpage. Parties should consult the Individual Practices for guidance on the matters to be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference and for the Court's rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other procedural matters. Counsel for Defendants is ordered to notify all counsel of this Notice. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/9/20) (yv)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ram Capital Funding, LLC..(Beinhorn, Abraham)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Beinhorn, Abraham)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Abraham S Beinhorn. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tzvi Reich, RICHMOND CAPITAL GROUP LLC, Ram Capital Funding, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; alias party was entered incorrectly or omitted. (dnh)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Abraham S Beinhorn. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 651759/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20546083).Document filed by Tzvi Reich, Ram Capital Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavits of Service, #3 Exhibit Notice to State Court).(Beinhorn, Abraham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleetwood Services, LLC v. Ram Capital Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHMOND CAPITAL GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tzvi Reich
Represented By: Abraham S Beinhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Giardina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ram Capital Funding, LLC
Represented By: Abraham S Beinhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSVI Reich
Represented By: Abraham S Beinhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Reich
Represented By: Abraham S Beinhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fleetwood Services, LLC
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?