Contreras-Marcelino v. Cerdena et al
Case Number: 1:2020cv05149
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332tm Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. An initial pretrial conference in this matter is scheduled for October 2, 2020 at 3:45 PM. The proceeding will be conducted via teleconference. The Court's dedicated conference line can be accessed at (888) 363-4749 by entering Access Code 919-6964, followed by the pound (#) key. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/30/2020) (rjm)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are reminded that the initial pretrial conference is scheduled for October 2, 2020 at 3:45 PM, dkt 4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/29/2020) (jca)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: In light of the COVID-19 public health crisis, the Court will not hold the upcoming initial pretrial conference in this case in person. To that end, counsel should indicate in their joint letter all times on the date of the scheduled conferenc e that they would be available for a telephone conference. In either case, counsel should review and comply with the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-alison-j-nathan. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/22/2020) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/22/2020) (cf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras-Marcelino v. Cerdena et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?