Shurriah v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Rshana Shurriah
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05247
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Referring Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 12:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Counsel is directed to call the court's telephone conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 4858267. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/13/2020) (mro)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/13/2020) (jca)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Rshana Shurriah.(Gray, John)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Eugene Gray on behalf of Rshana Shurriah..(Gray, John)
July 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 9, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 9, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate MPC Investment LLC, Other Affiliate Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC. Document filed by Speedway LLC..(Bushwack, Jacqueline)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bushwack, Jacqueline)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 24105/2020E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20604392).Document filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Response to Demand for Supplemental Demand).(Bushwack, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shurriah v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rshana Shurriah
Represented By: John Eugene Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Mecchella Bushwack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?