Williams et al v. City University of New York et al
Plaintiff: Brigitte Williams, Shevonne McKenzie, Tylisha Story, Brenda Worthington and P.O. John Does 1-5
Defendant: Borough of Manhattan Community College, City University of New York ("CUNY"), Dr. Kristin Waters and City University of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv05266
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. By September 24, 2020, Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/5/2020) (kv)
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Amanda C. Croushore dated August 5, 2020. Document filed by Borough of Manhattan Community College, City University of New York..(Croushore, Amanda)
August 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Borough of Manhattan Community College answer due 9/24/2020; City University of New York answer due 9/24/2020; Kristin Waters answer due 9/24/2020. (kv)
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Borough of Manhattan Community College served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by David Saums. Document filed by Brigitte Williams; Shevonne McKenzie; Brenda Worthington; John Does 1-5; Tylisha Story..(Richman, Scott)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Kristin Waters served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Service was accepted by Cpl Acevedo. Document filed by Brigitte Williams; Shevonne McKenzie; Brenda Worthington; John Does 1-5; Tylisha Story..(Richman, Scott)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. City University of New York served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Service was accepted by CPL Acevedo. Document filed by Brigitte Williams; Shevonne McKenzie; Brenda Worthington; John Does 1-5; Tylisha Story..(Richman, Scott)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Brigitte Williams, Shevonne McKenzie, Brenda Worthington, John Does 1-5, Tylisha Story..(Richman, Scott)
July 13, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Brigitte Williams, Shevonne McKenzie, Brenda Worthington, Tylisha Story added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Brigitte Williams, Shevonne McKenzie, Brenda Worthington, Tylisha Story. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Richman, Scott)
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER:To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by November 2, 2020, email a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by November 2, 2020, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/12/2020) (jca)
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are strongly encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/12/2020) (jca)
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/12/2020) (jca)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kristin Waters..(jgo)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City University of New York..(jgo)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Borough of Manhattan Community College..(jgo)
July 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Richman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott Richman to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add party John Does 1-5 with party text 'fictious name used to identify unknown individuals'; the All Plaintiff radio button was selected;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Richman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City University of New York ("CUNY"). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Richman, Scott)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Kristin Waters, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shevonne McKenzie, Tylisha Story, Brigitte Williams, Brenda Worthington..(Richman, Scott)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Borough of Manhattan Community College, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shevonne McKenzie, Tylisha Story, Brigitte Williams, Brenda Worthington..(Richman, Scott)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City University of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shevonne McKenzie, Tylisha Story, Brigitte Williams, Brenda Worthington..(Richman, Scott)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20619039)Document filed by Brigitte Williams, Shevonne McKenzie, Brenda Worthington, Tylisha Story..(Richman, Scott) Modified on 7/10/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. City University of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borough of Manhattan Community College
Represented By: Amanda Christine Croushore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City University of New York ("CUNY")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kristin Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City University of New York
Represented By: Amanda Christine Croushore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigitte Williams
Represented By: Scott Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shevonne McKenzie
Represented By: Scott Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tylisha Story
Represented By: Scott Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Worthington
Represented By: Scott Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.O. John Does 1-5
Represented By: Scott Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?