Sims v. Sony Music Entertainment et al
Case Number: 1:2020cv05322
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: By letter dated June 9, 2021, the parties have informed the Court that this case has settled. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action be conditionally discontinued without prejudice and without costs; provided, however, that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the parties may submit to the Court their own Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal. Otherwise, within such time Plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the active calenda r of this Court in the event that the settlement is not consummated. Upon such application for reinstatement, the parties shall continue to be subject to the Court's jurisdiction, the Court shall promptly reinstate the action to its active doc ket, and the parties shall be directed to appear before the Court, without the necessity of additional process, on a date within ten (10) days of the application, to schedule remaining pretrial proceedings and/or dispositive motions, as appropriate . This Order shall be deemed a final discontinuance of the action with prejudice in the event that Plaintiff has not requested restoration of the case to the active calendar within such 30-day period. The conference scheduled for June 10, 2021 is adjourned sine die. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/9/2021) (va)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ADJOURNING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE granting 67 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The settlement conference currently scheduled for May 4, 2021, at 2:15 p.m. is hereby ADJOURNED to June 8, 2021, at 2:15 p.m. Before the conference, counsel must conduct at least one more good-faith settlement discussion, in which each party conveys to the other a new settlement demand or offer. No later than June 4, 2021, the parties each shall submit an update letter to chambers by email, addressed to Moses_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The letters, which should not exceed two pages single-spaced, should not repeat the information provided in the parties' initial settlement letters; rather, the letters shall update the Court only as to new information that may be relevant to settlement. All other provisions of the Court's Order Scheduling Settlement Conference dated April 13, 2021 (Dkt. No. 66) remain in effect. The conference will be conducted using Microsoft Teams unless public health conditions in this District permit the Court to resume in-person conferences, in which case the Court will so notify the parties. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the letter-motion at Dkt. No. 67. (Settlement Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/28/2021) (rro)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference is scheduled before Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses on May 4, 2021, at 2:15 p.m. For the duration of the COVID-19 public health emergency, and unless otherwise ordered by the Court, a ll attendees must participate in the settlement conference remotely, using the Court's videoconferencing technology (Microsoft Teams) or (with the prior approval of the Court) such alternative videoconferencing technology as the parties agree upon and arrange. If the Court's technology is used, the Court will provide the link and further instructions in an email to counsel closer to the date of the conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) ( Settlement Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/13/2021) (cf)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/12/2021) (mro)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for November 18, 2020 is adjourned to December 17, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. The joint letter and Case Management Plan described in the Court's July 14, 2020 order, Dkt. No. 2, are due no later than December 10, 2020. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/12/2020) (mro)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 5 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for 9/17/2020. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 17, 2020 is adjourned to November 18, 2020 at 4:30 p.m. The joint status letter and propos ed case management plan described in the Court's July 14, 2020 order, Dkt. No. 2, are due no later than November 11, 2020. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/15/2020) (jca)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: In the order scheduling the initial pretrial conference in this matter, the parties were directed to submit a joint letter via ECF and to email a joint proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order to Chambers by no later than Septembe r 10, 2020. Dkt. No. 2. The Court has not received the parties' submissions. The parties are directed to submit their joint letter via ECF and to email their joint proposed Case Management Plan to Chambers forthwith, and in no event later than September 14, 2020. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on Defendants and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/11/2020) (jca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Sony Music Entertainment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?