PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC et al v. ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH et al
Plaintiff: Pyrolyx AG, Pyrolyx USA Indiana, LLC and Pyrolyx USA Inc.
Defendant: Zeppelin Systems GmbH and ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05436
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #66 Motion to Consolidate Cases 19cv11222 (as Lead Case) with 20cv5436. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted - cases to be consolidated and all papers filed only under docket #19cv11222. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/8/2020) (mml)
September 9, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-11222-CM. (mml)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #65 Notice of Motion and Withdrawal of Appearance. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Jeffry Alan Lind terminated. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/8/2020) (mml)
July 30, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-11222-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 30, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
July 18, 2020 Filing 66 JOINT MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-11222 . Document filed by ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC., Zeppelin Systems GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate).(Brar, Kuldeep)
July 16, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Jeffry Alan Lind to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Pyrolyx AG, Pyrolyx USA Inc., Pyrolyx USA Indiana, LLC..(Weldon, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Filing 64 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Indiana Southern; Case Number: 2:20-cv-00108. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 15, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
July 15, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
July 15, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 1:19-cv-11222. (sjo)
July 14, 2020 Filing 63 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Southern District of New York. Case transferred electronically to Southern District of New York, on July 14, 2020. (KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 62 CLOSED TRANSFER to the Southern District of New York. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss or Stay Plaintiffs' Claims Against Defendants, #23 , and the Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #48 , shall be terminated on the docket of this Court, but shall remain pending for disposition in the transferee court. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/14/2020.(KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 61 Exhibit List , filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC., Witness List , filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Brar, Kip) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 60 Exhibit List , filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC, Witness List , filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Wickard, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER - #55 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically is GRANTED. The Court shall issue a refund of the duplicate one hundred dollar ($100.00) filing fee regarding the Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Jason L. Richey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Dkt. #34 ) filed on April 16, 2020. Copy to Finance Department. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/29/2020. (TMC) Modified on 6/1/2020 - added distribution (RSF). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Kip Brar hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Brar, Kip) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 57 REPLY in Support of Motion re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint , filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Brar, Kip) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint , filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Wickard, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically , filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Refund of Filing Fee)(Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATED ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY AGREEMENT - Parties, by their respective counsel in the above-captioned action, stipulate and agree that the following stipulation shall govern the search and production of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) in this case (the ESI Stipulation). The Parties also agree to endeavor, subject to any such courts specific practices or as is otherwise ordered, to the extent possible to use the terms of this ESI Stipulation in all other matters involving the Parties, related to this dispute, including those in any federal or state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/12/2020.(KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 53 REPLY in Support of Motion re #23 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS , filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Brar, Kip) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 52 APPENDIX by ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Pyrolyx Motion to Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Extend Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint, filed May 5, 2020 in the Indiana state court Lien Action., #2 Exhibit 2-Pyrolyx Notice to Court and Counsel Regarding Clarification of Representation Made in a Pleading Before this Court, filed May 6, 2020 in the Indiana state court Lien Action.)(Brar, Kip) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS , filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 50 Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion re #23 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS , filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Vigo County IN Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Southern District of NY CMP)(Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 49 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint , filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Brar, Kip) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brar, Kip) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 47 STIPULATION ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY AGREEMENT, re #46 Order: Case Management, filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Lind, Jeffry) Modified on 5/1/2020 (MRI). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED Dispositive Motions due by 2/24/2021. Discovery due by 12/23/2020. Settlement Conference set for 3/4/2021 10:00 AM in room #246, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/22/2020.(JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS - A motion for the entry of an agreed protective order should be filed as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 14 days prior to the original due date for any discovery response with regard to which the responding party proposes to rely upon the protective order when responding. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to party via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/22/2020.(JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order Regarding Discovery Disputes - SEE ORDER. Copy sent to parties via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/22/2020.(JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on April 21, 2020. The Court will approve the Case Management Plan, by separate order, with the changes to which the parties have agreed.This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on July 15, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system.In addition, this matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on March 4, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern), in Room 255, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kip Brar for ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH,Kip Brar for ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC. added. Copy to Mr. Brar via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/22/2020. (KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney William D. Wickard for PYROLYX AG,William D. Wickard for PYROLYX USA INC.,William D. Wickard for PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC added. Copy to Mr. Wickard via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/20/2020. (KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jason L. Richey for PYROLYX AG,Jason L. Richey for PYROLYX USA INC.,Jason L. Richey for PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Mr. Richey via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/20/2020. (KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - Defendants' partial motions to dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. #16 #18 . Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/20/2020. (KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kuldeep "Kip" Brar to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5960200), filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Kip Brar, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason L. Richey to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5957739), filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Jason L. Richey, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice- Jason L. Richey)(Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Attorney(s) William D. Wickard to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5957491), filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of William Wickard, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice - William Wickard)(Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 34 **DISREGARD - WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED - REFILED AT DKT #36 ** MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason L. Richey to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5957485), filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Jason L. Richey, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice - Jason L. Richey)(Lind, Jeffry) Modified on 4/17/2020 (MRI). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2017.06.06.Contract.No.170124.00)(Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 05/01/2020 re #23 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS . Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/16/2020. (KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 31 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC . (Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 05/01/2020 re #23 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS , filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension of Time)(Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 29 Statement Responding to Defendants' Amended Notice of Removal (Doc.15) by All Plaintiffs. (Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 28 EXHIBIT in Support of Motion re #23 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS and re: #25 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support thereof (this is Exhibit 22-4), filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 27 EXHIBIT in Support of Motion re #23 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS and re: #25 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support thereof (this is Exhibit 22-2), filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Withdraw - Defendants' Exhibit 2 and Exhibit 4 Dkts. [22-2] and [22-4] shall be WITHDRAWN. Defendant is granted leave to file corrected Exhibits 2 and 4 within five (5) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/7/2020. (KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 25 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS , filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw #22 Appendix Exhibits 22-2 and 22-4, filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS, filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drummy, William)[Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 22 ***EXHIBITS 2 AND 4 WITHDRAWN AT #26 *** APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS OR STAY by ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pyrolyx USA Indiana, LLCs July 31, 2019 demand letter to Zeppelin Systems USA, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - Vigo County Superior Court Chronological Case Summary, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Michael Hoech, #4 Exhibit 4 - Judicial Caseload Profiles for U.S. District Courts NYSD and INSD, #5 Exhibit 5 - Certificate of Authenticity of William W. Drummy)(Drummy, William) Modified on 4/7/2020 (KAA). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 4/16/2020 to #16 MOTION to Dismiss .. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/31/2020. (JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 20 Submission of Proposed Order , re #19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 04/16/2020 re #16 MOTION to Dismiss , #18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 04/16/2020 re #16 MOTION to Dismiss , #18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mem. Decision and Order entered 3/5/20, in Zeppelin Systems USA, Inc. v. Pyrolyx USA Indiana, LLC, Civ. Action No. 19-cv-11222-CM, U.S. District Court, Southern District of New York, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mem. Decision and Order entered 3/5/2020, Zeppelin Systems USA, Inc. v. Pyrolyx USA Indiana, LLC, #19-cv-11222-CM, US District Court, SD of New York, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC., re #14 Appendix. (Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 14 APPENDIX to Amended Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record - Docket Sheet; Notice of Appearance of plaintiffs counsel; Summons; Complaint with exhibits; Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate; Certificate of Issuance of Summons; Alias Summons; Notice of Service of Alias Summons; Notice of Service of Discovery by plaintiffs; Notice of Appearance by defendants counsel; Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court with exhibits, #3 Exhibit C - 3/6/2020 letter from Zeppelin's counsel re: jurisdictional facts, #4 Exhibit D - 3/9/2020 letter from Pyrolyx's counsel re: jurisdictional facts, #5 Exhibit E - 9/9/2019 letter from Pyrolyx re: damages claims, #6 Exhibit F - German Stock Corporation Act, #7 Exhibit G - Pyrolyx Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Exhibit H - German Limited Liability Companies Act, #9 Exhibit I - Zeppelin Foundation Articles of Incorporation)(Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 4/21/2020 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. See Order for further instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/6/2020.(KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC identifying Other Affiliate PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC, Other Affiliate PYROLYX AG for PYROLYX USA INC... (Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffry Alan Lind on behalf of Plaintiffs PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (Lind, Jeffry) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Defendants to file an Amended Notice of Removal by March 16, 2020, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction. Plaintiffs are reminded of their obligation to file a statement within thirty days of Defendants' filing of the Amended Notice of Removal pursuant to Local Rule 81- 1. See Order. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 2/25/2020.(KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to PYROLYX AG, PYROLYX USA INC., PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC. (LAB) (KAA) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly A Reedy on behalf of Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.S. (Reedy, Holly) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - State Court Record Appearance by Attorney Jeffrey A. Lind; Summons by Certified Mail to Zeppelin Systems USA, Inc; Summons by Private Process to Zeppelin Systems GmbH; Complaint with Exhibit A; Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate; Certificate of Issuance of Summons; Alias Summons Personal Service Zeppelin Systems GmbH; Alias Summons Personal Service Zeppelin Systems USA Indiana, LLC; Notice of Service of Alias Summons; Notice of Service of Discovery)(Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PENDING STATE COURT MOTION, filed by Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.S, re #1 Notice of Removal. (Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.S. (Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Drummy on behalf of Defendants ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH, ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.S. (Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vigo Superior, case number 84D01-2002-PL-001086, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5875054) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C - Pyrolyx 9/9/2019 Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drummy, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PYROLYX USA INDIANA, LLC et al v. ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GmbH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pyrolyx AG
Represented By: William D. Wickard
Represented By: Jeffry Alan Lind
Represented By: Jason L. Richey
Represented By: Matthew Jason Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pyrolyx USA Indiana, LLC
Represented By: William D. Wickard
Represented By: Jeffry Alan Lind
Represented By: Jason L. Richey
Represented By: Matthew Jason Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pyrolyx USA Inc.
Represented By: William D. Wickard
Represented By: Jeffry Alan Lind
Represented By: Jason L. Richey
Represented By: Matthew Jason Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeppelin Systems GmbH
Represented By: Holly A Reedy
Represented By: William W. Drummy
Represented By: Kip Brar
Represented By: Kuldeep Brar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS USA, INC.
Represented By: Holly A Reedy
Represented By: William W. Drummy
Represented By: Kip Brar
Represented By: Kuldeep Brar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?