Hossain v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Shahadat Hossain
Respondent: Jane Does 1-10, ABC Agency 1-10, USCIS Texas Service Center, John Does 1-10, Kevin McAleenan, Ken Cuccinelli, United States Bureau of Consular Affairs and U.S Attorney General William P. Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv05450
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/10/2020) (jwh)
August 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Nature of Suit code 540 (Mandamus & Other);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 465 (Other Immigration Actions);. (pc)
August 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry re: Document No. #6 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services to CM ECF with the party role "Respondent". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Chhetry, Khagendra)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against ABC Agency 1-10, William P. Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Texas Service Center, United States Bureau of Consular Affairs.Document filed by Shahadat Hossain..(Chhetry, Khagendra)
August 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type PETITION in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/10/2020. (pc)
August 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ABC Agency 1-10, William P. Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Texas Service Center, United States Bureau of Consular Affairs. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
August 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: KEVIN K MCALEENAN, KEN CUCCINELLI, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, William P. Barr, Bureau of Consular Affairs, JOHN DOES 1-10 (names and number of whom are unknown at present), Jane Does 1-10, ABC Agency 1-10. The parties were added to the case in error. (pc)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against KEVIN K MCALEENAN, KEN CUCCINELLI, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, William P. Barr, Bureau of Consular Affairs, JOHN DOES 1-10 (names and number of whom are unknown at present), Jane Does 1-10, ABC Agency 1-10.Document filed by Shahadat Hossain..(Chhetry, Khagendra) Modified on 8/5/2020 (pc).
August 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
August 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/10/2020. (pc)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants.Document filed by Shahadat Hossain..(Chhetry, Khagendra) Modified on 8/4/2020 (pc).
July 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the All Defendant radio button was selected; Defendants on the pleading caption title must be listed as respondents if a Petition for Writ of Mandamus is being filed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/3/2020. (pc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - FIRST PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants.Document filed by Shahadat Hossain..(Chhetry, Khagendra) Modified on 7/28/2020 (pc).
July 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
July 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; the All Defendant radio button was selected; Defendants must be listed as respondents if a Petition for Writ of Mandamus is being filed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/3/2020. (pc)
July 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Acting Secretary KEVIN K MCALEENAN, KEN CUCCINELLI, Texas Service Center, Bureau of Consular Affairs, JOHN DOES 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Shahadat Hossain..(Chhetry, Khagendra) Modified on 7/27/2020 (pc).
July 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
July 22, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-20699559, paid on 7/15/2020..(pc)
July 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MD. Shahadat Hossain, US Department of Homeland Security (DHS). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
July 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
July 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Defendants must be listed as respondents if a Petition for Writ of Mandamus is being filed. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/27/2020. (pc)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against US Department of Homeland Security (DHS). Document filed by Shahadat Hossain..(Chhetry, Khagendra) Modified on 7/22/2020 (pc).
July 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
July 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Khagendra Gharti Chhetry to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 7/21/2020. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hossain v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shahadat Hossain
Represented By: Khagendra Gharti Chhetry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ABC Agency 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USCIS Texas Service Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Bureau of Consular Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?