Xitumul Soto et al v. The Village in Times Square LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto
Defendant: Artemio Cielo, The Village in Times Square LLC doing business as Joe's Pizza and Giovanni Carollo
Case Number: 1:2020cv05463
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Scott Johnson on behalf of Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Johnson, Kevin)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/20/2020) (jwh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Village in Times Square LLC..(jgo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Giovanni Carollo..(jgo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Artemio Cielo..(jgo)
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Artemio Cielo, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Giovanni Carollo, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Village in Times Square LLC (d/b/a Joe's Pizza), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Giovanni Carollo, Artemio Cielo, The Village in Times Square LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20713665)Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xitumul Soto et al v. The Village in Times Square LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artemio Cielo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Village in Times Square LLC doing business as Joe's Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Kevin Scott Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?