Shettles Jr. v. ABT Limousine Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Landrum Brewer Shettles Jr.
Defendant: Patricia Anne Abt, George Abt, Jr., George Abt, Sr. and ABT Limousine Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05489
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME: It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above captioned matter is hereby extended to 30 days from the date this stipulation is so ordered by the Court. There has been no previous request for an extension of time. Defendants reserve all defenses of this action, except waive any defense objections to invalid service of process. It is further Stipulated and Agreed, this stipulation may be signed in counterparts and a facsimile or electronic signature shall be sufficient for all purposes. Granted. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 8/14/2020) (js) Modified on 8/14/2020 (js).
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by George Abt, Sr., ABT Limousine Service, Inc., Patricia Anne Abt, George Abt, Jr...(Chong, Michael)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by George Abt, Sr., ABT Limousine Service, Inc., Patricia Anne Abt, George Abt, Jr...(Chong, Michael)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael K. Chong on behalf of George Abt, Sr., ABT Limousine Service, Inc., Patricia Anne Abt, George Abt, Jr...(Chong, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. ABT Limousine Service, Inc. served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Business Document Specialist at the NY Secretary of State. Document filed by Landrum Brewer Shettles Jr...(Wisniewski, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Patricia Anne Abt served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Service was accepted by Baron (co-worker). Document filed by Landrum Brewer Shettles Jr...(Wisniewski, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. George Abt, Jr. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Service was accepted by Baron (co-worker). Document filed by Landrum Brewer Shettles Jr...(Wisniewski, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. George Abt, Sr. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Service was accepted by Baron (co-worker). Document filed by Landrum Brewer Shettles Jr...(Wisniewski, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. ABT Limousine Service, Inc. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Service was accepted by Baron (co-worker). Document filed by Landrum Brewer Shettles Jr...(Wisniewski, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Abt, Sr., ABT Limousine Service, Inc., Patricia Anne Abt, George Abt, Jr...(pne)
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ABT LIMOUSINE SERVICE, INC., GEORGE ABT, SR., GEORGE ABT, JR., and PATRICIA ANNE ABT, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Landrum Brewer Shettles Jr...(Wisniewski, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wisniewski, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George Abt, Sr., ABT Limousine Service, Inc., Patricia Anne Abt, George Abt, Jr.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20721894)Document filed by Landrum Brewer Shettles Jr...(Wisniewski, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shettles Jr. v. ABT Limousine Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Anne Abt
Represented By: Michael K. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Abt, Jr.
Represented By: Michael K. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Abt, Sr.
Represented By: Michael K. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABT Limousine Service, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landrum Brewer Shettles Jr.
Represented By: Robert Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?