Seifelnasr et al v. Medicad et al
Plaintiff: Ahmed E. Seifelnast, Elite 7, Inc. and Ahmed E. Seifelnasr
Defendant: NYS Department of Health, Medicade and Medicad
Case Number: 1:2020cv05512
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Mailed a copy of #5 Order of Dismissal, Add and Terminate Parties to Ahmed E. Seifelnasr at 4004 25th Ave., Apt. 2R, Astoria, NY 11103. (kh)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff's claims on behalf of Elite 7 are dismissed. Plaintiff's claims against the New York State Department of Health are dismissed as barred by the Eleventh Amendment and as frivolous. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (iii) The Clerk of Court is instructed to hold this matter open on the docket until a civil judgment is entered. Plaintiffs request for issuance of summons is denied without prejudice to renewal at a later date, should Plaintiff file an amended complaint that states a valid claim for relief. If Plaintiff chooses to amend his complaint, he must submit the amended complaint to this Courts Pro Se Intake Unit within 30 days of the date of this order, caption the document as an Amended Complaint, and label the document with docket number 20-CV-5512 (MKV). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. If Plaintiff fails to submit an amended complaint within the time allowed and does not show good cause to excuse such failure, the Court will enter a civil judgment consistent with this order and direct the Clerk of Court to terminate this matter. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. Elite 7, Inc. (non emergency medicad transportation provider) and NYS Department of Health terminated. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 8/4/2020) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Medicad, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Ahmed E. Seifelnasr. (rdz) Modified on 7/21/2020 (sac). Modified on 8/3/2020 (sac).
July 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz)
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Medicad, NYS Department of Health. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ) Document filed by Ahmed E. Seifelnasr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix).(rdz) Modified on 7/21/2020 (sac). Modified on 8/3/2020 (sac).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seifelnasr et al v. Medicad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed E. Seifelnast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite 7, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed E. Seifelnasr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYS Department of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?