Cazarez v. T&T 130 Pizza Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Marcos Cazarez
Defendant: T&T 130 Pizza Corp., Tony Russo and T&T 130 Pizza Corp. doing business as Bella Napoli
Case Number: 1:2020cv05545
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. T&T 130 Pizza Corp. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service was accepted by Sec. of State. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Marcos Cazarez..(Mulholland, Colin)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Tony Russo served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. Service was accepted by Danielle Russo. Document filed by Marcos Cazarez..(Mulholland, Colin)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to T&T 130 Pizza Corp...(dnh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tony Russo..(dnh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to T&T 130 PIZZA CORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marcos Cazarez..(Mulholland, Colin)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tony Russo, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marcos Cazarez..(Mulholland, Colin)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Colin James Mulholland. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: T&T 130 Pizza Corp.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (pne)
July 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Colin James Mulholland. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tony Russo, T&T 130 Pizza Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20740119)Document filed by Marcos Cazarez..(Mulholland, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cazarez v. T&T 130 Pizza Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&T 130 Pizza Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&T 130 Pizza Corp. doing business as Bella Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Cazarez
Represented By: Colin James Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?