Arch Reinsurance Company v. J.S. Held, LLC et al
Petitioner: Arch Reinsurance Company
Respondent: SERVPRO INDUSTRIES, LLC TENNESSEE LLC MEMBER, EVANS TEAM USA, LLC- TEXAS LLC MEMBER, MATTHEW FABISH, TRACEY DODD, SERVPRO OF DUNCANVILLE/DESOTO, NOBLE RESEARCH INSTITUTE, LLC - OKLAHOMA LLC MEMBER, JEREMY FIELDER, J.S. HELD, LLC, NELSON BEAN, Servpro Industries, LLC, Evans Team USA, LLC, Jeromy Fielder, Noble Research Institute, LLC and Servpro Duncanville/Desoto
Case Number: 1:2020cv05553
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:7
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Servpro Industries, LLC answer due 9/15/2020. (mro)
September 14, 2020 Filing 50 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #49 Letter, filed by Servpro Industries, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. Servpro should file the response as a separate document on ECF by the end of the day on September 15, 2020. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/14/2020) (mro)
September 9, 2020 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Torsten M. Kracht dated September 9, 2020 re: Arch Reinsurance Co. v. J.S. Held, LLC, et al.. Document filed by Servpro Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Response seeking permission to file).(Kracht, Torsten)
September 9, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Torsten Michael Kracht on behalf of Servpro Industries, LLC..(Kracht, Torsten)
September 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #47 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
September 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #46 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
September 3, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Nelson Bean, Evans Team USA, LLC. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Carruthers, Thomas)
September 3, 2020 Filing 46 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Tracey Dodd, Jeromy Fielder, J.S. Held, LLC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Carruthers, Thomas)
August 28, 2020 Filing 45 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition (Other), served. Jeromy Fielder served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service was accepted by Jeromy Fielder, Respondent. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
August 28, 2020 Filing 44 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition (Other), served. J.S. Held, LLC served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, authorized person in the Corporate Division of the Department of State. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
August 28, 2020 Filing 43 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition (Other), served. Servpro Industries, LLC served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. Service was accepted by Samantha Sutton, Clerk. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
August 28, 2020 Filing 42 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition (Other), served. Servpro Duncanville/Desoto served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by Matthew Fabish, Managing Agent. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
August 28, 2020 Filing 41 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition (Other), served. Matthew Fabish served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by Matthew Fabish, Respondent. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
August 28, 2020 Filing 40 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition (Other), served. Evans Team USA, LLC served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. Service was accepted by Nelson Bean, Agent. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition (Other), served. Nelson Bean served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. Service was accepted by Nelson Bean, Respondent. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition (Other), served. Noble Research Institute, LLC served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service was accepted by Andrew Segna, Assistant General Counsel. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Plaintiff is directed to file proof of service of the Petition on all Respondents on or before September 1, 2020. To the extent any Respondents have not been served yet, proof of service must be filed within three days of service. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil) (Text Only Order) (ab)
August 25, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE re: #1 Petition (Other), . Document filed by Noble Research Institute, LLC..(Traflet, Stephen)
August 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Noble Research Institute, LLC answer due 8/26/2020. (va)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition (Other). This request is untimely. The Court's Individual Practices require that requests for extension be submitted at least 72 hours in advance of the deadline. This request was submitted after the deadline. As a result, the Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART the request. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Petition is extended to August 26, 2020. There will be no further extensions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 8/24/2020) (va)
August 21, 2020 Filing 34 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Petition (Other), addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Stephen G. Traflet dated August 21, 2020. Document filed by Noble Research Institute, LLC..(Traflet, Stephen)
August 21, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen G. Traflet on behalf of Noble Research Institute, LLC..(Traflet, Stephen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Steven Goodman on behalf of Jeromy Fielder, J.S. Held, LLC..(Goodman, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 Petition (Other), . Document filed by Jeromy Fielder, J.S. Held, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Suriano, Costantino)
August 19, 2020 Filing 30 AFFIRMATION of Constantino P. Suriano in Opposition re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Jeromy Fielder, J.S. Held, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Suriano, Costantino)
August 19, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Jeromy Fielder, J.S. Held, LLC..(Suriano, Costantino)
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Servpro Industries, LLC..(dnh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Servpro Duncanville/Desoto..(dnh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Evans Team USA, LLC..(dnh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tracey Dodd..(dnh)
July 22, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A. Knoerzer on behalf of Arch Reinsurance Company..(Knoerzer, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Irene Ribeiro Gee on behalf of Arch Reinsurance Company..(Gee, Irene)
July 22, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Gemmell Carruthers on behalf of Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 22, 2020 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ServPro Industries, LLC, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 22, 2020 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ServPro Duncanville/DeSoto, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Evans Team USA, LLC, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tracey Dodd, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas Gemmell Carruthers to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; party name listed in the docket entry text and in the Defendant 'To:' section of the PDF must appear exactly as it does in the pleading caption. Do not add additional text such as '..by Nelson Dean.' Caption Error; defendant name listed in the caption on the summons PDF contained a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Noble Research Institute, LLC..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.S. Held, LLC..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeromy Fielder..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matthew Fabish..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nelson Bean..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
July 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas Gemmell Carruthers. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Cause of Action code 9:0001; Citizenship Plaintiff code 7 (NONE); Citizenship Defendant code 7 (NONE); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Cause of Action code has been modified to 9:0007; the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Gemmell Carruthers. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: J.S. HELD, LLC ; TRACEY DODD ; JEREMY FIELDER ; EVANS TEAM USA, LLC- TEXAS LLC MEMBER ; NELSON BEAN ; NOBLE RESEARCH INSTITUTE, LLC - OKLAHOMA LLC MEMBER ; SERVPRO OF DUNCANVILLE/DESOTO ; MATTHEW FABISH ; SERVPRO INDUSTRIES, LLC TENNESSEE LLC MEMBER. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group, LTD. for Arch Reinsurance Company. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ServPro Industries, LLC, by its corporate representative, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas) Modified on 7/20/2020 (dnh).
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ServPro Duncanville/DeSoto by Matthew Fabish, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas) Modified on 7/20/2020 (dnh).
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Noble Research Institute, LLC, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.S. HELD, LLC, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JEROMY FIELDER, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MATTHEW FABISH, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Evans Team USA, LLC, by Nelson Bean, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas) Modified on 7/20/2020 (dnh).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tracey Dodd, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas) Modified on 7/20/2020 (dnh).
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nelson Bean, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company..(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Rider to civil cover sheet).(Carruthers, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20742584).Document filed by Arch Reinsurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Affidavit of Thomas G. Carruthers, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Memorandum of Law in Support, #9 Text of Proposed Order).(Carruthers, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arch Reinsurance Company v. J.S. Held, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SERVPRO INDUSTRIES, LLC TENNESSEE LLC MEMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: EVANS TEAM USA, LLC- TEXAS LLC MEMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW FABISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TRACEY DODD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SERVPRO OF DUNCANVILLE/DESOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NOBLE RESEARCH INSTITUTE, LLC - OKLAHOMA LLC MEMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEREMY FIELDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J.S. HELD, LLC
Represented By: Robert Steven Goodman
Represented By: Costantino P. Suriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NELSON BEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Servpro Industries, LLC
Represented By: Torsten Michael Kracht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Evans Team USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeromy Fielder
Represented By: Robert Steven Goodman
Represented By: Costantino P. Suriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Noble Research Institute, LLC
Represented By: Stephen G. Traflet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Servpro Duncanville/Desoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arch Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Gemmell Carruthers
Represented By: Irene Ribeiro Gee
Represented By: Michael A. Knoerzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?