Burns v. Schell
Plaintiff: George Burns
Defendant: Amy Schell
Case Number: 1:2020cv05582
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Mailed a copy of #4 Order 30 Days Other (case opening), and a Declaration form, to George Burns, # 2412000424 at AMKC, 18-18 Hazen St., East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (kh)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court directs Plaintiff to show cause why the Court should not deny his IFP application under the PLRA's three strikes provision, 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Plaintiff must file a declaration within thirty days explaining any reason why he should not be barred under the PLRA. A declaration form is attached to this order for Plaintiff's convenience. If Plaintiff does not show cause, or if he fails to respond to this order, the Court will deny Plaintiff's IFP application, dismiss this action without prejudice, and bar Plaintiff under 1915(g) from filing future actions IFP while he is a prisoner. All other pending matters are terminated. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/4/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2020: #1 Declaration Form) (nb).
September 3, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by George Burns.(rdz)
July 16, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Amy Schell. Document filed by George Burns.(rdz)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by George Burns.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Schell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Schell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?